DDC Technology LLC v. Emerge Technologies Inc et al
Plaintiff: DDC Technology, LLC and DDC Technology LLC
Defendant: Emerge Technologies, Inc. doing business as Utopia 360, Structural Graphics, LLC doing business as Red Paper Plane, Pyrite Vr Ltd doing business as Maxbox VR, HMD TECH SARL doing business as Homido, Landsberg Orora, Google LLC, Emerge Technologies Inc doing business as Utopia 360 and Structural Graphics LLC doing business as Red Paper Plane
Case Number: 3:2022cv01263
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to HMD TECH SARL. Waiver sent on 6/15/2022. (Haller, Timothy)
July 27, 2022 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Pyrite VR Ltd. Waiver sent on 6/15/2022. (Haller, Timothy)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #26 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Emerge Technologies, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Emerge Technologies, Inc.'s responsive pleading is now due on or before August 22, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/12/2022) (chmb)
July 12, 2022 Filing 26 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer for Defendant Emerge Technologies, Inc. filed by DDC Technology LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haller, Timothy)
July 12, 2022 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Emerge Technologies Inc ; served on 7/1/2022. (Haller, Timothy)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #23 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Landsberg Orora to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Landsberg Orora's responsive pleading is now due on or before August 22, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/7/2022) (chmb)
July 6, 2022 Filing 23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer for Defendant Landsberg Orora filed by DDC Technology LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haller, Timothy)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Structural Graphics, LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Structural Graphics, LLC's responsive pleading is now due on or before August 22, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/6/2022) (chmb)
July 5, 2022 Filing 21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer for Defendant Structural Graphics, LLC filed by DDC Technology LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haller, Timothy)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Google LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Google LLC's responsive pleading is now due on or before August 22, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/1/2022) (chmb)
June 30, 2022 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer for Defendant Google LLC filed by DDC Technology LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haller, Timothy)
June 27, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Structural Graphics LLC, served on 6/17/2022. (Haller, Timothy)
June 22, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Landsberg Orora ; served on 6/16/2022. (Haller, Timothy)
June 22, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Google LLC ; served on 6/16/2022. (Haller, Timothy)
June 13, 2022 Filing 15 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (sxf)
June 13, 2022 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Emerge Technologies Inc, Google LLC, HMD TECH SARL, Landsberg Orora, Pyrite VR Ltd, Structural Graphics LLC. (sxf)
June 10, 2022 Filing 13 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sxf)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gabriel I. Opatken. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 6/10/2022) (chmb)
June 10, 2022 Filing 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Gabriel I. Opatken (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12887621) filed by DDC Technology, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haller, Timothy)
June 10, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy J. Haller for Steven E. Aldous on behalf of DDC Technology, LLC. (Haller, Timothy)
June 10, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to issue Summons for Google LLC filed by DDC Technology, LLC. (Haller, Timothy)
June 10, 2022 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to issue Summons for Landsberg Orora filed by DDC Technology, LLC. (Haller, Timothy)
June 10, 2022 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to issue Summons for HMD TECH SARL filed by DDC Technology, LLC. (Haller, Timothy)
June 10, 2022 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to issue Summons for Pyrite Vr Ltd filed by DDC Technology, LLC. (Haller, Timothy)
June 10, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons for Structural Graphics, LLC filed by DDC Technology, LLC. (Haller, Timothy)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons for Emerge Technologies, Inc. filed by DDC Technology, LLC. (Haller, Timothy)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark filed by DDC Technology, LLC (Haller, Timothy)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DDC Technology, LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Haller, Timothy)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Emerge Technologies, Inc., Google LLC, HMD TECH SARL, Landsberg Orora, Pyrite Vr Ltd, Structural Graphics, LLC filed by DDC Technology, LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12887237) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - United States Patent No. 9,420,075, #2 Exhibit(s) B - United States Patent No. 9,811,184, #3 Exhibit(s) C - United States Patent No. 10,528,199, #4 Exhibit(s) D - United States Patent No. 11,093,000, #5 Exhibit(s) E - United States Patent No. 11,093,001, #6 Exhibit(s) F - United States Provisional Application No. 62/025,376, #7 Exhibit(s) G - United States Provisional Application No. 62/161,857, #8 Exhibit(s) H - WORKS WITH GOOGLE CARDBOARD - VIEWER PROFILE & BADGE GUIDELINES VERSION 1.0 - APRIL 2015, #9 Exhibit(s) I - Google Schematic - Button - Conductive Pillow, #10 Exhibit(s) J - Google Schematic - Button - Conductive Strip, #11 Exhibit(s) K - Google Schematic - Lens, #12 Exhibit(s) L - Google Schematic - Viewer - Body, #13 Exhibit(s) M - GOOGLE CARDBOARD - TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION VERSION 2.0 - AUGUST 2015, #14 Exhibit(s) N - CARDBOARD V2 ARTWORK (1:1 SCALE) July 2015, #15 Exhibit(s) O - WORKS WITH GOOGLE CARDBOARD - GUIDELINES AND BEST PRACTICES VERSION 2.0 - AUGUST 2015, #16 Exhibit(s) P - Webarchive: Manufacture Cardboard Google VR, #17 Exhibit(s) Q - Specifications for viewer design - Cardboard Manufacturer Help, #18 Exhibit(s) R - Google Cardboard (I/O 2015) Technical Specification July 2015, v2.0, #19 Exhibit(s) S - Cardboard - by Google / Core77 Design Awards, #20 Exhibit(s) T - Orora | A cardboard breakthrough brings virtual reality into the everyday, #21 Exhibit(s) U - Virtual Viewers, #22 Exhibit(s) V - Custom Branded Google Cardboard | Maxbox VR, #23 Exhibit(s) W - Custom VR Google cardboard (inspired) V2 - Deluxe | Maxbox VR, #24 Exhibit(s) X - SleekPeeks Cardboard Virtual Reality Viewer, #25 Exhibit(s) Y - Homido Grab En Homido; Homido V2 en Homido; Products Homido; Homido Casques de ralit virtuelle mobile, VR headset, google cardboard; Homido V2 Homido; and Homido Grab Homido, #26 Cover Sheet) (Haller, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DDC Technology LLC v. Emerge Technologies Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DDC Technology, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Haller
Represented By: Gabriel I Opatken
Represented By: Steven E Aldous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DDC Technology LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Haller
Represented By: Gabriel I Opatken
Represented By: Steven E Aldous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerge Technologies, Inc. doing business as Utopia 360
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Structural Graphics, LLC doing business as Red Paper Plane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pyrite Vr Ltd doing business as Maxbox VR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMD TECH SARL doing business as Homido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landsberg Orora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerge Technologies Inc doing business as Utopia 360
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Structural Graphics LLC doing business as Red Paper Plane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?