Select Portfolio Servicing Inc v. Collins et al
Plaintiff: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Defendant: Evelyn Collins, Jose N. Estrada, Juan O. Martinez, Maria A. Martinez and Maria O. Martinez
Case Number: 3:2023cv02398
Filed: October 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2023 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT , Plaintiff's First against All Defendants filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Cronenwett, Mark)
December 22, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Servicemember Declaration filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc (Haley, Cheyenne)
November 30, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc re: #10 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Haley, Cheyenne)
November 30, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Evelyn Collins; served on 11/20/2023. (kcr)
November 29, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Evelyn Collins ; served on 11/20/2023. (Cronenwett, Mark)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 12/22/2023. Replies due by 1/8/2024. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/27/2023) (kaf)
November 22, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jose N. Estrada, Juan O. Martinez, Maria A. Martinez, Maria O. Martinez. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Siotos, Dean)
November 22, 2023 Filing 12 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Jose N. Estrada, Juan O. Martinez, Maria A. Martinez, Maria O. Martinez re #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s)) (Siotos, Dean)
November 22, 2023 Filing 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jose N. Estrada, Juan O. Martinez, Maria A. Martinez, Maria O. Martinez (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Dean John Siotos added to party Jose N. Estrada(pty:dft), Attorney Dean John Siotos added to party Juan O. Martinez(pty:dft), Attorney Dean John Siotos added to party Maria A. Martinez(pty:dft), Attorney Dean John Siotos added to party Maria O. Martinez(pty:dft) (Siotos, Dean)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING DIVERSITY JURISDICTION: Because Select Portfolio as the plaintiff invoking the Court's subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), has not adequately alleged Defendants citizenship, Select Portfolio must file a written response to this order to properly plead the citizenship of all defendants by November 30, 2023. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/16/2023) (mcrd)
November 9, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jose N. Estrada ; served on 11/7/2023. (Haley, Cheyenne) Modified on 11/12/2023 (axm). Modified docket text on 11/13/2023 (oyh).
November 9, 2023 Filing 8 ***PLEASE DISREGARD ENTRY PER ATTORNEY; CORRECT DOCUMENT HAS BEEN RE-FILED*** SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jose N Estrada; served on 11/7/2023 (Haley, Cheyenne) Modified event text on 11/12/2023 (axm). Modified docket text on 11/13/2023 (oyh).
November 8, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Juan O. Martinez ; served on 11/2/2023. (Haley, Cheyenne)
November 7, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance as Additional Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc (Haley, Cheyenne)
October 30, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Evelyn Collins, Jose N. Estrada, Juan O. Martinez, Maria A. Martinez, Maria O. Martinez. (oyh)
October 30, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Swernofsky, Rachael)
October 27, 2023 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
October 27, 2023 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Request for Issuance of Summons filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Swernofsky, Rachael)
October 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-14135834) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet) (Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc v. Collins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Mark D Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Represented By: Mark D Cronenwett
Represented By: Cheyenne D Haley
Represented By: Rachael Swernofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose N. Estrada
Represented By: Dean John Siotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan O. Martinez
Represented By: Dean John Siotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria A. Martinez
Represented By: Dean John Siotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria O. Martinez
Represented By: Dean John Siotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?