United States of America v. Stacey et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: John Dee Stacey, Emma Marie Stanley, Arts Investments, LLC, James Kent MacKinlay, Shirley Fey Stacey Comans, Dallas County, Texas, Maricopa County, Arizona, Arts Investments LLC, Dallas County Texas and Maricopa County Arizona
Claimant: Parkland Hospital District, Dallas County College District, Dallas County School Equalization Fund, City of Grand Prairie and Grand Prairie Independent School District
Case Number: 3:2023cv00006
Filed: January 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: A Joe Fish
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2023 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Emma Marie Stanley. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Coffin, David)
March 3, 2023 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Emma Marie Stanley. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney David Brandon Coffin added to party Emma Marie Stanley(pty:dft) (Coffin, David)
February 28, 2023 Filing 24 Appendix in Support filed by United States of America re #22 Response/Objection, #23 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, United States' Appendix in Support of its Response to Motion to Dismiss of Defendant James Kent MacKinlay, As Trustee of The Ruby 2015 Revocable Trust (Notinger, Ramona)
February 28, 2023 Filing 23 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by United States of America re #22 Response/Objection United States' Brief in Support of its Response to Motion to Dismiss of Defendant James Kent MacKinlay, As Trustee of The Ruby 2015 Revocable Trust (Notinger, Ramona)
February 28, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by United States of America re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Notinger, Ramona)
February 27, 2023 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Arts Investments LLC ; served on 2/17/2023. (Notinger, Ramona)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Shirley Fey Stacey Comans answer due 3/22/2023. No further extensions will be granted. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 2/22/2023) (ndt)
February 22, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:20. Wed Feb 22 14:57:54 CST 2023 (crt)
February 21, 2023 Filing 19 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Shirley Fey Stacey Comans (Budd, Paul)
February 17, 2023 Filing 18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Shirley Fey Stacey Comans (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Budd, Paul)
February 17, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Anthony Villa, Jr on behalf of Shirley Fey Stacey Comans. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Villa, Michael)
February 17, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul McLendon Budd on behalf of Shirley Fey Stacey Comans. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Budd, Paul)
February 13, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Shirley Fey Stacey Comans ; served on 1/30/2023; as to Maricopa County Arizona ; served on 1/25/2023. (Notinger, Ramona) Modified text on 2/14/2023 (mms).
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Referring Motion re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 2/9/2023) (oyh)
February 9, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:14. Thu Feb 9 15:37:05 CST 2023 (crt)
February 8, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James Kent MacKinlay. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (acm)
February 7, 2023 Filing 12 Appendix in Support filed by James Kent MacKinlay re #11 Statement of Facts in Support of Motion. (acm)
February 7, 2023 Filing 11 Statement of Facts in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by James Kent MacKinlay re #10 MOTION to Dismiss. (acm)
February 7, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Kent MacKinlay. (acm)
January 25, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Verified Claim of Dallas County, Texas, et al. filed by City of Grand Prairie, Dallas County College District, Dallas County School Equalization Fund, Dallas County Texas, Grand Prairie Independent School District, Parkland Hospital District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Bird, Douglas)
January 25, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by City of Grand Prairie, Dallas County College District, Dallas County School Equalization Fund, Dallas County Texas, Grand Prairie Independent School District, Parkland Hospital District. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party City of Grand Prairie(pty:clm), Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party Dallas County College District(pty:clm), Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party Dallas County School Equalization Fund(pty:clm), Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party Dallas County Texas(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party Grand Prairie Independent School District(pty:clm), Attorney Douglas Steve Bird added to party Parkland Hospital District(pty:clm) (Bird, Douglas) Modified text on 1/26/2023 (mms).
January 25, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Parkland Hospital District, Dallas County College District, Dallas County School Equalization Fund, City of Grand Prairie, Grand Prairie Independent School District. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Bird, Douglas)
January 4, 2023 Filing 6 Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Sam A. Lindsay for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:23-cv-006-L. (axm)
January 4, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Arts Investments LLC, Shirley Fey Stacey Comans, Dallas County Texas, James Kent MacKinlay, Maricopa County Arizona, John Dee Stacey, Emma Marie Stanley. (mms)
January 3, 2023 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms)
January 3, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Notinger, Ramona)
January 3, 2023 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summonses to All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Notinger, Ramona) (Main Document 2 replaced to flatten pdf on 1/4/2023) (mms). Modified on 1/4/2023 (mms).
January 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Notinger, Ramona) (Attachment 1 replaced to flatten pdf on 1/4/2023) (mms). Modified on 1/4/2023 (mms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Stacey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ramona S Notinger
Represented By: Christian A Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Dee Stacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emma Marie Stanley
Represented By: David Brandon Coffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arts Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Kent MacKinlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Fey Stacey Comans
Represented By: Michael Anthony Villa, Jr
Represented By: Paul McLendon Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas County, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County, Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arts Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas County Texas
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Parkland Hospital District
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dallas County College District
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dallas County School Equalization Fund
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: City of Grand Prairie
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Grand Prairie Independent School District
Represented By: Douglas Steve Bird
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?