Segovia v. Skariah et al
Plaintiff: Rafael Segovia
Defendant: Tommy Long, Eipe Skariah, Sicily SKARIAH and Tommie Long
Case Number: 3:2022cv00366
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 4/26/2022. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 4/6/2022) (ndt)
April 5, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Sicily Skariah. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney James Michael Jaynes added to party Sicily Skariah(pty:dft) (Jaynes, James)
April 4, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eipe Skariah. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Jaynes, James)
April 4, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Tommie Long. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney James Michael Jaynes added to party Tommie Long(pty:dft) (Jaynes, James)
April 4, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Eipe Skariah. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney James Michael Jaynes added to party Eipe Skariah(pty:dft) (Jaynes, James)
March 22, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Eipe Skariah ; served on 3/14/2022. (ndt)
March 22, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sicily Skariah ; served on 3/14/2022. (ndt)
March 22, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tommie Long ; served on 3/17/2022. (ndt)
February 16, 2022 Filing 6 Business Reply Card signed by USMS; re #1 Complaint, #4 Order, #5 Summons Issued. Signed on 2/16/2022. (mjr)
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Tommie Long, Eipe Skariah, Sicily Skariah. (jmg)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING 2 LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SPECIFYING FURTHER ACTION TO BE TAKEN BY THE CLERK, AND REQUIRING SERVICE BY THE MARSHAL: The Clerk of Court shall issue the summonses as proposed by Segovia, see Dkt. Nos. 1-4, 1-5, and 1-6, and the United States Marshal shall serve process as to the defendants relying on the information that Segovia has provided. After docketing of this order, the screening referral shall TERMINATE, RETURNING this case to Chief Judge Lynn. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 2/16/2022) (jmg)
February 14, 2022 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (mla)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, see document #1 for image, filed by Rafael Segovia. (mla)
February 14, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, see document #1 for image, by Rafael Segovia. (mla)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Rafael Segovia. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es) if the motion to proceed IFP is granted. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Proposed Order, #4 Additional Page(s), #5 Additional Page(s), #6 Additional Page(s)) (Strickland, Duncan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Segovia v. Skariah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Segovia
Represented By: Duncan Harold Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eipe Skariah
Represented By: James Michael Jaynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sicily SKARIAH
Represented By: James Michael Jaynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommie Long
Represented By: James Michael Jaynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?