Blair v. Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Adrian Eugene Blair
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 3:2023cv02458
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Filing 28 RESPONSE filed by Adrian Eugene Blair re: #24 Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order. (kcr)
December 26, 2023 Filing 29 (AMENDED) COMPLAINT against Department of Veterans Affairs filed by Adrian Eugene Blair. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (axm)
December 14, 2023 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Department of Veterans Affairs. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hyatt, Andrea)
December 14, 2023 Filing 25 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Andrea L Hyatt added as AUSA. (Hyatt, Andrea)
December 12, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of email for Pro Se litigant Adrian Eugene Blair. New email: aeblair1965@outlook.com. (agc)
December 8, 2023 Filing 24 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Department of Veterans Affairs. (Padis, George)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Special Order 3-351: Effective December 7, 2023, active cases assigned or referred to Magistrate Judge Irma C. Ramirez will be transferred to the dockets of other magistrate judges in the Dallas Division as outlined on Exhibit A to this order. This case has been reassigned pursuant to Special Order No. 3-351. (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge David C. Godbey on 12/7/2023) (rekc)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/8/2023. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 11/17/2023) (mcrd)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Because no motion is necessary in order to proceed with this action, the plaintiff's #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed on With Appeal, filed 6/29/2023, is hereby DEEMED MOOT. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 11/17/2023) (mcrd)
November 17, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George M Padis on behalf of Department of Veterans Affairs. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Padis, George)
November 17, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:21. Fri Nov 17 16:38:05 CST 2023 (crt)
November 17, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:22. Fri Nov 17 16:47:18 CST 2023 (crt)
November 9, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:19 . Thu Nov 9 12:51:52 CST 2023 (crt)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING ORDER OF REFERENCE: This case is hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez for pretrial management. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 11/8/2023) (cfk)
November 6, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:18. Mon Nov 6 10:51:36 CST 2023 (crt)
November 3, 2023 Filing 18 Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan recused pursuant to Special Order 3-346. Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez assigned for matters that may be referred in this case. (oyh)
November 3, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16,17. Fri Nov 3 18:03:51 CDT 2023 (crt)
October 30, 2023 Filing 17 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (axm)
October 30, 2023 Filing 16 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)
October 30, 2023 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of USCA for the Federal Circuit; Case Number 23-1626. Original file with documents numbered 1-14, transfer order and docket sheet received. (axm)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER filed transmitting the petition for review and all of the filings to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [Transferred from USCA Federal Circuit on 10/30/2023.] (axm)
August 30, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE of Respondent DVA to Doc. No. #11 , #11 . Service: 08/30/2023 by US mail, email. 946784 [23-1626] [Liridona Sinani] [Transferred from USCA Federal Circuit on 10/30/2023.] (axm)
August 15, 2023 Filing 12 MODIFIED ENTRY: RESPONSE of Petitioner Adrian E. Blair to Doc. No. #11 . Service: 08/15/2023 by clerk. 943044 --[Edited 08/18/2023 by KMH] [VDW] [Transferred from USCA Federal Circuit on 10/30/2023.] (axm)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER filed to show cause; Within 30 days from the date of filing of this order, the parties are directed to show cause why this case should not be dismissed or transferred to a United States district court, and if transferred, which court would be most appropriate. The briefing schedule is stayed. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. 939440 [LMS] [Transferred from USCA Federal Circuit on 10/30/2023.] (axm)
June 29, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION of Petitioner Adrian E. Blair for Leave to Proceed on with Appeal. Service: 06/29/2023 by clerk. 934966 [KMH] [Transferred from USCA Federal Circuit on 10/30/2023.] (axm)
June 29, 2023 Filing 9 INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF FILED by Petitioner Adrian E. Blair. Service: 06/29/2023 by clerk. (PENDING COMPLIANCE REVIEW) 933289 [VDW] [Transferred from USCA Federal Circuit on 10/30/2023.] (axm)
June 15, 2023 Filing 8 Notice to Petitioner Adrian E. Blair: The record of this case indicates that no Opening Brief under FCR 31(a)(1)(B) has been filed. A motion for leave is required to file a document out of time. Failure to file required documents may result in dismissal or other action as deemed appropriate by the court. See FCR 25(h). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. 930210 [KMH] [Transferred from USCA Federal Circuit on 10/30/2023.] (axm)
May 25, 2023 Filing 7 Statement Concerning Discrimination pursuant to Fed. Cir. R. 15(c) for Petitioner Adrian E. Blair. Service: 05/26/2023 by clerk. 926202 [JCP] [Transferred from USCA Federal Circuit on 10/30/2023.] (axm)
April 21, 2023 Filing 6 Notice to Petitioner Adrian E. Blair: The record of this case indicates that no Statement Concerning Discrimination under FCR 15(c) has been filed. Failure to file required documents may result in dismissal or other action as deemed appropriate by the court. See FCR 25(h). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. 922162 [KMH] [Transferred from USCA Federal Circuit on 10/30/2023.] (axm)
April 10, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Unrepresented Person Appearance for Petitioner Adrian E. Blair. Service: 04/10/2023 by clerk. 915639 [JCP] [Transferred from USCA Federal Circuit on 10/30/2023.] (axm)
April 6, 2023 Filing 3 Certified list received. Service: 03/31/2023 by email. Refer to Fed. Cir. R. 31 for calculating brief deadlines from service of the certified list. [Transferred from USCA Federal Circuit on 10/30/2023.] (axm)
March 31, 2023 Filing 2 Entry of Appearance for Liridona Sinani as counsel for Respondent DVA. Service: 03/31/2023 by US mail, email. [Transferred from USCA Federal Circuit on 10/30/2023.] (axm)
March 21, 2023 Filing 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 03/13/2023. 911146 Fee/IFP due on 04/04/2023. 15(c) due on 04/04/2023. Entry of Appearance due 04/04/2023. Certified Listdue on 05/01/2023. [Transferred from USCA Federal Circuit on 10/30/2023.] (axm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair v. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Eugene Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Liridona Sinani
Represented By: Andrea L Hyatt
Represented By: George M Padis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?