Billingslea v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Darrell Billingslea
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 3:2022cv00999
Filed: May 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16,17. Fri Jul 1 09:15:26 CDT 2022 (crt)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL of a Magistrate Judge order to the District Judge by Darrell Billingslea. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (ykp)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL of a Magistrate Judge order to the District Judge by Darrell Billingslea. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (ygl)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re: the #14 Motion to Produce 2254 Consideration. If he is seeking a ruling on his habeas petition, on 6/16/2022, it was recommended that his petition be denied as time-barred. His motion is DENIED AS MOOT. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 6/24/2022) (mcrd)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:15. Fri Jun 24 09:20:27 CDT 2022 (crt)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION To Produce 2254 Consideration filed by Darrell Billingslea. (ndt)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation: Based on the relevant filings and applicable law, the Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody, received on 5/3/2022 (doc. #3 ), should be DENIED with prejudice as barred by the statute of limitations. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 6/16/2022) (mcrd)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. Thu Jun 16 09:07:29 CDT 2022 (crt)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting the #11 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 6/14/2022) (mcrd)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Tue Jun 14 14:51:20 CDT 2022 (crt)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Darrell Billingslea. (oyh)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: the #9 Notice to Correct Deficency [sic]. To the extent that the notice may be liberally construed as a motion for extension of the petitioner's deadline to either pay the $5 filing fee for a habeas case or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis with the required certificate of inmate trust account, the motion is DENIED AS MOOT because his deadline has already been extended by 30 days in the order dated 6/8/2022 (doc. #8 ). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 6/10/2022) (mcrd)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Fri Jun 10 10:21:30 CDT 2022 (crt)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE to Correct Deficency filed by Darrell Billingslea. (jmg)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Before the Court is correspondence from the petitioner, received on 6/7/2022 (doc. #7 ), which states that he did not receive the Notice of Deficiency and Order dated 5/5/2022 (doc. #5 ), until 5/31/2022, because he has just been transferred to another facility. The petitioner's letter is liberally construed as a motion for extension of that deadline, and it is GRANTED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 6/8/2022) (mcrd)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Wed Jun 8 09:26:14 CDT 2022 (crt)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Notice of Deficiency Order filed by Darrell Billingslea. (mla)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. remailed per #6 Notice of Change Address Wed May 25 09:47:42 CDT 2022 (crt)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Darrell Billingslea. New address: TDCJ Cotulla Transfer Facility, 610 FM 624, Cotulla, TX 78014. (sxf)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Darrell Billingslea must address the following deficiency: He must either pay the $5 filing fee for a habeas case or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis with the required certificate of inmate trust account. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 5/5/2022) (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (oyh)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Thu May 5 15:40:29 CDT 2022 (crt)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Wed May 4 15:22:43 CDT 2022 (crt)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Darrell Billingslea re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (sxf)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Darrell Billingslea. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sxf)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sxf)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sxf) Modified on 5/4/2022 (sxf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Billingslea v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darrell Billingslea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?