Wesco v. John Collins
Plaintiff: Monterio J Wesco
Defendant: John Collins and Navy Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2023cv02582
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: It is recommended that this action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/16/2024) (mcrd)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. No process will issue pending completion of screening. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/12/2024) (chmb)
January 3, 2024 Filing 11 Answer filed by Monterio J Wesco re: #10 Judge's Questionnaire. (cfk)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Judge's Questionnaire sent to Monterio J Wesco. Responses due by 1/11/2024. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 12/21/2023) (oyh)
December 18, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Monterio J Wesco. (cfk)
December 18, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Collins filed by Monterio J Wesco, Navy Federal Credit Union. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (cfk)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Monterio J Wesco must address the following deficiency: Plaintiff is ORDERED to (1) complete fully the form motion to proceed in forma pauperis on the AO-239 Form and to resubmit it to the Court for filing, (2) file an amended complaint that meets the requirements of Rule 8(a), and (3) register to use the Courts electronic filing system, all by December 28, 2023. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 12/28/2023. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 12/7/2023) (mcrd)
December 1, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Dec 1 09:25:36 CST 2023 (crt)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF JUDICIAL SCREENING AND STANDING ORDER. Judicial screening of this case is pending. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). It is therefore ORDERED that (1) service of process shall be withheld pending completion of judicial screening, (2) no motions for appointment of counsel shall be filed until the Court has completed the screening process, (3) all discovery in this case is stayed until the Court enters a scheduling order, (4) no amendments or supplements to the complaint shall be filed without prior Court approval, and (5) any motion to amend the complaint must be accompanied by a complete proposed amended complaint on the required form. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff must promptly notify the Court in writing of any change of address by filing a written Notice of Change of Address with the Clerk of the Court. Failure to provide updated address information may result in the dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute or follow court order under Fed. R. Civ. 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 11/30/2023) (chmb)
November 22, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 3. Wed Nov 22 10:37:51 CST 2023 (crt)
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Monterio J Wesco. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (kcr)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Monterio J Wesco. (kcr)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (kcr)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CFO John Collins/Navy Federal Credit Union filed by Monterio J Wesco. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (kcr)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesco v. John Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monterio J Wesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navy Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?