Crenshaw v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: Tomyia Crenshaw
Defendant: Leonard Anderson, Darrien Robertson and City of Dallas
Case Number: 3:2024cv00731
Filed: March 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Tomyia Crenshaw re: #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Grinke, Paul)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants Answer due by 6/3/2024. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 5/7/2024) (agc)
May 3, 2024 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Leonard Anderson, Darrien Robertson with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney John Cheves Ligon added to party Leonard Anderson (pty:dft), Attorney John Cheves Ligon added to party Darrien Robertson(pty:dft) (Ligon, John)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Referring #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 5/2/2024) (cfk)
April 30, 2024 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Dallas with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney John Cheves Ligon added to party City of Dallas(pty:dft) (Ligon, John)
April 18, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Leonard Anderson; served on 4/12/2024. (Evans, Carl)
April 18, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Darrien Robertson ; served on 4/12/2024. (Evans, Carl)
April 18, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to City of Dallas ; served on 4/5/2024. (Evans, Carl)
March 28, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Leonard Anderson, City of Dallas, Darrien Robertson. (kcr)
March 27, 2024 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
March 27, 2024 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tomyia Crenshaw. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). See document #1 for image. (kcr)
March 27, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Leonard Anderson, City of Dallas, Darrien Robertson filed by Tomyia Crenshaw. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number BTXNDC-14496129) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Evans, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crenshaw v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomyia Crenshaw
Represented By: Carl Lenford Evans, Jr
Represented By: David A Dekle
Represented By: Paul Ashley Grinke
Represented By: Stephen Michael Bergren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Anderson
Represented By: John Cheves Ligon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrien Robertson
Represented By: John Cheves Ligon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Dallas
Represented By: John Cheves Ligon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?