Plunkett v. FirstKey Homes LLC
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Plunkett
Defendant: FirstKey Homes, LLC and FirstKey Homes LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv02684
Filed: December 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/25/2024) (kaf)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: STANDING ORDER ON REQUESTS FOR HEARINGS AND ORAL ARGUMENTS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/25/2024) (kaf)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: STANDING ORDER ON FILING MATERIALS UNDER SEAL. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 1/25/2024) (kaf)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 1/23/2024) (sxf)
January 20, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Angel Wiggins on 1/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (Wills, Rhonda)
January 19, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Nataly Sevilla on 1/19/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (Wills, Rhonda)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Attorney conference shall take place no later than 1/29/2024. Joint Status Report due by 2/13/2024. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 1/12/2024) (axm)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint; denying #17 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant. No further action is required, however, because Defendant filed its Answer (Doc. #19 ) on 1/5/2024. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 1/11/2024) (axm)
January 5, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Victor D. Vital on behalf of FirstKey Homes LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Vital, Victor)
January 5, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by FirstKey Homes LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Anderson, Kathleen)
January 5, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by FirstKey Homes LLC re: #17 MOTION for Default Judgment against FirstKey Homes LLC (Anderson, Kathleen)
January 4, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Default Judgment against FirstKey Homes LLC filed by Jeffrey Plunkett (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wills, Rhonda) Modified text on 1/5/2024 (cfk).
January 3, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Nicole Torres on 1/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (Wills, Rhonda)
December 29, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FirstKey Homes LLC. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Anderson, Kathleen)
December 29, 2023 Filing 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by FirstKey Homes LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Anderson, Kathleen)
December 27, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kathleen Marie Anderson on behalf of FirstKey Homes LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Anderson, Kathleen)
December 26, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin T Pendroff on behalf of FirstKey Homes LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Pendroff, Benjamin)
December 12, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to FirstKey Homes LLC ; served on 12/11/2023. (Wills, Rhonda)
December 12, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Felicia Sharp on 12/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (Wills, Rhonda)
December 12, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Latriece Powell on 12/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (Wills, Rhonda)
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Ethel June Maranan on 12/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (Wills, Rhonda)
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Joseph Grimes on 12/08/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (Wills, Rhonda)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Tiana Cunningham on 12/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (Wills, Rhonda)
December 11, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Geonvante Ball on 12/11/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (Wills, Rhonda)
December 7, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FirstKey Homes LLC. (kcr)
December 5, 2023 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
December 5, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jeffrey Plunkett. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Wills, Rhonda)
December 5, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against FirstKey Homes, LLC filed by Jeffrey Plunkett. (Filing Fee $405- Receipt Number ATXNDC-14220072) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Consent) (Wills, Rhonda) Modified payment receipt on 12/7/2023 (kcr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plunkett v. FirstKey Homes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Plunkett
Represented By: Rhonda Hunter Wills
Represented By: Kobby T Warren
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Raspino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstKey Homes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FirstKey Homes LLC
Represented By: Benjamin T Pendroff
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Anderson
Represented By: Victor D. Vital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?