Reedy v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Jason Marc Reedy
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 3:2023cv02403
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE: Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation has filed a motion to dismiss all claims asserted by Plaintiff Jason Marc Reedy in his Original Petition. See Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) [Dkt. No. #13 ]. Plaintiff must file a written response to the motion by December 13, 2023. Defendant may file a reply brief, but no additional documents, by December 28, 2023. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/14/2023) (mcrd)
November 13, 2023 Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation re #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Conway, Bradley)
November 13, 2023 Filing 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Conway, Bradley)
November 8, 2023 Filing 12 Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Conway, Bradley)
November 8, 2023 Filing 11 Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Conway, Bradley)
November 6, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit(s) All Pleadings, #3 Declaration(s) Declaration of B.C, #4 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Conway, Bradley)
November 3, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Advisory to the court filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) State Court Filing) (Conway, Bradley)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Electronic Standing Order - If they have not already done so, all attorneys appearing in this case must file a Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements on the docket attesting that they have read, and will comply with, the judge-specific requirements for this Court, including the Court's order concerning generative artificial intelligence. The judge-specific requirements and a template Certificate may be found at: # Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. To file the Certificate, please use the event entitled Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. This event is located in the Other Documents selection, which is under the Other Filings category of the Civil page in ECF. Please contact the ECF help desk at 214-753-2633 for filing assistance. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/3/2023) (sxf)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL: Because Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation, as the removing defendant invoking the jurisdiction of this Court, has not adequately alleged Plaintiff's citizenship, Freedom must properly plead the citizenship of Plaintiff Jason Marc Reedy by filing and serving an amended notice of removal by Tuesday, November 14, 2023. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/31/2023) (mcrd)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING CONFERENCE AND JOINT STATUS REPORT: Plaintiff's counsel and Defendant's counsel shall confer in person or by telephone not later than November 14, 2023. The parties shall file a joint status report and proposed scheduling plan by December 5, 2023. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/31/2023) (mcrd)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/31/2023) (mcrd)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING FILING OF STATE COURT NOTICE. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/31/2023) (mcrd)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON FILING MATERIALS UNDER SEAL. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 10/31/2023) (mcrd)
October 30, 2023 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sxf)
October 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-14137411) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit(s) State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit(s) Declaration of B.C, #4 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Conway, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reedy v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Marc Reedy
Represented By: Kevin Stuart Wiley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Bradley James Conway
Represented By: Dustin Cole George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?