Jain Law & Associates PLLC v. Skierski et al
Plaintiff: Jain Law & Associates PLLC and Skierski Jain PLLC
Defendant: Douglas Skierski, Slierski Law PLLC, Terri Steinbrenner, Crazy T Management Co., United States Department of Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service, Expressions Gold Exchange, LLC, Jonathan B. Bailey d/b/a Law Office of Jonathan B. Bailey, Johnson, Zegen,Scott & Williams PLLC, McCathern PPLC, Crazy T Management Co, Expressions Gold Exchange LLC, Jonathan B. Bailey doing business as Law Office of Jonathan B. Bailey, Johnson Zegen Scott & Williams PLLC and McCathern PLLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00641
Filed: March 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Referring Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Disburse Funds from Plaintiff filed by Terri Steinbrenner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Proposed Order) (Schurr, Patrick) Modified text and linkage on 4/27/2022 (jmg).
April 26, 2022 Filing 21 REPLY filed by Jain Law & Associates PLLC re: #6 MOTION for Order Authorizing Deposit of Funds into the Registry of the Court. (Bailey, Clayton) Modified text and document linkage on 4/27/2022 (jmg).
April 25, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint/Crossclaim filed by United States Department of Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Smith, Curtis) Modified text on 4/26/2022 (jmg).
April 25, 2022 Filing 19 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Douglas Skierski. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Bailey, Jonathan) Modified text on 4/26/2022 (jmg).
April 25, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Douglas Skierski. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Bailey, Jonathan)
April 25, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Jonathan B. Bailey. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Bailey, Jonathan)
April 25, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Jonathan B. Bailey. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Bailey, Jonathan)
April 25, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States Department of Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Smith, Curtis)
April 25, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint filed by United States Department of Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Smith, Curtis)
April 25, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crazy T Management Co. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Holen, Andrew)
April 25, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Crazy T Management Co. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (Holen, Andrew)
April 24, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Terri Steinbrenner. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Schurr, Patrick)
April 24, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Terri Steinbrenner. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (Schurr, Patrick)
April 20, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson Zegen Scott & Williams PLLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Scott, Molly)
April 19, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Johnson Zegen Scott & Williams PLLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Molly Scott added to party Johnson Zegen Scott & Williams PLLC(pty:dft) (Scott, Molly)
April 12, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Terri Steinbrenner re: #6 MOTION for Order Authorizing Deposit of Funds into the Registry of the Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) B) (Schurr, Patrick)
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Order Authorizing Deposit of Funds into the Registry of the Court filed by Jain Law & Associates PLLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bailey, Clayton)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. United States Department of Treasury answer due 4/25/2022. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/28/2022) (mla)
March 28, 2022 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon Mar 28 11:24:42 CDT 2022 (crt)
March 25, 2022 Filing 4 Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Ada Brown for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:22-cv-00641-E. (twd)
March 24, 2022 Filing 3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Defend filed by United States Department of Treasury with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Curtis)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl) Modified text on 3/21/2022 (ygl).
March 21, 2022 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. Mon Mar 21 11:56:44 CDT 2022 (crt)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by United States Department of Treasury, United States Internal Revenue Service. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Supplement From State Court, #4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Original Petition for Interpleader, #6 Notice of Waiver of Citation and Service Steinbrenner and Expressions, #7 Notice of Waiver of Citation and Service United States Attorney, #8 Notice of Waiver of Citation and Service Crazy T Management Co., #9 Defendants Original Answer Bailey, #10 Defendants Original Answer Skierski, #11 Defendants Original Answer Johnson Zegen Scott and Williams PLLC, #12 Defendants Original Answer Terri Steinbrenner, #13 Original Crossclaim of Cross-Plaintiff Defendant Terri Steinbrenner) (Smith, Curtis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jain Law & Associates PLLC v. Skierski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jain Law & Associates PLLC
Represented By: Clayton E Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skierski Jain PLLC
Represented By: Clayton E Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Skierski
Represented By: Jonathan B Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slierski Law PLLC
Represented By: Clayton E Bailey
Represented By: Jonathan B Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Steinbrenner
Represented By: Patrick J Schurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crazy T Management Co.
Represented By: Andrew J Holen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Treasury
Represented By: Curtis C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Curtis C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expressions Gold Exchange, LLC
Represented By: Clayton E Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan B. Bailey d/b/a Law Office of Jonathan B. Bailey
Represented By: Jonathan B Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson, Zegen,Scott & Williams PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCathern PPLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crazy T Management Co
Represented By: Andrew J Holen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expressions Gold Exchange LLC
Represented By: Clayton E Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan B. Bailey doing business as Law Office of Jonathan B. Bailey
Represented By: Jonathan B Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Zegen Scott & Williams PLLC
Represented By: Molly Scott
Represented By: Robin R Zegen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCathern PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?