Flores v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Julia Flores
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Dan Von Deck
Case Number: 3:2023cv02687
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot motion to dismiss and motion to strike (Doc. #7 ). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 1/31/2024) (chmb)
January 30, 2024 Filing 21 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint,, filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Dan Von Deck. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wahlheim, William)
January 30, 2024 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Dan Von Deck re #19 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Partial) MOTION to Strike Jury Demand Pursuant to ERISA (Wahlheim, William)
January 30, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Partial) (), MOTION to Strike Jury Demand Pursuant to ERISA filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Dan Von Deck (Wahlheim, William)
January 16, 2024 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Dan Von Deck filed by Julia Flores. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (agc)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File. The proposed amended complaint is in the record as Doc. 12-1, and the Clerk of the Court is INSTRUCTED to refile this document in the next available docket entry. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 1/16/2024) (chmb)
January 12, 2024 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Dan Von Deck re: #12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Wahlheim, William)
January 10, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by Julia Flores re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss State-Law Claims Pursuant to ERISA MOTION to Strike Jury Demand Pursuant to ERISA (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nkeyasen, Clifford)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Braxton S. Thrash. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 1/10/2024) (chmb)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William B. Wahlheim, Jr.. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 1/10/2024) (chmb)
January 10, 2024 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Julia Flores with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment, #2 Proposed Order) (Nkeyasen, Clifford)
January 9, 2024 Filing 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Braxton S. Thrash (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14299946) filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Dan Von Deck (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wahlheim, William)
January 9, 2024 Filing 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14299820) filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Dan Von Deck (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney William B. Wahlheim, Jr added to party Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney William B. Wahlheim, Jr added to party Dan Von Deck(pty:dft) (Wahlheim, William)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND PROPOSAL FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 2/12/2024. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 12/26/2023) (sxf)
December 20, 2023 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Dan Von Deck re #7 MOTION to Dismiss State-Law Claims Pursuant to ERISA MOTION to Strike Jury Demand Pursuant to ERISA (Meek, Taylor)
December 20, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss State-Law Claims Pursuant to ERISA (), MOTION to Strike Jury Demand Pursuant to ERISA filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Dan Von Deck (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Meek, Taylor)
December 20, 2023 Filing 6 Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Nkeyasen, Clifford)
December 7, 2023 Filing 5 Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Meek, Taylor)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Electronic Standing Order - If they have not already done so, all attorneys appearing in this case must file a Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements on the docket attesting that they have read, and will comply with, the judge-specific requirements for this Court, including the Court's order concerning generative artificial intelligence. The judge-specific requirements and a template Certificate may be found at: # Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. To file the Certificate, please use the event entitled Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. This event is located in the Other Documents selection, which is under the Other Filings category of the Civil page in ECF. Please contact the ECF help desk at 214-753-2633 for filing assistance. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 12/6/2023) (kcr)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
December 6, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Dan Von Deck. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Meek, Taylor)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Dan Von Deck, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-14222559) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cvr Sheet) (Meek, Taylor) (Attachments 3 and 4 flattened on 12/7/2023) (kcr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Flores
Represented By: Clifford Nkeyasen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Taylor William Meek
Represented By: Braxton S Thrash
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Von Deck
Represented By: Taylor William Meek
Represented By: Braxton S Thrash
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?