Jacobson et al v. Gavin et al
Plaintiff: Greg Jacobson and CPF GP 2019-1 LLC
Defendant: SG Blocks, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Safe & Green Holdings Corp and Paul Gavin
Case Number: 3:2023cv01988
Filed: September 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE filed by Paul Gavin, Safe & Green Holdings Corp re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss Partial (Barnwell, Patrick)
October 18, 2023 Filing 20 REPLY Brief in Support filed by Paul Gavin, Safe & Green Holdings Corp re: #5 Motion to Dismiss (Barnwell, Patrick) Modified text on 10/19/2023 (agc).
October 16, 2023 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CPF GP 2019-1 LLC, Greg Jacobson. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s)) (Pace, Jared)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 2/4/2025 before Judge Ada Brown. Joinder of Parties due by 4/29/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 4/29/2024. Motions due by 9/30/2024. Discovery due by 8/29/2024. Deadline for mediation is on or before 2/12/2024. Pretrial Order due by 1/7/2025. Pretrial Materials due by 1/7/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Ada Brown. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/12/2023) (axm)
October 5, 2023 Filing 17 Joint Submission on Discovery Matters by Paul Gavin, Safe & Green Holdings Corp. Related document: #12 Order,. (Barnwell, Patrick)
October 3, 2023 Filing 16 Appendix in Support filed by CPF GP 2019-1 LLC, Greg Jacobson re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Partial, #15 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Pace, Jared)
October 3, 2023 Filing 15 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by CPF GP 2019-1 LLC, Greg Jacobson re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Partial (Pace, Jared)
October 3, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Partial filed by CPF GP 2019-1 LLC, Greg Jacobson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pace, Jared)
October 3, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE filed by CPF GP 2019-1 LLC, Greg Jacobson re: #5 Motion to Dismiss (Pace, Jared)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, lead counsel are directed to meet and confer for the purpose of submitting a Joint Status Report as follows. (Joint Status Report Due Three (3) Weeks from the Date of this Order) (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 9/14/2023) (twd)
September 13, 2023 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Paul Gavin, Safe & Green Holdings Corp. (Barnwell, Patrick)
September 13, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paul Gavin, Safe & Green Holdings Corp. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Barnwell, Patrick)
September 12, 2023 Filing 9 Appendix in Support filed by Paul Gavin, Safe & Green Holdings Corp re #8 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Barnwell, Patrick)
September 12, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Paul Gavin, Safe & Green Holdings Corp. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against CPF GP 2019-1 LLC, Greg Jacobson filed by Paul Gavin, Safe & Green Holdings Corp (Barnwell, Patrick)
September 12, 2023 Filing 7 Appendix in Support filed by Paul Gavin, Safe & Green Holdings Corp re #5 Motion to Dismiss (Barnwell, Patrick)
September 12, 2023 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Paul Gavin, Safe & Green Holdings Corp re #5 Motion to Dismiss (Barnwell, Patrick)
September 12, 2023 Filing 5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Paul Gavin, Safe & Green Holdings Corp (Barnwell, Patrick)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Patrick Cory Barnwell. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 9/6/2023) (chmb)
September 5, 2023 Filing 3 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14010014) filed by Paul Gavin, Safe & Green Holdings Corp (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Patrick Cory Barnwell added to party Paul Gavin(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick Cory Barnwell added to party Safe & Green Holdings Corp(pty:dft) (Barnwell, Patrick)
September 5, 2023 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc)
September 5, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Paul Gavin, Safe & Green Holdings Corp.. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-14006682) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s)) (Ternan, Jack) (Attachment 1 replaced to Flatten PDF on 9/5/2023) (agc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobson et al v. Gavin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Safe & Green Holdings Corp
Represented By: Jack GB Ternan
Represented By: Patrick Cory Barnwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Paul Gavin
Represented By: Jack GB Ternan
Represented By: Patrick Cory Barnwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Jacobson
Represented By: Jared T S Pace
Represented By: Aaron Z Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CPF GP 2019-1 LLC
Represented By: Jared T S Pace
Represented By: Aaron Z Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Blocks, Inc.
Represented By: Jack GB Ternan
Represented By: Patrick Cory Barnwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?