Pennymac Loan Services LLC v. Beall Jr et al
Plaintiff: PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC and PennyMac Loan Services LLC
Defendant: Harold Beall, Jr., Richard Beall, Denise Beall-Jones, Michael Beall and Harold Beall, Jr
Case Number: 3:2023cv01909
Filed: August 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Real Property: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:18. Thu Oct 19 12:32:33 CDT 2023 (crt)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDARD PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER: he Joint Scheduling Proposal is due within 30 days of the date of this order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/17/2023) (axm)
October 11, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Harold Beall, Jr; served on 10/3/2023. (Haley, Cheyenne)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), this case is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Renee H. Toliver for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 10/6/2023) (twd)
October 6, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16. Fri Oct 6 11:38:58 CDT 2023 (crt)
October 4, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Harold Beall, Jr. (kaf)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court ORDERS the following: By Friday, 10/6/2023, Defendant Richard Beall must SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why the Court should not interpret his answer as admitting every allegation in PennyMac's Complaint. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the Court interpreting Beall to have admitted every allegation in the Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 9/28/2023) (twd)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court ORDERS the following: By Friday, 10/6/2023, Defendants Denise-Beall Jones and Michael Beall must SHOW CAUSE, in writing, why they have failed to file answers. Failure to comply with this Order may result in default judgments against Denise-Beall Jones and Michael Beall without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 9/28/2023) (twd)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying without prejudice #11 Motion for Substituted Service. Plaintiff must make at least one additional attempt to serve Defendant Harold Beall Jr. before renewing its motion for substituted service. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 9/28/2023) (chmb)
September 28, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Thu Sep 28 15:04:31 CDT 2023 (crt)
September 28, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13,14. Thu Sep 28 11:36:37 CDT 2023 (crt)
September 27, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Substituted Service as to Defendant Harold Beall, Jr. filed by PennyMac Loan Services LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Haley, Cheyenne)
September 26, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cheyenne D Haley on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Haley, Cheyenne)
September 19, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Richard Beall. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (cfk)
September 8, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Michael Beall; served on 9/1/2023. (Lopez, Vivian)
September 7, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Denise Beall-Jones; served on 8/31/2023. (Lopez, Vivian)
September 5, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Richard Beall; served on 8/30/2023. (Lopez, Vivian)
August 28, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Harold Beall, Jr, Michael Beall, Richard Beall, Denise Beall-Jones. (cfk)
August 25, 2023 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cfk)
August 25, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC. (Lopez, Vivian)
August 25, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Lopez, Vivian)
August 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13986954) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet) (Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennymac Loan Services LLC v. Beall Jr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Mark D Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PennyMac Loan Services LLC
Represented By: Mark D Cronenwett
Represented By: Cheyenne D Haley
Represented By: Vivian Nahir Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Beall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Beall-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Beall, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?