Broadfield v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Brian Broadfield
Defendant: United States of America, NFN Russell, NFN Zook, NFN Bayless, NFN Bibbs, NFN Bandass and NFN Jenkins
Case Number: 3:2022cv00860
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 22-10519 in USCA5 for #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Brian Broadfield. (svc)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Tue May 24 08:31:25 CDT 2022 (crt)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #9 Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations to the Fifth Circuit by Brian Broadfield. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (mjr)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED the request for a preliminary injunction is DENIED; the claims against the United States, its agencies, and its employees in their official capacities are DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction; and the claims for monetary damages against the individual defendants in their individual capacities are DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/10/2022) (mla)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ACCEPTING #7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Plaintiffs Objections are OVERRULED. Order Accepting Findings and Recommendations. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/10/2022) (mla)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9, 10. Tue May 10 14:40:20 CDT 2022 (crt)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OBJECTION to #7 Findings and Recommendations. (ndt)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re: #5 Motion for Injunction filed by Brian Broadfield. The Court should deny the request for a preliminary injunction; dismiss the claims against the United States, its agencies, and its employees in their official capacities for lack of jurisdiction; and dismiss the claims for monetary damages against the individual defendants in their individual capacities with prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/20/2022) (ygl)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PLRA FILING FEE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis as to Brian Broadfield, BOP Register No. 18618-026. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/20/2022) (ygl) Modified on 4/25/2022 (mcrd).
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. and mailed to the Inmate Trust Fund Department Wed Apr 20 16:29:50 CDT 2022 (crt)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Wed Apr 20 16:40:09 CDT 2022 (crt)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Mon Apr 18 11:09:41 CDT 2022 (crt)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Brian Broadfield. (mla)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Brian Broadfield. (mla)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against NFN Bandass, NFN Bayless, NFN Bibbs, NFN Jenkins, NFN Russell, United States of America, NFN Zook filed by Brian Broadfield. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mla)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mla)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadfield v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Broadfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Zook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Bayless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Bibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Bandass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?