Granting Hands LLC v. Spencer
Plaintiff: Granting Hands, LLC and Granting Hands LLC
Defendant: Justin Spencer, RAD Exotics LLC and David Sigler
Case Number: 3:2023cv02408
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Negotiable Instrumen
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Extend Time. Responses due by 1/11/2024. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 12/20/2023) (cfk)
December 19, 2023 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Extend Deadline filed by Granting Hands LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Canada, W)
December 11, 2023 Filing 18 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to RAD Exotics LLC. (oyh)
December 8, 2023 Filing 17 Request for Clerk to issue Default filed by Granting Hands LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s)) (Canada, W)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re: #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Response due by 12/21/2023. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 12/4/2023) (cfk)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REFERENCE re: #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/30/2023) (agc)
November 30, 2023 Filing 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Justin Spencer with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schwegmann, Christopher)
November 3, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Canada, W)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Justin Spencer answer due 11/30/2023. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 11/3/2023) (oyh)
November 2, 2023 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Justin Spencer (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Park, Leo)
November 1, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to RAD Exotics LLC, David Sigler. (oyh)
November 1, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darryl J Silvera on behalf of Granting Hands LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Silvera, Darryl)
November 1, 2023 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Granting Hands LLC. (Canada, W)
November 1, 2023 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Granting Hands LLC. (Canada, W)
November 1, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by W Ralph Canada, Jr on behalf of Granting Hands LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Canada, W)
November 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donna Lee on behalf of Granting Hands LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lee, Donna)
October 30, 2023 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
October 30, 2023 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Justin Spencer. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Schwegmann, Christopher)
October 30, 2023 Filing 2 Appendix in Support filed by Justin Spencer re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, (Schwegmann, Christopher)
October 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Justin Spencer. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-14138986) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Schwegmann, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granting Hands LLC v. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granting Hands, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granting Hands LLC
Represented By: Donna Lee
Represented By: Darryl J Silvera
Represented By: W Ralph Canada, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Spencer
Represented By: Christopher J Schwegmann
Represented By: Leo Daesu Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAD Exotics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?