Westchester Fire Insurance Company v. Victaulic Company
Plaintiff: Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Victaulic Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv02614
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: The jury trial is scheduled on this Court's two-week docket beginning 12/4/2023 at 9:00 AM before Judge Brantley Starr. Pretrial Conference set for 11/27/2023. Joinder of Parties due by 2/7/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 2/7/2023. Deadline for mediation is on or before 7/15/2023. Discovery due by 7/1/2023. Joint Status Report due by 7/22/2023. Motions due by 7/29/2023. Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/20/2023. Pretrial Materials due by 11/20/2023. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 1/17/2023) (chmb)
January 13, 2023 Filing 9 Joint Submission on Discovery Matters by Westchester Fire Insurance Company. Related document: #6 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal. (Dendinger, James)
December 16, 2022 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge David L. Horan assigned to this case pursuant to Special Order 3-346 for matters that may be referred. (axm)
December 14, 2022 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Victaulic Company. (Jacobs, Annie)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND PROPOSAL FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Proposal shall be filed on or before 1/14/2023. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 12/5/2022) (ndt)
November 28, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Victaulic Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (MacNamara, Ashley)
November 22, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Westchester Fire Insurance Company. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Dendinger, James)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Victaulic Company. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Jacobs, Annie)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Victaulic Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13317826) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Jacobs, Annie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westchester Fire Insurance Company v. Victaulic Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: James D Dendinger
Represented By: Cozen O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victaulic Company
Represented By: Annie Jo Jacobs
Represented By: Ashley A MacNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?