Timms v. ZRS Management
Plaintiff: Caleb Jones Timms
Defendant: ZRS Management and ZRS Managment LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv02413
Filed: October 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw All Claims filed by Caleb Jones Timms. (cfk)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED that the complaint is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 12/22/2023) (sxf)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ACCEPTING #10 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 12/22/2023) (sxf)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. Fri Dec 22 15:16:15 CST 2023 (crt)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:14. Fri Dec 22 15:27:29 CST 2023 (crt)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: Of Docket Sheet to show disregard of Docket No:11, 12. Mon Dec 11 08:46:40 CST 2023 (crt)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ***DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR - WRONG CASE*** JUDGMENT: This action came on for consideration by the court, and the issues having been duly considered and a decision duly rendered, it is ordered and adjudged that this case is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/7/2023) (ndt) Modified on 12/11/2023 (cea).
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ***DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT CASE*** Order Adopting #10 Findings and Recommendations. No objections were filed. The undersigned district judge reviewed the proposed findings, conclusions, and recommendation for plain error. Finding none, the court adopts the findings, conclusions, and recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/7/2023) (ndt) Modified on 12/11/2023 (cea).
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11,12. Thu Dec 7 15:55:47 CST 2023 (crt)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: For the reasons set out in the November 6, 2023 findings of fact, conclusions of law, and recommendation [Dkt. No. #6 ] as supplemented, the Court should dismiss this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 12/1/2023) (mcrd) Modified to reactivate on 12/11/2023 (cea).
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 10. Fri Dec 1 14:37:20 CST 2023 (crt)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ZRS Managment LLC filed by Caleb Jones Timms. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING #7 MOTION FOR HEARING. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/16/2023) (mcrd)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 8. Thu Nov 16 14:32:16 CST 2023 (crt)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Request for Court Hearing filed by Caleb Jones Timms. (cfk)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Tue Nov 7 11:58:04 CST 2023 (crt)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should dismiss this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/6/2023) (mcrd)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 6. Mon Nov 6 10:38:09 CST 2023 (crt)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Thu Nov 2 14:14:06 CDT 2023 (crt)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Caleb Jones Timms. (agc)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caleb Jones Timms. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (agc)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against ZRS Management filed by Caleb Jones Timms. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (agc)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (agc)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timms v. ZRS Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Jones Timms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZRS Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZRS Managment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?