U.S. Bank Trust Company NA v. Tunzi et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust Company N.A., as trustee, as successor in interest to U.S Bank N.A., successor trustee to Lasalle Bank National Association, on behalf of the holders of Bear Stearns Asset Backed Secur and U.S. Bank Trust Company N.A.
Defendant: Joseph Tunzi, Vincent Tunzi, Jr., Jennifer Jo Ferrell and Vincent Tunzi, Jr
Case Number: 3:2023cv02619
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Vincent Tunzi, Jr ; served on 1/9/2024. (Cronenwett, Mark)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO PROCEED WITHOUT DESIGNATION OF LOCAL COUNSEL. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/22/2024) (cfk)
January 19, 2024 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Proceed without designation of local counsel filed by Joseph Tunzi, Vincent Tunzi, Jr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed order) (Medearis, David) Modified text on 1/22/2024 (cfk).
January 16, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Substituted Service filed by U.S. Bank Trust Company N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Haley, Cheyenne)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Civil Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside or maintain the attorney's principal office in this district. "Local counsel" means a member of the bar of this court who resides or maintains the attorney's principal office in this district and whose residence or principal office is located within 50 miles of the courthouse in the division in which the case is pending.By January 19, 2024, Defendant Joseph Tunzi and Vincent Tunzi, Jr must file one of the following: a response to this order, demonstrating why counsel is not subject to, or is exempt from, Local Civil Rule 83.10(a)'s requirements or pointing out how and when local counsel has previously been designated; under Local Civil Rule 83.10(a), a motion for leave to proceed without local counsel; or a designation of, and the entry of appearance by, of local counsel satisfying Local Civil Rule 83.10(a)'s requirements and stating local counsel's address and telephone number, as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11(a) and including the information that Local Civil Rule 10.1(b) requires. (And a designated local counsel who is not admitted to practice in this District and has not been admitted pro hac vice in this case must, at the same time, either become admitted to practice in this District, see Local Civil Rule 83.7, or move the Court to be admitted pro hac vice, see Local Civil Rule 83.9(b).)(Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 12/29/2024.) (mcrd)
December 28, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joseph Tunzi, Vincent Tunzi, Jr. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Medearis, David)
December 28, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Joseph Tunzi, Vincent Tunzi, Jr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney David Medearis added to party Joseph Tunzi(pty:dft), Attorney David Medearis added to party Vincent Tunzi, Jr(pty:dft) (Medearis, David)
December 18, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Joseph Tunzi ; served on 12/8/2023. (Cronenwett, Mark)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER ON FILING MATERIALS UNDER SEAL. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 12/7/2023) (mcrd)
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan assigned to this case pursuant to Special Order 3-346 for matters that may be referred. (ndt)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kaf)
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jennifer Jo Ferrell, Joseph Tunzi, Vincent Tunzi, Jr. (kaf)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Request for Issuance of Summons filed by U.S. Bank Trust Company N.A., as trustee, as successor in interest to U.S Bank N.A., successor trustee to Lasalle Bank National Association, on behalf of the holders of Bear Stearns Asset Backed Secur. (Haley, Cheyenne)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank Trust Company N.A., as trustee, as successor in interest to U.S Bank N.A., successor trustee to Lasalle Bank National Association, on behalf of the holders of Bear Stearns Asset Backed Secur. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Haley, Cheyenne)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by U.S. Bank Trust Company N.A., as trustee, as successor in interest to U.S Bank N.A., successor trustee to Lasalle Bank National Association, on behalf of the holders of Bear Stearns Asset Backed Secur. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-14200315) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet) (Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust Company NA v. Tunzi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust Company N.A., as trustee, as successor in interest to U.S Bank N.A., successor trustee to Lasalle Bank National Association, on behalf of the holders of Bear Stearns Asset Backed Secur
Represented By: Mark D Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust Company N.A.
Represented By: Mark D Cronenwett
Represented By: Cheyenne D Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Tunzi
Represented By: David Medearis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Tunzi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Jo Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Tunzi, Jr
Represented By: David Medearis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?