Fifth Third Bank v. Eshetu et al
Plaintiff: Fifth Third Bank
Defendant: Tenagne Eshetu, Minitiwab Tilahun, Unknown Heirs of Tsigereda Tilahun and Wells Fargo USA Holdings Inc
Case Number: 3:2023cv00846
Filed: April 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Real Property: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2023 Filing 22 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Fifth Third Bank. (Cronenwett, Mark)
July 20, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Appoint Attorney ad Litem filed by Fifth Third Bank (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lopez, Vivian)
June 28, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Default Judgment against Tenagne Eshetu, Minitiwab Tilahun filed by Fifth Third Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Vivian Nahir Lopez added to party Fifth Third Bank(pty:pla) (Lopez, Vivian)
June 16, 2023 Filing 19 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Tenagne Eshetu, Minitiwab Tilahun. (sxf)
June 15, 2023 Filing 18 Request for Clerk to issue REQUEST FOR CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed by Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Cronenwett, Mark)
June 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND PROPOSAL FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/31/2023. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/10/2023) (axm)
June 9, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Publication as to Unknown Heirs of Tsigereda Tilahun ; served on 5/19/2023, 5/26/2023, 6/2/2023, 6/9/2023. (Cronenwett, Mark) Modified text on 6/12/2023 (mms).
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Electronic Standing Order - If they have not already done so, all attorneys appearing in this case must file a Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements on the docket attesting that they have read, and will comply with, the judge-specific requirements for this Court, including the Court's order concerning generative artificial intelligence. The judge-specific requirements and a template Certificate may be found at: # Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. To file the Certificate, please use the event entitled Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. This event is located in the Other Documents selection, which is under the Other Filings category of the Civil page in ECF. Please contact the ECF help desk at 214-753-2633 for filing assistance. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/8/2023) (rekc) Modified on 6/8/2023 (rekc).
May 15, 2023 Filing 14 Summons Issued by Publication as to Unknown Heirs of Tsigereda Tilahun. (ykp)
May 12, 2023 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to issue Summons by Publication filed by Fifth Third Bank. (Cronenwett, Mark)
May 12, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tenagne Eshetu, Minitiwab Tilahun, Unknown Heirs of Tsigereda Tilahun filed by Fifth Third Bank. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Cronenwett, Mark)
May 10, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tenagne Eshetu ; served on 5/1/2023. (Lopez, Vivian)
May 10, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Minitiwab Tilahun; served on 5/1/2023. (Lopez, Vivian)
May 1, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Defendant Wells Fargo USA Holdings Inc without Prejudice filed by Fifth Third Bank (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cronenwett, Mark) Modified text on 5/1/2023 (sxf).
April 26, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Unknown Heirs of Tsigereda Tilahun. (oyh)
April 25, 2023 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to issue Summons by Publication filed by Unknown Heirs of Tsigereda Tilahun. (Lopez, Vivian)
April 21, 2023 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc)
April 21, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Tenagne Eshetu, Minitiwab Tilahun, Unknown Heirs of Tsigereda Tilahun, Wells Fargo USA Holdings Inc. (agc)
April 21, 2023 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc)
April 21, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Fifth Third Bank, National Association. (Lopez, Vivian)
April 21, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fifth Third Bank, National Association. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Lopez, Vivian)
April 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Fifth Third Bank, National Association. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13685012) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet) (Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fifth Third Bank v. Eshetu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Mark D Cronenwett
Represented By: Vivian Nahir Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenagne Eshetu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minitiwab Tilahun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Heirs of Tsigereda Tilahun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo USA Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?