The Famous Group Technologies Inc v. Cue Audio Inc
Plaintiff: The Famous Group Technologies Inc
Defendant: Cue Audio Inc
Case Number: 3:2024cv01173
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Lawrence Vitale on behalf of Cue Audio Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Vitale, Matthew)
June 17, 2024 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendants response to the complaint is due July 15, 2024. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 6/17/2024) (chmb)
June 14, 2024 Filing 13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Cue Audio Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Michael D Karson added to party Cue Audio Inc(pty:dft) (Karson, Michael)
June 4, 2024 Filing 12 Summons Returned Executed on 5/23/2024 as to Cue Audio Inc re: #4 Notice (Other), #3 Notice (Other), #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued, #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement. (kaf) Modified event on 6/6/2024 (kaf).
May 31, 2024 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jose L. Patino. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 5/31/2024) (chmb)
May 31, 2024 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Willmore F. Holbrow, III. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 5/31/2024) (chmb)
May 22, 2024 Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Jose L. Patino (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14640046) filed by The Famous Group Technologies Inc (Attachments: #1 Court Admissions, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Dietrich, Blake)
May 22, 2024 Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Willmore F. Holbrow III (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14639994) filed by The Famous Group Technologies Inc (Attachments: #1 Court Admissions, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Dietrich, Blake)
May 16, 2024 Filing 7 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (cfk)
May 16, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Cue Audio Inc. (cfk)
May 16, 2024 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cfk)
May 16, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark filed by The Famous Group Technologies, Inc. (Dietrich, Blake)
May 16, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case filed by The Famous Group Technologies, Inc. (Dietrich, Blake)
May 16, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Famous Group Technologies, Inc.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Dietrich, Blake)
May 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Cue Audio, Inc. filed by The Famous Group Technologies, Inc.. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14624008) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Cover Sheet) (Dietrich, Blake)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Famous Group Technologies Inc v. Cue Audio Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Famous Group Technologies Inc
Represented By: Willmore F Holbrow, III
Represented By: Jose L Patino
Represented By: Blake Thomas Dietrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cue Audio Inc
Represented By: Matthew Lawrence Vitale
Represented By: Michael D Karson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?