Walker v. Williams
Plaintiff: Derrick Walker
Defendant: Dallas Field Office IRS, William Byrd and Billy F Williams
Case Number: 3:2022cv00877
Filed: April 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT: For the reasons set out in a memorandum opinion and order filed today, it is ordered and adjudged that plaintiff's actions against defendants Criminal Investigation Unit of the Dallas Field Office of the Internal Revenue Service (the "IRS") and William Byrd ("Byrd") are dismissed without prejudice. The taxable costs of court of the IRS and Byrd, as calculated by the clerk of court, are assessed against plaintiff. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), the court expressly determines that there is no just reason for delay and directs the clerk of court to enter this as a final judgment. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/7/2022) (ndt)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Memorandum Opinion and Order re: #5 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dallas Field Office IRS, #7 Motion to Stay filed by Dallas Field Office IRS. For the reasons explained, the court grants the government's motion to dismiss and dismisses Walker's action against Byrd and the IRS without prejudice by Rule 54(b) final judgment entered today. The court denies without prejudice as moot the government's May 16, 2022 motion to stay discovery. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 6/7/2022) (ndt)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8,9. Tue Jun 7 14:48:47 CDT 2022 (crt)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Dallas Field Office IRS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order) (Orozco, Christian)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/23/2022. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 4/25/2022) (ndt)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Apr 25 15:34:01 CDT 2022 (crt)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Service, and Failure to States a Claim filed by Dallas Field Office IRS (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Orozco, Christian)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mla)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Criminal Investigation Unit/Dallas Field Office IRS. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Orozco, Christian)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Criminal Investigation Unit/Dallas Field Office IRS. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Additional Page(s) Notice of Supplement to the Record, #4 Additional Page(s) Civil Case Information Sheet, #5 Additional Page(s) Complaint, #6 Additional Page(s) Citation for Billy Williams, #7 Additional Page(s) Citation for "Dallas Field Office IRS", #8 Additional Page(s) Civil Case Cover Sheet, #9 Additional Page(s) Amended Complaint, #10 Additional Page(s) Defendant's Answer, #11 Additional Page(s) Executed Citation for "Dallas Field Office IRS", #12 Additional Page(s) State Court Docket Sheet) (Orozco, Christian)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3, 4. Tue Apr 19 16:35:02 CDT 2022 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas Field Office IRS
Represented By: Christian A. Orozco
Represented By: Christian A Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?