Austin et al v. One Technologies LLC
Plaintiff: Nicole Austin, Tynia Baisden, Chilette Brown, Tanisha Carter, Fantasia Hilliard, Alona Jennings, Danielle Lowery, Mario Merino, Brinda Moore, Cecilia Smith and John Walker
Defendant: One Technologies LLC
Case Number: 3:2024cv00839
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC STANDING ORDER: Counsel are required to review and comply with the Courts Judge Specific Requirements, which can be found at http://www.txnd.uscourts.gov/judge/district-judge-karen-gren-scholer. The Court updates its Requirements periodically. Also, counsel are required to review and comply with the Northern District of Texass Local Civil Rules, which can be found at https://www.txnd.uscourts.gov/civil-rules. In particular, the Court directs counsel to review Rules 3.1, 7.4, and 81.2, regarding certificates of interested persons, and Rule 83.10, regarding local counsel. Counsel are expected to review the Requirements and Local Rules before contacting the Court with questions. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/28/2024) (axm)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that #14 Defendant One Technologies, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, to and including June 11, 2024, is GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/20/2024) (chmb)
May 17, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #12 MOTION to Remand filed by One Technologies LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting One Technologies Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response) (Childers, Jonathan)
May 7, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Request for Judicial Notice re: #12 MOTION to Remand filed by Nicole Austin, Tynia Baisden, Chilette Brown, Tanisha Carter, Fantasia Hilliard, Alona Jennings, Danielle Lowery, Mario Merino, Brinda Moore, Cecilia Smith, John Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D) (Steckler, Bruce)
May 6, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand filed by Nicole Austin, Tynia Baisden, Chilette Brown, Tanisha Carter, Fantasia Hilliard, Alona Jennings, Danielle Lowery, Mario Merino, Brinda Moore, Cecilia Smith, John Walker with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Steckler, Bruce)
April 30, 2024 Filing 11 Supplemental Document by One Technologies LLC as to #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement . (Childers, Jonathan)
April 30, 2024 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs filed by One Technologies LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Index of all documents file with Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Copy of the docket sheet in the state court action, as of April 5, 2024, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Civil Case Information Sheet in the state court action, filed April 1, 2024, #4 Exhibit(s) 4 - Complaint in the state court action, filed April 1, 2024, #5 Exhibit(s) 5 - Civil Cover Sheet for this removed action, #6 Exhibit(s) 6 - Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet for this removed action, #7 Exhibit(s) 7 - This Updated Index of all documents filed with the state court, #8 Exhibit(s) 8 - Updated copy of the docket sheet in the state court action, as of April 30, 2024, #9 Exhibit(s) 9 - Notice to adverse parties and state court of removal of action to federal court, #10 Exhibit(s) 10 - Citation in the state court action, #11 Exhibit(s) 11 - Return of Service, #12 Exhibit(s) 12 - Supplemental Certificate of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement) (Childers, Jonathan) Modified on 5/1/2024 (kcr).
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer: It is ORDERED that Defendant is granted an extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs' Original Petition until 21 days after the Court has issued a ruling on Plaintiffs' anticipated motion to remand, so long as amotion to remand is filed on or before 5/6/2024, the statutory deadline for timely filing such amotion. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/22/2024) (ykp)
April 19, 2024 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by One Technologies LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint) (Childers, Jonathan)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ari N. Rothman. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/10/2024) (chmb)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court has not specifically evaluated whether the Notice of Removal complies with Northern District of Texas Local Civil Rule 81.1. If Defendant is satisfied that the Notice of Removal complies with Rule 81.1 and that additional documents are unnecessary to address the defect identified in this Order, the amended notice of removal required by this Order need not also contain the documents required by Rule 81.1. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 4/10/2024) (kaf)
April 8, 2024 Filing 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Ari N. Rothman (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14524216) filed by One Technologies LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - List of Bar Memberships, #2 Exhibit(s) Supreme Court of California Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing DC, #4 Exhibit(s) Nevada Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Childers, Jonathan)
April 5, 2024 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
April 5, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1446(d) filed by One Technologies LLC (Childers, Jonathan)
April 5, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by One Technologies LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Childers, Jonathan) (Main Document 2 flattened on 4/8/2024) (kcr).
April 5, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by One Technologies LLC. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-14519603) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 Docket in State Court, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 Civil Cover Sheet in State Court, #4 Exhibit(s) 4 State Court Complaint, #5 Cover Sheet 5 Civil Cover Sheet in removed action, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement 6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet in removed action) (Childers, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin et al v. One Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Austin
Represented By: Bruce William Steckler
Represented By: Gregory P Love
Represented By: Paul D Stickney
Represented By: Austin Paul Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tynia Baisden
Represented By: Bruce William Steckler
Represented By: Austin Paul Smith
Represented By: Gregory P Love
Represented By: Paul D Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chilette Brown
Represented By: Bruce William Steckler
Represented By: Austin Paul Smith
Represented By: Gregory P Love
Represented By: Paul D Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanisha Carter
Represented By: Bruce William Steckler
Represented By: Austin Paul Smith
Represented By: Gregory P Love
Represented By: Paul D Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fantasia Hilliard
Represented By: Bruce William Steckler
Represented By: Austin Paul Smith
Represented By: Gregory P Love
Represented By: Paul D Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alona Jennings
Represented By: Bruce William Steckler
Represented By: Austin Paul Smith
Represented By: Gregory P Love
Represented By: Paul D Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Lowery
Represented By: Bruce William Steckler
Represented By: Austin Paul Smith
Represented By: Gregory P Love
Represented By: Paul D Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Merino
Represented By: Bruce William Steckler
Represented By: Austin Paul Smith
Represented By: Gregory P Love
Represented By: Paul D Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brinda Moore
Represented By: Bruce William Steckler
Represented By: Austin Paul Smith
Represented By: Gregory P Love
Represented By: Paul D Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Smith
Represented By: Bruce William Steckler
Represented By: Austin Paul Smith
Represented By: Gregory P Love
Represented By: Paul D Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Walker
Represented By: Bruce William Steckler
Represented By: Austin Paul Smith
Represented By: Gregory P Love
Represented By: Paul D Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Technologies LLC
Represented By: Alan Dabdoub
Represented By: Jonathan Ryan Childers
Represented By: Ari N Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?