Horton et al v. Heppner et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Horton and Frank Moore
Defendant: Brad K Heppner, Peter T Cangany, Jr, Thomas O Hicks, Dennis P Lockhart, Bruce W Schnitzer, The Beneficient Company Group LP and Whitley Penn LLP
Case Number: 3:2023cv01230
Filed: May 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2023 Filing 16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney James J. Farrell (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13886921) filed by Whitley Penn LLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney John T Cox, III added to party Whitley Penn LLP(pty:dft) (Cox, John)
July 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND PROPOSAL FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/4/2023. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 7/15/2023) (sxf)
July 13, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Whitley Penn LLP. Waiver sent on 7/5/2023. (Cox, John)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul D. Malmfeldt. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/26/2023) (chmb)
June 23, 2023 Filing 12 Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Malmfeldt, Paul)
June 23, 2023 Filing 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by Thomas Horton, Frank Moore (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Paul Downing Malmfeldt added to party Thomas Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Downing Malmfeldt added to party Frank Moore(pty:pla) (Malmfeldt, Paul)
June 16, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Peter T Cangany, Jr. Waiver sent on 6/15/2023; Brad K Heppner. Waiver sent on 6/15/2023; Thomas O Hicks. Waiver sent on 6/15/2023; Dennis P Lockhart. Waiver sent on 6/15/2023; Bruce W Schnitzer. Waiver sent on 6/15/2023; The Beneficient Company Group LP. Waiver sent on 6/15/2023. (Stockham, Michael)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel C. Girard. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/13/2023) (chmb)
June 9, 2023 Filing 8 Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Girard, Daniel)
June 9, 2023 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13804257) filed by Thomas Horton, Frank Moore (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Daniel C Girard added to party Thomas Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel C Girard added to party Frank Moore(pty:pla) (Girard, Daniel)
June 8, 2023 Filing 6 ***DISREGARD/FILED IN THE WRONG CASE PER ATTORNEY. See doc. #5 for the correct image.***Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Cox, Spencer) Modified on 6/8/2023 (ykp). Modified text on 6/12/2023 (mms).
June 8, 2023 Filing 5 Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Cox, Spencer)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Electronic Standing Order - If they have not already done so, all attorneys appearing in this case must file a Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements on the docket attesting that they have read, and will comply with, the judge-specific requirements for this Court, including the Court's order concerning generative artificial intelligence. The judge-specific requirements and a template Certificate may be found at: # Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. To file the Certificate, please use the event entitled Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. This event is located in the Other Documents selection, which is under the Other Filings category of the Civil page in ECF. Please contact the ECF help desk at 214-753-2633 for filing assistance. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/8/2023) (twd)
May 26, 2023 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cfk)
May 26, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thomas Horton, Frank Moore. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Cox, Spencer)
May 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Frank Moore, Thomas Horton. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13773013) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Related Case Notice) (Cox, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton et al v. Heppner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Horton
Represented By: Spencer Morgan Lee Cox
Represented By: Paul Downing Malmfeldt
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Represented By: Daniel C Girard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Moore
Represented By: Spencer Morgan Lee Cox
Represented By: Paul Downing Malmfeldt
Represented By: Daniel C Girard
Represented By: Warren T Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad K Heppner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter T Cangany, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas O Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis P Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce W Schnitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Beneficient Company Group LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitley Penn LLP
Represented By: James J Farrell
Represented By: John T Cox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?