Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Allure Jazz & Cigars, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. and Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Allure Jazz & Cigars, LLC d/b/a Allure Jazz and Cigar Lounge and d/b/a Allure Jazz & Cigars, Pride 37 LLC, Kevin Courtney, Christopher Johnson, Allure Jazz & Cigars LLC doing business as Allure Jazz and Cigar Lounge doing business as Allure Jazz & Cigars and Chris Johnson
Case Number: 3:2022cv00514
Filed: March 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Allure Jazz & Cigars LLC answer due 4/15/2022 and Kevin Courtney answer due 4/15/2022. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/28/2022) (mla)
March 28, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Allure Jazz & Cigars, LLC, served on 3/10/2022. (King, Jamie)
March 28, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kevin Courtney, served on 3/10/2022. (King, Jamie)
March 28, 2022 Filing 8 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Allure Jazz & Cigars, LLC, Kevin Courtney Attorney Randy Agnew added to party Allure Jazz & Cigars, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Randy Agnew added to party Kevin Courtney(pty:dft) (Agnew, Randy)
March 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jamie Renee King for David Michael Walsh IV on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (King, Jamie)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/7/2022) (chmb)
March 4, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION Motion for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (King, Jamie)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Allure Jazz & Cigars, LLC, Kevin Courtney, Christopher Johnson, Pride 37 LLC. (jmg)
March 3, 2022 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
March 3, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
March 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12642470) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Allure Jazz & Cigars, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Represented By: David M Walsh, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allure Jazz & Cigars, LLC d/b/a Allure Jazz and Cigar Lounge and d/b/a Allure Jazz & Cigars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pride 37 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Courtney
Represented By: Randy Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allure Jazz & Cigars LLC doing business as Allure Jazz and Cigar Lounge doing business as Allure Jazz & Cigars
Represented By: Randy Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?