AdvantaClean Systems LLC v. Edmondson Enterprises LLC et al
Plaintiff: AdvantaClean Systems LLC
Defendant: Edmondson Enterprises LLC and James Edmondson
Case Number: 3:2023cv01654
Filed: July 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2023 Filing 30 RESPONSE filed by AdvantaClean Systems LLC re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to Compel Arbitration and Stay (Sciremammano, Frank)
September 15, 2023 Filing 29 Appendix in Support filed by James Edmondson, Edmondson Enterprises LLC re #28 Response/Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of James Edmondson, #2 Exhibit(s) A-1, #3 Exhibit(s) A-2, #4 Exhibit(s) A-3, #5 Exhibit(s) A-4, #6 Exhibit(s) A-5, #7 Exhibit(s) A-6, #8 Exhibit(s) A-7, #9 Exhibit(s) A-8, #10 Exhibit(s) A-9, #11 Exhibit(s) A-10, #12 Exhibit(s) Maaco v. Ghirimoldi) (Patel, Himanshu)
September 15, 2023 Filing 28 RESPONSE filed by James Edmondson, Edmondson Enterprises LLC re: #9 MOTION for Injunction (Patel, Himanshu)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Referring #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for findings and recommendation. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/13/2023) (chmb)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion to Extend Time to File Response. Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction due by 5:00 p.m., 9/15/2023. Further, as the court determines that it has subject matter jurisdiction over this action notwithstanding Defendants' contentions regarding an agreement to arbitrate, the court denies #12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction on this ground. This ruling does not affect the referral to the magistrate judge of the remaining issues in that #12 motion, including whether arbitration should be compelled and whether this action should be stayed. Because it appears that Defendants contend that arbitrability, including the arbitrability of the injunctive relief sought by Plaintiff, should be decided by the arbitrator, the court will refer Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction to the magistrate judge for findings and recommendation to avoid inconsistent rulings and duplication of effort. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/13/2023) (chmb)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #24 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frank J. Sciremammano. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/13/2023) (chmb)
September 11, 2023 Filing 24 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Frank J. Sciremammano (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14023142) filed by AdvantaClean Systems LLC (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order of Admission for Frank J. Sciremammano) (Garcia, Samuel) (Main Document 24 replaced on 9/11/2023) (axm).
September 8, 2023 Filing 23 REPLY filed by James Edmondson, Edmondson Enterprises LLC re: #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #9 MOTION for Injunction (Beda, Jacky)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert M. Einhorn. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/8/2023) (chmb)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jacky Beda. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/8/2023) (chmb)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Himanshu M. Patel. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/8/2023) (chmb)
September 8, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by AdvantaClean Systems LLC re: #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #9 MOTION for Injunction (Garcia, Samuel) Modified text on 9/11/2023 (agc).
September 7, 2023 Filing 18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14016482) filed by James Edmondson, Edmondson Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beda, Jacky)
September 7, 2023 Filing 17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14016444) filed by James Edmondson, Edmondson Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Einhorn, Robert)
September 7, 2023 Filing 16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14016362) filed by James Edmondson, Edmondson Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Patel, Himanshu)
September 6, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #9 MOTION for Injunction filed by James Edmondson, Edmondson Enterprises LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sarles, Gary)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Referring Motion re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to Compel Arbitration and Stay Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/1/2023) (ndt)
August 31, 2023 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by James Edmondson, Edmondson Enterprises LLC re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to Compel Arbitration and Stay (Sarles, Gary)
August 31, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to Compel Arbitration and Stay filed by James Edmondson, Edmondson Enterprises LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Gary D Sarles added to party James Edmondson(pty:dft), Attorney Gary D Sarles added to party Edmondson Enterprises LLC (pty:dft) (Sarles, Gary)
August 23, 2023 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AdvantaClean Systems LLC re #9 MOTION for Injunction (Garcia, Samuel)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Before the court is Plaintiff AdvantaClean Systems, LLC's ("Plaintiff") Motion for Preliminary Injunction ("Motion") (Doc. #9 ), filed on 8/22/2023. Plaintiff is directed to effect service of the Motion and a copy of this order on Defendants. Once the Motion has been served on Defendants, they shall have 21 days to respond. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/22/2023) (oyh)
August 22, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Injunction filed by AdvantaClean Systems LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Steven Willis, #2 Exhibit(s) Appendix, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Garcia, Samuel)
August 22, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to James Edmondson, Edmondson Enterprises LLC ; served on 8/4/2023. (Garcia, Samuel) Modified docket text on 8/23/2023 (mms).
July 28, 2023 Filing 7 Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Sam A. Lindsay for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:23-cv-1654-G. (axm)
July 28, 2023 Filing 6 Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Garcia, Samuel)
July 26, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to James Edmondson, Edmondson Enterprises LLC. (oyh)
July 26, 2023 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
July 26, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AdvantaClean Systems, LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Garcia, Samuel)
July 26, 2023 Filing 2 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS (civil cover sheet) to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff AdvantaClean Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Garcia, Samuel) Modified docket text on 7/26/2023 (oyh).
July 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AdvantaClean Systems, LLC filed by AdvantaClean Systems, LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13911911) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H) (Garcia, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AdvantaClean Systems LLC v. Edmondson Enterprises LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AdvantaClean Systems LLC
Represented By: Samuel Garcia
Represented By: Frank J Sciremammano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmondson Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Gary D Sarles
Represented By: Himanshu M Patel
Represented By: Jacky Beda
Represented By: O Paul Dunagan
Represented By: Robert M Einhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Edmondson
Represented By: Gary D Sarles
Represented By: Himanshu M Patel
Represented By: Jacky Beda
Represented By: O Paul Dunagan
Represented By: Robert M Einhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?