David et al v. Girardi et al
Plaintiff: Alkiviades David, Alki David Productions INC, Hologram USA, Filmon TV LTD, Filmon TV INC and Swissx
Defendant: Thomas Girardi, Gloria Allred, Lisa Bloom, Nathan Goldberg, Renee Mochkatel, Dolores Y Leal, Leah Wilson, Gavin Newsom, Joseph Chora, Allred Maroko & Goldberg, The State Bar of California, Elizabeth Taylor, Mahim Khan, Chasity Jones, Lauren Reeves, Comcast INC and Comcast Ventures LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00108
Filed: January 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of USCA as to #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Alki David Productions INC. IT IS ORDERED that the appeal is DISMISSED for want of jurisdiction. (svc)
February 3, 2023 USCA Case Number 23-10100 in USCA5 for #11 Notice of Appeal filed by Alki David Productions INC. (svc)
February 2, 2023 Case transferred from NDTX has been opened in Central District of California as case number 2:23-cv-00736. (mlb)
January 30, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #10 Memorandum Opinion and Order,, to the Fifth Circuit by Alki David Productions INC. Filing fee $505, receipt number BTXNDC-13481228. T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Lieberman, Mark)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Memorandum Opinion and Order: The court denies without prejudice Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #5 ). Accordingly, the court transfers this action to the Western Division of the Central District of California as the proper venue under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The clerk of the court shall effect the transfer in accordance with the usual procedure. Because the Motion (Doc. #7 ) amended Plaintiffs' previous motions for temporary restraining orders, the court denies as moot those two Emergency Motions for Temporary Restraining Order (Docs. #2 and #3 ). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 1/27/2023) (ykp)
January 27, 2023 Interdistrict Transfer to Western Division of the Central District of California; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in Western Division of the Central District of California. (ykp)
January 22, 2023 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by Alki David Productions INC re: #5 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1- 42 USC 1983 Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) 2- California Bar Report on Thomas Girardi, #3 Exhibit(s) 3- ORDER Court of Appeals Chasity Jones, #4 Exhibit(s) 4- Morrison v Foerster on Sanctions, #5 Declaration(s) Exhibit 6 - Attorney Matthew Huzaineh, #6 Declaration(s) Exhibit 7 - Ronald Goffschalk, #7 Declaration(s) Exhibit - 8 Kristina Eisenacher, #8 Declaration(s) Exhibit - 9 Michael Warnken) (Lieberman, Mark) Modified text on 1/24/2023 (mms).
January 22, 2023 Filing 8 Supplemental Document by Alki David Productions INC as to #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Lieberman, Mark)
January 22, 2023 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Relief by Permanent Injunction filed by Alki David Productions INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Temporary Restraining Order) (Lieberman, Mark) Modified event and text on 1/23/2023 (sxf).
January 22, 2023 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Alki David Productions INC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Lieberman, Mark)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Complaint does not comply with this court's Local Rules. Specifically, the Motion does not include notice of interested parties and related cases as required by Local Rule 3.3. Plaintiffs are to show cause in writing why this action should not be transferred to a federal district court in California for the convenience of the parties and in the interest of justice. Accordingly, the court determines that Plaintiffs must cure these deficiencies no later than 1/24/2023. Failure to do so will result in the courts dismissal of the Complaint and emergency motions without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 1/17/2023) (axm)
January 13, 2023 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cea)
January 13, 2023 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Hearing re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Alkiviades David filed by ALKIVIADES DAVID. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) 1) (Lieberman, Mark) Modified text on 1/17/2023 (sxf).
January 13, 2023 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ALKIVIADES DAVID (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting TRO, #2 Declaration(s) Cert of Attorney, #3 Declaration(s) Cert of Conference, #4 Exhibit(s) 1, #5 Exhibit(s) 2 Affidavit of Alkiviades David, #6 Exhibit(s) 3, #7 Exhibit(s) 4, #8 Exhibit(s) 5) (Lieberman, Mark)
January 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by ALKIVIADES DAVID. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13442202) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet COVER SHEET, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7) (Lieberman, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David et al v. Girardi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alkiviades David
Represented By: Mark Joel Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alki David Productions INC
Represented By: Mark Joel Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hologram USA
Represented By: Mark Joel Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Filmon TV LTD
Represented By: Mark Joel Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Filmon TV INC
Represented By: Mark Joel Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swissx
Represented By: Mark Joel Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Girardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Allred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Mochkatel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolores Y Leal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Chora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allred Maroko & Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State Bar of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mahim Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chasity Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Ventures LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?