AdvantaClean Systems LLC v. JDG Environmental LLC et al
Plaintiff: AdvantaClean Systems LLC
Defendant: JDG Environmental LLC and Joe Gillikin
Case Number: 3:2023cv01655
Filed: July 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #29 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants' Reply is due September 28, 2023. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 9/19/2023) (chmb)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Extend Time to file Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Joe Gillikin, JDG Environmental LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beda, Jacky)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Frank J. Sciremammano. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 9/12/2023) (chmb)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Frank J. Sciremammano (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14023078) filed by AdvantaClean Systems LLC (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order of Admission for Frank J. Sciremammano) (Garcia, Samuel) (Main Document 27 replaced on 9/11/2023 to flatten pdf) (axm).
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jacky Beda. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 9/8/2023) (chmb)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert M. Einhorn. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 9/8/2023) (chmb)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Himanshu M. Patel. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 9/8/2023) (chmb)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14016635) filed by Joe Gillikin, JDG Environmental LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beda, Jacky)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14016615) filed by Joe Gillikin, JDG Environmental LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Einhorn, Robert)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14016569) filed by Joe Gillikin, JDG Environmental LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Patel, Himanshu)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #17 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. The Court deems #18 Plaintiff's Response and accompanying Appendix #19 timely filed. A reply is due by September 21, 2023. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 9/7/2023) (chmb)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Appendix in Support filed by AdvantaClean Systems LLC re #18 Response/Objection (Garcia, Samuel)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by AdvantaClean Systems LLC re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Garcia, Samuel)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by AdvantaClean Systems LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Frank Sciremammano, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend the Filing Deadline for its Response) (Garcia, Samuel)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #15 Motion to Extend Time. The Court VACATES its expedited briefing schedule at Doc. 10 . The Court ORDERS expedited briefing on the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #12 ). Plaintiff's response is due by September 1, 2023, with any reply due by September 6, 2023. The Court will set a briefing schedule for the Motion for Injunction (Doc. #9 ) only after confirming it has jurisdiction over this case. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 8/25/2023) (chmb)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Extend Time of time to respond filed by Joe Gillikin, JDG Environmental LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sarles, Gary)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Appendix in Support filed by Joe Gillikin, JDG Environmental LLC re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, #13 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Sarles, Gary)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Joe Gillikin, JDG Environmental LLC re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (Sarles, Gary)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Joe Gillikin, JDG Environmental LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Gary D Sarles added to party Joe Gillikin(pty:dft), Attorney Gary D Sarles added to party JDG Environmental LLC(pty:dft) (Sarles, Gary)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AdvantaClean Systems LLC re #9 MOTION for Injunction (Garcia, Samuel)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ***Vacated per 16 Order*** ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court ORDERS expedited briefing on the pending motion at Doc. #9 . A response is due by August 29, 2023, with any reply due by September 5, 2023. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 8/22/2023) (chmb) Modified text on 8/28/2023 (sxf).
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Injunction filed by AdvantaClean Systems LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Steven Willis, #2 Exhibit(s) Appendix, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (Garcia, Samuel)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Joe Gillikin, JDG Environmental LLC ; served on 8/3/2023. (Garcia, Samuel) Modified docket text on 8/23/2023 (mms).
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Garcia, Samuel)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (sxf)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Electronic Standing Order - If they have not already done so, all attorneys appearing in this case must file a Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements on the docket attesting that they have read, and will comply with, the judge-specific requirements for this Court, including the Court's order concerning generative artificial intelligence. The judge-specific requirements and a template Certificate may be found at: # Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. To file the Certificate, please use the event entitled Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. This event is located in the Other Documents selection, which is under the Other Filings category of the Civil page in ECF. Please contact the ECF help desk at 214-753-2633 for filing assistance. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 7/26/2023) (sxf)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Joe Gillikin, JDG Environmental LLC. (sxf)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sxf)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AdvantaClean Systems, LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Garcia, Samuel)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by AdvantaClean Systems, LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13912242) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Cover Sheet) (Garcia, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AdvantaClean Systems LLC v. JDG Environmental LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AdvantaClean Systems LLC
Represented By: Samuel Garcia
Represented By: Frank J Sciremammano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JDG Environmental LLC
Represented By: Gary D Sarles
Represented By: Jacky Beda
Represented By: O Paul Dunagan
Represented By: Robert M Einhorn
Represented By: Himanshu M Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Gillikin
Represented By: Robert M Einhorn
Represented By: Gary D Sarles
Represented By: Himanshu M Patel
Represented By: Jacky Beda
Represented By: O Paul Dunagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?