Zachary v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: Don Zachary
Defendant: Bonny Corporation, Voluntary Purchasing Group Inc, Estate of Michael D Smith, Texas Commission on Environmental Quality, Meridian Housing Company, Estate of H Dean Smith and United States Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 3:2024cv01551
Filed: June 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2024 Filing 25 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Texas Commission on Environmental Quality re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Coffee, Heather)
August 19, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (Coffee, Heather)
August 19, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Padis-DOJ, George)
August 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying as moot #18 Defendant Texas Commission on Environmental Quality's Motion to Dismiss and #20 Defendant United States Environmental Protection Agency's Motion to Dismiss in light of #21 Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 8/6/2024) (chmb)
August 5, 2024 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Don Zachary. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ray, Daniel)
August 2, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Environmental Protection Agency US. (Padis-DOJ, George) Modified text on 8/7/2024 (knb).
July 31, 2024 Filing 19 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Texas Commission on Environmental Quality re #18 MOTION to Dismiss with separate supporting brief (Coffee, Heather)
July 31, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss with separate supporting brief filed by Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) (Coffee, Heather)
July 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Texas Commission on Environmental Quality must file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 2, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/22/2024) (chmb)
July 19, 2024 Filing 16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (Coffee, Heather)
July 19, 2024 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Texas Commission on Environmental Quality. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Coffee, Heather) (Main Document 15 flattened on 7/22/2024) (kcr).
July 19, 2024 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Estate of H Dean Smith, Estate of Michael D Smith, Meridian Housing Company. (ykp)
July 19, 2024 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action filed by Don Zachary. (Ray, Daniel)
July 19, 2024 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action filed by Don Zachary. (Ray, Daniel)
July 19, 2024 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Action filed by Don Zachary. (Ray, Daniel)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant United States Environmental Protection Agency must file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 2, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/19/2024) (chmb)
July 18, 2024 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Environmental Protection Agency US with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Padis-DOJ, George)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time. Defendant Texas Commission on Environmental Quality must file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 19, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 6/28/2024) (chmb)
June 27, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time filed by Texas Commission on Environmental Quality Attorney Heather Coffee added to party Texas Commission on Environmental Quality(pty:dft) (Coffee, Heather)
June 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant United States Environmental Protection Agency must file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 19, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 6/27/2024) (chmb)
June 26, 2024 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Environmental Protection Agency US with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Padis-DOJ, George)
June 26, 2024 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Environmental Protection Agency US. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Padis-DOJ, George)
June 24, 2024 Filing 3 Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan recused pursuant to Special Order 3-346. Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver assigned for matters that may be referred in this case. (agc)
June 21, 2024 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
June 21, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Environmental Protection Agency, US. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) Index of State Court Records, #4 Exhibit(s) Docket, #5 Exhibit(s) Original Petition, #6 Exhibit(s) Letter to Clerk, #7 Exhibit(s) Letter to Clerk, #8 Exhibit(s) Request for Docket and Public Filings) (Padis-DOJ, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zachary v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonny Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voluntary Purchasing Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Michael D Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
Represented By: Heather Coffee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Housing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of H Dean Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: George M Padis-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Zachary
Represented By: Daniel Wayne Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?