United States of America v. King et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Suzanne Winslow King, David Winslow, Texas Workforce Commission and Dallas County Tax Assessor-Collector
Claimant: Dallas County, Texas, City of Dallas, Dallas Independent School District, Parkland Hospital District, Dallas County Community College District and Dallas County School Equalization Fund
Case Number: 3:2022cv02157
Filed: September 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to file motions for default judgment (docket entry 17) is GRANTED. Accordingly, the plaintiff shall file its motions for default judgment against the defendants David Winslow and Suzanne Winslow King by December 19, 2022. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 11/18/2022) (chmb)
November 17, 2022 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Motions for Default Judgment filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Adams, David)
November 9, 2022 Filing 16 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Suzanne Winslow King, David Winslow. (ygl)
November 8, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Suzanne Winslow King Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a) filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order) (Adams, David) Modified on 11/9/2022 (ygl).
November 8, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant David Winslow Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a) filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order) (Adams, David) Modified on 11/9/2022 (ygl).
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Although the defendants David Winslow ("Winslow") and Suzanne Winslow King ("Winslow King") are in default, the plaintiff has failed to move for entries of default and default judgments. Unless the plaintiff moves for such relief by November 17, 2022, its claims against Winslow and Winslow King will be dismissed without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 11/2/2022) (chmb)
October 25, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Workforce Commission. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Sauer, Kevin) (Main Document 12 replaced/flattened PDF on 10/26/2022) (ygl).
October 25, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Texas Workforce Commission. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Kevin R Sauer added to party Texas Workforce Commission(pty:dft) (Sauer, Kevin)
October 24, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Verified Claim of Dallas County, Texas et al. filed by City of Dallas, Dallas County Community College District, Dallas County School Equalization Fund, Dallas County Tax Assessor-Collector, Dallas County, Texas, Dallas Independent School District, Parkland Hospital District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Bird, Douglas)
October 24, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by City of Dallas, Dallas County Community College District, Dallas County School Equalization Fund, Dallas County Tax Assessor-Collector, Dallas County, Texas, Dallas Independent School District, Parkland Hospital District. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party City of Dallas(pty:clm), Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party Dallas County Community College District(pty:clm), Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party Dallas County School Equalization Fund(pty:clm), Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party Dallas County Tax Assessor-Collector(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party Dallas County, Texas(pty:clm), Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party Dallas Independent School District(pty:clm), Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party Parkland Hospital District(pty:clm) (Bird, Douglas)
October 24, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dallas County, Texas, City of Dallas, Dallas Independent School District, Parkland Hospital District, Dallas County Community College District, Dallas County School Equalization Fund. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Bird, Douglas)
October 13, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to David Winslow; served on 10/5/2022. (Adams, David)
October 13, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Suzanne Winslow King; served on 10/8/2022. (Adams, David)
September 29, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dallas County Tax Assessor-Collector, Suzanne Winslow King, Texas Workforce Commission, David Winslow. (ndt)
September 28, 2022 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
September 28, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Adams, David)
September 28, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summonses to Suzanne Winslow King, David Winslow, Texas Workforce Commission, and Dallas County Tax Assessor-Collector filed by United States of America. (Adams, David)
September 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Agreed Judgment, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Declaration Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1746 of Danny L. Sobities, #3 Cover Sheet) (Adams, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: David G Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Winslow King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Workforce Commission
Represented By: Kevin R Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas County Tax Assessor-Collector
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dallas County, Texas
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: City of Dallas
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dallas Independent School District
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Parkland Hospital District
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dallas County Community College District
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dallas County School Equalization Fund
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?