Exxon Mobil Corporation v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Defendant: United States of America and Charles P Retting
Case Number: 3:2022cv00515
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendant United States of Americas response to the complaint is due June 2, 2022. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/26/2022) (chmb)
April 26, 2022 Filing 22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by United States of America Attorney Jonathan L Blacker added to party United States of America(pty:dft) (Blacker, Jonathan)
March 29, 2022 Filing 21 Affidavit of Service as to the US Attorney General. (Buchwald, Lara) Modified event text on 3/30/2022 (jmg).
March 29, 2022 Filing 20 PROOF of Service as to United States of America, served on 3/4/2022. (Buchwald, Lara) Modified event on 3/30/2022 (ygl).
March 29, 2022 Filing 19 PROOF of Service as to Charles P Retting, served on 3/4/2022. (Buchwald, Lara) Modified event on 3/30/2022 (ygl).
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Antonio J. Perez-Marques. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/15/2022) (chmb)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James P. Rouhandeh. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/15/2022) (chmb)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew S. Gehring. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/15/2022) (chmb)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lara Samet Buchwald. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/15/2022) (chmb)
March 4, 2022 Filing 14 Court Request for Recusal: The referral judge for this case has been reassigned via random assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. U.S. Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford is no longer assigned to the case. (cea)
March 4, 2022 Filing 13 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
March 4, 2022 Filing 12 Summons issued as to Charles P Retting, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (jmg)
March 4, 2022 Filing 11 Summons issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (jmg)
March 4, 2022 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to issue Summons to IRS Commissioner filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (McCaig, Jennifer)
March 4, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Civil Process Clerk, N.D. Tex. filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (McCaig, Jennifer)
March 4, 2022 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to issue Summons to Attorney General filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (McCaig, Jennifer)
March 4, 2022 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12643691) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Perez-Marques, Antonio)
March 4, 2022 Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12643595) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rouhandeh, James)
March 4, 2022 Filing 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Andrew Scott Gehring (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12643630) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McCaig, Jennifer)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Lara Samet Buchwald (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12643589) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McCaig, Jennifer)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation (McCaig, Jennifer)
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (McCaig, Jennifer)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, Charles P Retting filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12643364) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (McCaig, Jennifer) Modified text on 3/4/2022 (ygl). Modified text on 3/4/2022 (jmg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exxon Mobil Corporation v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: James P Rouhandeh
Represented By: Andrew S Gehring
Represented By: Antonio J Perez-Marques
Represented By: Emily A Parker
Represented By: Jennifer Meghan McCaig
Represented By: Lara Samet Buchwald
Represented By: Leonora Susan Meyercord
Represented By: Mary A McNulty
Represented By: Andrew Scott Gehring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Cory A Johnson
Represented By: Jonathan L Blacker
Represented By: Ryan D Galisewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles P Retting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?