American Airlines Inc v. Google Inc Featured Case

American Airlines is suing Google for allowing companies to show ads when its trademarks, including (but not limited to) \"AMERICAN AIRLINES\" \"AMERICAN EAGLE\" \"AA\" \"A A\" \"AA.COM\" \"AMERICAN AIRLINES CENTER\" \"AADVANTAGE\" \"AMERICAN CONNECTION\" \"AMERICANAIRLINES\" are searched on.

Plaintiff: American Airlines Inc
Defendant: Google Inc
Case Number: 4:2007cv00487
Filed: August 16, 2007
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Fort Worth Office
County: Tarrant
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2008 104 Opinion or Order of the Court
AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT: Court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that all claims asserted by Plaintiff are dismissed with prejudice; that Plaintiff have and recover nothing from Dft; and, that each party bear its owns costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge John McBryde on 7/17/2008) (csw)
July 16, 2008 103
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Susan J Harriman for Google Inc (csw)
July 14, 2008 101
Opposition filed by Google Inc to 77 Second MOTION to Compel (dld)
July 10, 2008 99
Opposition filed by Google Inc re 71 MOTION to Compel (csw)
July 8, 2008 91 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER: Court ORDERS that parties file, by 2:00 pm on 7/10/2008, Responses to opposing party's outstanding discovery motions. (Signed by Judge John McBryde on 7/8/2008) (csw)
July 7, 2008 89
AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc re 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 84 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, 85 Appendix in Support, 87 Appendix in Support, 86 Appendix in Support. (csw)
July 3, 2008 88
Unopposed MOTION to Seal Portions of 85 Appendix in Support, 87 Appendix in Support, 86 Appendix in Support filed by Google Inc (csw)
July 2, 2008 72
MOTION to Seal Portions of the Appendix Filed in Support of Pla's Motion to Compel and Brief in Support filed by American Airlines Inc (csw)
June 30, 2008 68
Designation of Rebuttal Experts by Google Inc. (dld)
June 25, 2008 67
NOTICE of Appearance as co-counsel by Richard H Gateley on behalf of Google Inc. (dld)
June 16, 2008 66 Opinion or Order of the Court
CORRECTED ORDER: This corrected order replaces in its entirety the order signed by the court on June 16, 2008. Court concludes that motion of plaintiff to compel filed May 7, 2008 should be granted to the extent provided in this order. See order for specifics. (Signed by Judge John McBryde on 6/16/2008) (csw)
June 9, 2008 64
Designation of Experts by American Airlines Inc. (csw)
June 4, 2008 62 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 61 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Melissa J Miksch for Google Inc (Signed by Judge John McBryde on 6/4/2008) (csw)
June 3, 2008 61
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Melissa J Miksch for Google Inc (csw)
May 23, 2008 58
Designation of Experts by Google Inc. (csw)
May 22, 2008 60
Appendix in Support filed by Google Inc re 59 Response to Motion (Attachments: # 1 Supplement) (csw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/27/2008: # 2 Supplement, # 3 Supplement) (csw).
May 21, 2008 56
Reply Brief Relative to 34 MOTION to Compel filed by American Airlines Inc (csw)
May 20, 2008 54
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Daralyn Durie for Google Inc (csw)
May 19, 2008 53 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 51 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Ragesh K Tangri for Google Inc (Signed by Judge John McBryde on 5/19/2008) (csw)
May 16, 2008 51
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Ragesh K Tangri for Google Inc (csw)
May 15, 2008 48 Opinion or Order of the Court
AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL: granting 37 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall produce to defendant by 12:00 noon on 5/16/08. See order for specifics. (Signed by Judge John McBryde on 5/15/08) (dld)
May 12, 2008 42 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER: Plaintiff file its Response due by 2:00 pm on 5/15/2008 as to 37 Motion to Compel. Court further ORDERS that by such time and date plaintiff file for in camera inspection copies of all documents...see order for specifics. (Signed by Judge John McBryde on 5/12/2008) (csw)
May 9, 2008 41
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John McBryde: Telephone Conference re addl discussion on dft's motion to compel; Court ordered pla to respond to dft's motion to compel by May 15, 2008 by 2:00 pm.. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Lars Berg; Defense - Joe Cleveland Jr. (Court Reporter Eileen Brewer.) Time in Court: 9 minutes. (csw)
May 8, 2008 37
MOTION to Compel The Productions Of Documents filed by Google Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (dld)
May 7, 2008 34
MOTION to Compel filed by American Airlines Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (csw)
April 18, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 32 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice by William H. Crosby, Jr. for TM Advertising LP (Signed by Judge John McBryde on 4/18/2008) (csw)
April 10, 2008 31 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 30 Motion for admission pro hac vice by Jason B. Stavers for American Airlines, Inc. (Signed by Judge John McBryde on 4/10/08) (dld)
March 28, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 28 Agreed Motion to Extend Deadline to Designate Experts. Each party shall designate any expert conducting a survey by 5/22/08. Each party shall designate any rebuttal experts commenting of the survey by 6/9/08. Each party shall designate any experts for any issue on which that party has the burden of persuasion by June 9, 2008. Each party shall designate any rebuttal experts to the experts designated on June 9, 2008 by June 30, 2008. See order for specifics. (Signed by Judge John McBryde on 3/28/2008) (csw)
March 27, 2008 28
Agreed MOTION to Extend Deadline to Designate Experts by American Airlines Inc, Google Inc (csw)
March 26, 2008 27 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Ajay S Krishnan for Google Inc (Signed by Judge John McBryde on 3/26/2008) (csw)
March 25, 2008 26
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Ajay S Krishnan for Google Inc (csw)
March 21, 2008 25
Order Unfiling 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Google Inc due to the following deficiency: No cert. of service. (Signed by Judge John McBryde on 3/21/08) (pdm)
March 20, 2008 24
***UNFILED PER ORDER 3/21/08***MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice by JuNelle Harris for Google Inc by Google Inc (pdm)
February 8, 2008 23 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Frederick Brown for American Airlines Inc. (Signed by Judge John McBryde on 2/8/2008) (csw)
November 7, 2007 21
ANSWER to Complaint by Google Inc (csw)
October 26, 2007 20 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE AND PROVIDING SPECIAL PRETRIAL INSTRUCTIONS:Amended Pleadings due by 6/9/2008.,Discovery due by 8/11/2008., Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2008 10:00 AM before John McBryde.,Joinder of Parties due by 3/3/2008., Jury Trial set for 10/14/2008 09:00 AM before John McBryde. See order for specifics. (Signed by Judge John McBryde on 10/26/2007) (csw)
October 24, 2007 19 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER denying 9 Motion to Dismiss...see order for specifics (Signed by Judge John McBryde on 10/24/07) (pdm)
October 22, 2007 18
Reply in Support filed by Google Inc re 9 MOTION to Dismiss (csw)
October 9, 2007 15
RESPONSE filed by American Airlines Inc re 9 MOTION to Dismiss (dld) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2007 (White, Charlotte).
September 20, 2007 14 Opinion or Order of the Court
STATUS REPORT ORDER: This order pertains to preparation of a status report...counsel are directed to confer for the purpose of submitting a Joint Status Report in this case. Status Report due by 4:00 pm on 10/22/2007. (Signed by Judge John McBryde on 9/20/2007) (csw)
August 29, 2007 7 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Howard S Hogan); granting 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Terence P Ross)and are granted leave to appear pro hac vice along with local counsel, on behalf of plaintiff, American Airlines Inc. (Signed by Judge John McBryde on 8/29/2007) (csw)
August 28, 2007 6
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Terence P Ross) by American Airlines Inc (wrb)
August 21, 2007 4
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Google Inc ; served on 8/18/2007. (dld)
August 16, 2007 3
Summons Issued as to Google Inc. (dld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Airlines Inc v. Google Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Represented By: Benjamin W Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Airlines Inc
Represented By: Terence P Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?