Martinez v. Strong
Petitioner: Gregory Lewis Martinez
Respondent: Kelly Strong
Case Number: 3:2022cv00673
Filed: March 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Referring Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED that the Motion to Extend Time for Filing Habeas Corpus, received on 3/22/2022 [Doc. No. #3 ], is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 5/6/2022) (mjr)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Accepting #4 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendations and Denying Certificate of Appealability. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 5/6/2022) (mjr)
May 6, 2022 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7, 8. Fri May 6 12:31:56 CDT 2022 (crt)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 request for extra sessions in the law library. His request does not challenge his convictions or custody and may be liberally construed either as a civil rights action under 42 U.S.C. 1983 or as a mandamus action under 28 U.S.C. 1651. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to forward the petitioner a copy of the standard forms for filing a civil complaint and a complaint under 42 U.S.C. 1983, and an application to proceed in forma pauperis in case he wishes to file a new civil action. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 4/14/2022) (Attachments: #1 IFP, #2 Prisoner 1983) (mjr)
April 14, 2022 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Thu Apr 14 13:54:55 CDT 2022 (crt)
April 12, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Help re: Law Library filed by Gregory Lewis Martinez. (mla)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION: #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus should be DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 3/24/2022) (svc) Modified Judge on 3/25/2022 (svc).
March 24, 2022 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Thu Mar 24 15:46:35 CDT 2022 (crt)
March 23, 2022 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Wed Mar 23 16:33:00 CDT 2022 (crt)
March 22, 2022 Filing 3 Motion to Extend Time for Filing PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Gregory Lewis Martinez. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mms)
March 22, 2022 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mms)
March 22, 2022 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Lewis Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kelly Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?