Moore v. NewRez LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donald C. Moore and Donald C Moore
Defendant: NewRez LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Trustee for the Pooling and Servicing Agreement dated as of August 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-WHQ4 and Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 3:2023cv00789
Filed: April 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Referring Judge: David L Horan
2 Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Real Property: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 11/7/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2024. Discovery due by 1/30/2024. Motions due by 2/29/2024. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 5/23/2023) (mcrd)
May 23, 2023 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Horan: Scheduling Conference held on 5/23/2023. Order to enter. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Jack B Peacock, Jr.; Defense - Camille Griffith. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :10. (mcrd)
May 18, 2023 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Donald C Moore. (Peacock, Jack)
May 4, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Donald C Moore. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Peacock, Jack)
April 27, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing State Court Notice of Removal re: #8 Order filed by NewRez LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank NA (Griffith, Camille)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING 26(F) REPORT AND SETTING 16(B) CONFERENCE: Plaintiff's counsel and Defendant's counsel must confer in person not later than May 11, 2023. By May 18, 2023, the parties must submit a joint written Rule 26(f) report. On May 23, 2023 at 2:00 p.m., the Court will conduct a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b) pretrial scheduling conference in Courtroom 1561, 1100 Commerce Street, Dallas, Texas 75242 before United States Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/27/2023) (mcrd)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER ON FILING MATERIALS UNDER SEAL. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/27/2023) (mcrd)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING FILING OF STATE COURT NOTICE. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/27/2023) (mcrd)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/27/2023) (mcrd)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE: This case is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 4/26/2023) (axm)
April 25, 2023 Case Reassigned to Judge Sam A. Lindsay. Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater no longer assigned to the case per Special Order No. 3-342. (ykp)
April 13, 2023 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (acm)
April 13, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Trustee for the Pooling and Servicing Agreement dated as of August 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-WHQ4. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Griffith, Camille)
April 13, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Griffith, Camille)
April 13, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NewRez LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Griffith, Camille)
April 13, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Trustee for the Pooling and Servicing Agreement dated as of August 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-WHQ4, PHH Mortgage Corporation, NewRez LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13663910) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Z) (Griffith, Camille)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. NewRez LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald C. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald C Moore
Represented By: Jack B Peacock, Jr
Represented By: David M Vereeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC
Represented By: Camille Griffith
Represented By: Matthew K Hansen
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Camille Griffith
Represented By: Matthew K Hansen
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Trustee for the Pooling and Servicing Agreement dated as of August 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc. Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates Series 2005-WHQ4
Represented By: Camille Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Camille Griffith
Represented By: Matthew K Hansen
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?