Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Pink Lounge Private Club Inc et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Pink Lounge Private Club Inc, Vegetius Group Inc, Rickey R Booker, Timothy Douglas, Sr. and Jonathan Biley-Smith
Case Number: 3:2022cv01016
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Joe Hand Promotions Inc against Pink Lounge Private Club Inc, Jonathan Biley-Smith, Rickey R Booker. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/22/2022) (mjr)
June 21, 2022 Filing 14 Appendix in Support filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc re #13 MOTION for Default Judgment against Jonathan Biley-Smith, Rickey R Booker, Pink Lounge Private Club Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) B(1), #4 Exhibit(s) B(2), #5 Exhibit(s) C, #6 Exhibit(s) C(1), #7 Exhibit(s) C(2), #8 Exhibit(s) C(3), #9 Exhibit(s) C(4), #10 Exhibit(s) C(5), #11 Exhibit(s) D, #12 Exhibit(s) D(1)) (King, Jamie)
June 21, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment against Jonathan Biley-Smith, Rickey R Booker, Pink Lounge Private Club Inc filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Default Judgment) (King, Jamie)
June 14, 2022 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jonathan Biley-Smith, Rickey R Booker, Pink Lounge Private Club Inc. (mjr)
June 14, 2022 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to issue Entry of Default against Defendants, Pink Lounge Private Club Inc., Rickey R. Booker, and Jonathan Biley-Smith filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s), #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Proposed Order Entry of Default) (King, Jamie)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Although the defendants Pink Lounge Private Club, Inc., d/b/a Pink Lounge and d/b/a Pink Lounge Private Club ("Pink Lounge"), Rickey R. Booker ("Booker"), and Jonathan Biley-Smith ("Biley-Smith") are in default, the plaintiff has failed to move for entries of default and default judgments. Unless the plaintiff moves for such relief by June 21, 2022, its claims against Pink Lounge, Booker, and Biley-Smith will be dismissed without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/7/2022) (chmb)
June 7, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rickey R Booker; served on 5/14/2022. (King, Jamie)
June 7, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jonathan Biley-Smith; served on 5/14/2022. (King, Jamie)
June 7, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Pink Lounge Private Club Inc; served on 5/14/2022. (King, Jamie)
May 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without local counsel (docket entry 5) is GRANTED. The plaintiff may proceed without designation of local counsel in this matter. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/8/2022) (chmb)
May 5, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (King, Jamie)
May 5, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jonathan Biley-Smith, Rickey R Booker, Timothy Douglas, Sr, Pink Lounge Private Club Inc, Vegetius Group Inc. (ygl)
May 5, 2022 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl)
May 5, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (King, Jamie)
May 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12804208) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Pink Lounge Private Club Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pink Lounge Private Club Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vegetius Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickey R Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Douglas, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Biley-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?