American Airlines, Inc. v. Yahoo! Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff American Airlines Inc. alleged that Defendants Yahoo! Inc. and Overture Services, Inc. d/b/a Yahoo! Search Marketing sold to third parties the right to use the trademarks and service marks of American Airlines as keywords that trigger the appearance of paid advertisements.

Plaintiff: American Airlines, Inc.
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc. and Overture Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2008cv00626
Filed: October 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Tarrant
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER: All appendices filed in this action are hereby unfiled from the record of this action. All documents filed under seal or sealed by order of the court in this action, are hereby unfiled from the record in this action. Counsel for the parties are invited to retrieve the original copies and the chambers copies of such documents from the clerk's office by 2:00 p.m. on December 18, 2009. If such documents are not retrieved by that date, they will be disposed of as the clerk sees fit. See order for specifics (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 12/9/2009) (dld)
December 1, 2009 E-Mail re: 234 Order, 235 Judgment, bounced back on 11/30/2009 from hhogan@gibsondunn.com and fbrown@gibsondunn.com. Corrective action taken: Faxed NEFs and Orders. (drh)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 FINAL JUDGMENT: that all claims asserted in the above-captioned action in which American Airlines, Inc., is plaintiff, and Yahoo! Inc. and Overture Services, Inc., d/b/a Yahoo Search Marketing, are defendants, be, and are hereby, dismissed with prejudice; and The court further ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that each party bear the cost of court incurred by such party. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/30/09) (cxb)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER: During a telephone conference conducted on November 27, 2009, the parties informed the court that a full, final, and complete settlement of all claims has been reached. The court ORDERS that all claims asserted are hereby, dismissed with prejudice; and The court further ORDERS that each party bear the cost of court incurred by such party. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/30/09) (cxb)
November 25, 2009 Filing 233 Witness List for November 30, 2009 Hearing on Motion for Sanctions filed by American Airlines, Inc. (cxb)
November 25, 2009 Filing 232 Supplemental Witness List for November 30, 2009 Hearing by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
November 25, 2009 Filing 231 SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re: 224 Exhibit List for November 30 2009 Hearing. (cxb)
November 25, 2009 Filing 230 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John McBryde: Telephone Conference. Evidence relevant to the subject matter of the second motion for sanctions can be used in the 1113012009 hearing; Within one hour after conclusion of telephone conference: leave granted to pltfs to file new witness list, leave to defts to file objections to pltfs' exhibits, and to file a supplmental witness list. If parties reach a settlement prior to the time of the hearing on 11/30/2009, parties should notify the court and the court reporter. See minute order for "Hearing Procedures". Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Frederick Brown, Dee Kelly, Jr., Lars Berg, Jason Stavers; Defense - Michael Jacobs, Brooks Beard, Alison Tucher, Tony Rodriguez, Daniel Muino, David Chappell, Scott Fredericks. (Court Reporter Eileen Brewer.) Time in Court: 46 mins. (cxb) Modified on 12/3/2009 (dld).
November 25, 2009 Filing 229 SUMMARY of Deposition for November 30 Hearing on Motion for Sanctions filed by American Airlines, Inc. (cxb)
November 25, 2009 Filing 228 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 227 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 25, 2009 Filing 227 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
November 25, 2009 Filing 226 Exhibit List for November 30, 2009 Hearing by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
November 25, 2009 Filing 225 Witness List for November 30 Hearing on Motion for Sanctions by American Airlines, Inc. (cxb)
November 25, 2009 Filing 224 Exhibit List for November 30, 2009 Hearing on Motion for Sanctions by American Airlines, Inc. (cxb)
November 25, 2009 Filing 223 Witness List for November 30, 2009 Hearing by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
November 25, 2009 Filing 222 SUMMARY of Deposition of Carmen Arenal for November 30, 2009 Hearing filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
November 25, 2009 Filing 221 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 220 Response in Opposition. [USC/Not imaged, spiral bound, 250+ pgs.] (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 25, 2009 Filing 220 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re: 171 MOTION To Exclude The Expert Report of Isabella Cunningham. (cxb)
November 24, 2009 Filing 219 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 218 MOTION for Sanctions (dld)...NOT IMAGED, SPIRAL BOUND Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 24, 2009 Filing 218 MOTION for Sanctions for Violation of Court Order, Improper Certification of Discovery Responses and Destruction of Evidence filed by American Airlines, Inc. (dld)
November 24, 2009 Filing 217 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 216 MOTION To Seal Documents (dld) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 24, 2009 Filing 216 Unopposed MOTION To Seal Documents filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (dld)
November 23, 2009 Filing 215 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 214 Unopposed MOTION to seal documents. (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 23, 2009 Filing 214 UNOPPOSED MOTION to seal documents filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 213 CORRECTED ORDER: (This order corrects and replaces an order the court signed earlier on the date of the signing of this order. ) The court ORDERS that lead counsel for each party be present at a telephone conference/hearing at 3:00 p.m. on November 25, 2009. [see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/23/09) (cxb) Modified on 11/24/2009 (wrb).
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER: The court ORDERS that lead counsel for each party be present at a telephone conference/hearing at 3:30 p.m. on November 24, 2009. [see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/23/09) (cxb)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL denying 190 Motion to Compel. See Order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/20/2009) (krg)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER: granting in part denying in part 209 EMERGENCY Motion for an order requiring the exchange of witness names and limiting the number of witnesses. The court has concluded that counsel for plaintiff should notify counsel for defendants in writing by 12:00 noon on Saturday, November 21, 2009, of the identities of any employees.......[see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/20/09) (cxb) Modified on 11/23/2009 (krg).
November 20, 2009 Filing 209 EMERGENCY MOTION for an order requiring the exchange of witness names and limiting the number of witnesses AND REQUEST for expedited consideration filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
November 20, 2009 Filing 208 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 207 Response in Opposition to Motion to Compel. (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 20, 2009 Filing 207 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by American Airlines, Inc. re: 190 MOTION to Compel. (cxb)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE SLOTTJE: denying 168 Motion to Strike Daniel J. Slottje As Expert. [see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/19/09) (cxb)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER: Setting Deadlines as to 163 Motion To Exclude Testimony of Basil G. Englis filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (Expedited Response due by 2:00 p.m. on 11/25/2009.) (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/19/09) (cxb)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER: Setting Deadlines as to 171 Motion To Exclude The Expert Report of Isabella Cunningham filed by American Airlines, Inc. (Expedited Response due by 2:00 p.m. on 11/25/2009.) (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/19/09) (cxb)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER: granting 201 Joint MOTION Requesting Re-Setting of Hearing filed by Overture Services, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Yahoo! Inc. (Motion Hearing re-set for 11/30/2009 10:00 AM before Judge John McBryde.)Exhibit lists and witness lists deadline is hereby modified to require an exchange at 2:00 p.m. on November 27, 2009, and filing at 2:00 p.m. on Nov 24, 2009. [see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/19/09) (cxb) Modified on 11/20/2009 (dld).
November 19, 2009 Filing 202 RESPONSE filed by American Airlines, Inc. re: 189 Court's November 16, 2009 Order. (cxb)
November 19, 2009 Filing 201 JOINT MOTION requesting re-setting of hearing filed by American Airlines, Inc., Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
November 18, 2009 Filing 200 WRITTEN REPORT ON FACE-TO-FACE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by American Airlines, Inc., Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc.. (cxb)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER SETTING HEARING: Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2009 10:00 AM before Judge John McBryde as to 100 Motion for Sanctions For Failure to Produce and Preserve Documents. The court FURTHER ORDERS that: (1) By 2:00 p.m. on November 20, 2009, plaintiff and each defendant shall file a witness list and an exhibit list. [see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/18/09) (cxb)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER: that the seven-volume appendix filed as of November 2, 2009, by American Airlines, Inc., in opposition to the motion for summary judgment of defendant Yahoo! Inc. (shown on the docket of this case as items 153-159) be, and are hereby, stricken, and that the five-volume appendix titled "Appendix in Support of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Yahoo!'s Motion for Summary Judgment" tendered with the joint motion to substitute be, and is hereby, ordered filed with a November 2, 2009, filing date. [see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/18/09) (cxb)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER: The court ORDERS that plaintiff, American Airlines, Inc.,file a response to 190 Motion to Compel, Motion to Expedite by 2:00 p.m. onNovember 20, 2009. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/17/09) (dld)
November 16, 2009 Filing 191 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 190 MOTION to Compel and for Expedited Consideration. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix (contd)) (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 16, 2009 Filing 190 MOTION to Compel and for Expedited Consideration filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. with Brief in Support. (cxb)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER denying 180 Motion for for Leave to Supplement the Record in Support of American's Motion for Sanctions for Failure to Produce and Preserve Documents and Brief in Support. Court interprets defts' response to say that plaint failed to appropriately comply with requirements to confer relative to the merits of a motion before filing same. Plaintiff to respond by 2:00 p.m. on 11/19/09, providing full information concerning any conference held between counsel re motion for leave to supplement. See Order (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/16/09) (uls)
November 16, 2009 Filing 188 RESPONSE filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re: 180 MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement the Record in Support of American's Motion for Sanctions for Failure to Produce and Preserve Documents. (cxb)
November 13, 2009 Filing 187 NOTICE of filing Original Declaration re; Isabella Cunningham filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (dld)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER: Response due by 2:00 p.m. on 11/16/2009 as to 180 Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record in Support of American's Motion for Sanctions for Failure to Produce and Preserve Documents (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/13/09) (dld)
November 12, 2009 Filing 185 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 183 OBJECTIONS and MOTION to Strike (dld)...NOT IMAGED, SPIRAL BOUND Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 12, 2009 Filing 184 REPLY re: 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (dld)
November 12, 2009 Filing 183 OBJECTIONS and MOTION to Strike Summary Evidence and Brief in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (dld)
November 12, 2009 Filing 182 JOINT MOTION to substitute filed by American Airlines, Inc., Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
November 12, 2009 Filing 181 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 180 MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record in Support of American's Motion for Sanctions for Failure to Produce and Preserve Documents. (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 12, 2009 Filing 180 MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record in Support of American's Motion for Sanctions for Failure to Produce and Preserve Documents filed by American Airlines, Inc. with Brief in Support. (cxb)
November 12, 2009 Filing 179 REPLY AND Brief in Support re: 108 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by American Airlines, Inc. (cxb)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER Came on to be considered Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to file a Sur-Reply to American Airlines' Reply to Yahoo!'s Response to Motion for SanctionsThe Court finds that the motion is well taken and should be granted. The Sur-Reply be filed with a filing date of November 3, 2009. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/9/09) (dld)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER: Came on to be considered Defendants' Unopposed Motion For Leave To File Documents Under Seal. The Court, having considered the motion, finds that the following order should be rendered. Therefore, The Court orders that the Clerk of Court shall file the following items among the papers of this case under seal: (1) Plaintiff American Airlines, Inc.'s Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Plaintiffs SealedAppendix In Support of Its Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment; (3) Plaintiffs Sealed Appendix Supporting Plaintiffs Reply Brief Relative to its Motion for Sanctions; and (4) Defendants' Supplemental Appendix in Support of Defendants' Response and Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. To Be filed with Nov 2, 2009 filing date. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/9/09) (dld)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER: On November 2, 2009, defendants, Yahoo! Inc. and Overture Services, Inc., d/b/a Yahoo Search Marketing, filed their motion for leave to file documents under seal and their supporting brief. On the date of the signing of this order, the court signed the order tendered to the court by the parties granting such motion, and ordered the documents listed in the order filed with a November 2, 2009 filing date. The court has two extra copies of those documents apparently supplied as exhibits to such motion. The court no longer has a need for those exhibits Therefore, the court is making known to counsel for defendants that the two sets of exhibits to defendants'are available to be picked up in the office of the Clerk of Court by 2:00 p.m., on November 12, 2009. The court also has possession of two sets of documents (fivevolumes in each set), each titled "Appendix in Support of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Yahoo's Motion for Summary Judgment." The court cannot find anything that would explain why the court has possession of those documents, If either party considers that such set of documents should be filed, such party should inform the court of that fact by an appropriatefiling. Otherwise, such documents will be available to be retrieved by counsel for plaintiff, American Airlines, Inc., from the office of the Clerk of Court by 2:00 p.m., on November 12, 2009. So that the court can properly monitor requests for sealing of documents, the court directs the parties that from this point forward, they will not, without leave of court evidenced by an order signed by the court, file any document under seal, notwithstanding the language of Local Civil Rule L.R. 79.3(1). When seeking leave to file a document under seal/ the parties will not file the motion for leave under seal. The parties need not attach to the motion for leave as an exhibit or exhibits the document or documents requested to be sealed. However/appropriate reference will be made in the motion for leave to the document or documents that will be tendered for filing under seal along with the motion for leave. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/9/09) (dld)
November 6, 2009 Filing 172 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 171 MOTION To Exclude The Expert Report of Isabella Cunningham and BRIEF in Support (dld)...NOT IMAGED, SPIRAL BOUND Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 6, 2009 Filing 171 MOTION To Exclude The Expert Report of Isabella Cunningham and BRIEF in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. (dld)
November 6, 2009 Filing 170 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 168 MOTION to Strike (dld) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 6, 2009 Filing 169 Brief in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 168 MOTION to Strike (dld)
November 6, 2009 Filing 168 MOTION to Strike Daniel J. Slottje As Expert filed by American Airlines, Inc. (dld)
November 6, 2009 Filing 167 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix of Non-Federal Authorities in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 165 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Ronald C Goodstein (dld) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 6, 2009 Filing 166 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 165 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Ronald C Goodstein (dld) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 6, 2009 Filing 165 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Ronald C Goodstein filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (dld)
November 6, 2009 Filing 164 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 163 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Basil G. Englis (dld) Modified on 11/10/2009 (dld)...Spiral Bound Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 6, 2009 Filing 163 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Basil G. Englis filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (dld)
November 6, 2009 Filing 162 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 161 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Daniel L Jackson (dld) (dld). Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 6, 2009 Filing 161 MOTION To Exclude Testimony of Daniel L Jackson filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (dld)
November 3, 2009 Filing 175 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 174 Sur-reply to Response (dld) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 3, 2009 Filing 174 Sur-reply in Opposition filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 100 MOTION for Sanctions (dld)
November 3, 2009 Filing 143 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion for Sanctions filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
November 3, 2009 Filing 142 JOINT MOTION regarding briefing schedule on Daubert motions filed by American Airlines, Inc., Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
November 2, 2009 Filing 198 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support (Volume 5) filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 148 *SEALED* Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Yahoo Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment. [USC/not imaged, spiral bound, 300+ pgs.] (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 2, 2009 Filing 197 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support (Volume 4) filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 148 *SEALED* Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Yahoo Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment. [USC/not imaged, spiral bound, 300+ pgs.] (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 2, 2009 Filing 196 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support (Volume 3) filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 148 *SEALED* Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Yahoo Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment. [USC/not imaged, spiral bound, 200+ pgs.] (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 2, 2009 Filing 195 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support (Volume 2) filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 148 *SEALED* Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Yahoo Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment. [USC/not imaged, spiral bound, 300+ pgs.] (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 2, 2009 Filing 194 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support (Volume 1) filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 148 *SEALED* Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Yahoo Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment. [USC/not imaged, spiral bound, 300+ pgs.] (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 2, 2009 Filing 159 *** STRICKEN per 193 order. *** Appendix (Volume 7) in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 148 *SEALED* Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Yahoo Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment (dld)...NOT IMAGED, SPIRAL BOUND Modified on 11/18/2009 (cxb).
November 2, 2009 Filing 158 *** STRICKEN per 193 order. *** Appendix (Volume 6) in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 148 *SEALED* Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Yahoo Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment (dld)...NOT IMAGED, SPIRAL BOUND Modified on 11/18/2009 (cxb).
November 2, 2009 Filing 157 *** STRICKEN per 193 order. *** Appendix (Volume 5) in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 148 *SEALED* Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Yahoo Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment (dld)...NOT IMAGED, SPIRAL BOUND Modified on 11/18/2009 (cxb).
November 2, 2009 Filing 156 *** STRICKEN per 193 order. *** Appendix (Volume 4) in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 148 *SEALED* Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Yahoo Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment (dld)...NOT IMAGED, SPIRAL BOUND Modified on 11/18/2009 (cxb).
November 2, 2009 Filing 155 *** STRICKEN per 193 order. *** Appendix (Volume 3) in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 148 *SEALED* Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Yahoo Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment (dld)...NOT IMAGED, SPIRAL BOUND Modified on 11/18/2009 (cxb).
November 2, 2009 Filing 154 *** STRICKEN per 193 order. *** Appendix (Volume 2) in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 148 *SEALED* Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Yahoo Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment (dld)...NOT IMAGED, SPIRAL BOUND Modified on 11/18/2009 (cxb).
November 2, 2009 Filing 153 *** STRICKEN per 193 order. *** Appendix (Volume 1) in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 148 *SEALED* Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Yahoo Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment (dld)...NOT IMAGED, SPIRAL BOUND Modified on 11/18/2009 (cxb).
November 2, 2009 Filing 139 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 137 Response in Opposition. [USC/not imaged, spiral bound, 350+ pgs.] (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 2, 2009 Filing 138 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 136 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix (contd)) [USC/spiral bound, 50+ pgs.] (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 2, 2009 Filing 137 RESPONSE AND BRIEF in Opposition filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 108 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (cxb)
November 2, 2009 Filing 136 REPLY re: 100 MOTION for Sanctions filed by American Airlines, Inc. (cxb)
November 2, 2009 Filing 135 EMERGENCY JOINT MOTION to permit submission of materials subject to a motion to seal filed by American Airlines, Inc., Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 131 Emergency Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. The court orders that the parties file the following documents, if they choose to make such a filing, by 4:00 p.m. on Monday, November 2, 2009......[see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 10/27/09) (cxb)
October 27, 2009 Filing 131 EMERGENCY JOINT MOTION to Extend deadlines filed by American Airlines, Inc., Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
October 26, 2009 Filing 123 Order Striking/Unfiling 101 Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc., 110 Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc., 112 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Overture Services, Inc., Yahoo! Inc, 113 Appendix in Support filed by Overture Services, Inc., Yahoo! Inc, 114 Appendix in Support filed by Overture Services, Inc., Yahoo! Inc, 115 Appendix in Support filed by Overture Services, Inc., Yahoo! Inc, 116 Appendix in Support filed by Overture Services, Inc., Yahoo! Inc; said documents to be picked up from the Clerk's office by 2:00 p.m. on Oct 30, 2009. Corrected Appendix in Support of Defendants' Motion for S/J (unredacted), and 2 vols of Junk Appendix in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions etc to be filed as of 9/23/09. The court does not consider any of the filings in camera and the court will consider all filings open to the public view as part of the public records of this action. [see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 10/26/09) (cxb) Modified on 10/28/2009 (dld).
October 13, 2009 Filing 122 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 121 Response to Motion (dld)...NOT IMAGED/SPIRAL BOUND Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
October 13, 2009 Filing 121 RESPONSE filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 100 MOTION for Sanctions (dld)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting 118 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Alison M. Tucher on behalf of defendants, Yahoo, Inc and Overture Services Inc. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 10/13/2009) (dld) ...cy to Atty Tucher
October 9, 2009 Filing 119 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John McBryde: Telephone Conference. Court will strike all apprendices that have been redacted, and wants parties to file additional copies of unredacted appendices. Court will issue order explaining what exactly the parties are to do. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Lars Berg, Scott Wheatley, Fred Brown, Dee Kelly; Defense - Anthony rodriguez, Scott Fredericks, David Munio, David Chappell. (Court Reporter Eileen Brewer.) Time in Court: 5 minutes. (dld)
October 9, 2009 Filing 118 APPLICATION for admission pro hac vice (by Alison M Tucher) filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
October 8, 2009 Filing 128 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...CORRECTED Appendix in Support - VOLUME V filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment. [USC/not imaged, spiral bound, 150+ pgs.] Per 123 Order dated 10/26/09. (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
October 8, 2009 Filing 127 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...CORRECTED Appendix in Support - VOLUME IV filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment. [USC/not imaged, spiral bound, 150+ pgs.] Per 123 Order dated 10/26/09. (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
October 8, 2009 Filing 126 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...CORRECTED Appendix in Support - VOLUME III filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment. [USC/not imaged, spiral bound, 150+ pgs.] Per 123 Order dated 10/26/09. (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
October 8, 2009 Filing 125 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...CORRECTED Appendix in Support - VOLUME II filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment. [USC/not imaged, spiral bound, 150+ pgs.] Per 123 Order dated 10/26/09. (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
October 8, 2009 Filing 124 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...CORRECTED Appendix in Support - VOLUME 1 filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment. [USC/not imaged, spiral bound, 150+ pgs.] Per 123 Order dated 10/26/09. (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
October 8, 2009 Filing 117 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Appendix filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
October 7, 2009 Filing 134 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 108 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix (contd), # 2 Appendix (contd), # 3 Appendix (contd)) [USC/spiral bound.] (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
October 7, 2009 Filing 133 Brief in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Brief (contd)) [Filed per 123 order.] [USC/spiral bound] (cxb)
October 7, 2009 Filing 116 STRICKEN PER ORDER, DOC# 123...Appendix in Support - Volume 2 filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted). (4 of 4) [USC/Not imaged.] (cxb) Modified on 10/28/2009 (dld).
October 7, 2009 Filing 115 STRICKEN PER ORDER, DOC# 123...Appendix in Support - Volume 1 filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted). (3 of 4) [USC/Not imaged.] (cxb) Modified on 10/28/2009 (dld).
October 7, 2009 Filing 114 STRICKEN PER ORDER, DOC# 123...Appendix in Support - Volume 2 filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted). (2 of 4) [USC/Not imaged.] (cxb) Modified on 10/28/2009 (dld).
October 7, 2009 Filing 113 STRICKEN PER ORDER, DOC# 123...Appendix in Support - Volume 1 filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted). (1 of 4) [USC/Not imaged.] (cxb) Modified on 10/28/2009 (dld).
October 7, 2009 Filing 112 STRICKEN PER ORDER, DOC# 123...Brief in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted Version). (Attachments: # 1 (Brief in Support - contd)) [USC, spiral bound.] (cxb) Modified on 10/28/2009 (dld).
October 7, 2009 Filing 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
October 7, 2009 Filing 110 STRICKEN PER ORDER, DOC# 123...Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 108 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 (Appendix - contd)) [USC, spiral bound.] (cxb) Modified on 10/28/2009 (dld).
October 7, 2009 Filing 109 Brief in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 108 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (cxb)
October 7, 2009 Filing 108 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by American Airlines, Inc. (cxb)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 106 Motion to Withdraw 102 MOTION for Protective Order. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 10/2/09) (cxb)
October 2, 2009 Filing 106 MOTION to Withdraw 102 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Papa Wolf LLC. (cxb)
September 30, 2009 Filing 105 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to 98 First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
September 30, 2009 Filing 104 RESPONSE filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 103 September 29, 2009 Order. (cxb)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: Settng Deadlines as to 102 Motion for Protective Order. (Response due by 10:00 a.m. on 9/30/2009) At the same time, plaintiff should file a document giving a detailed explanation as to why plaintiff's counsel did not timely respond to the September 24, 2009, letter from J. Michael Weston to Scott R. Wiehle. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 9/29/09) (cxb)
September 29, 2009 Filing 102 *** WITHDRAWN per 107 order.*** MOTION for Protective Order filed by Papa Wolf LLC. (cxb) Modified on 10/2/2009 (cxb).
September 23, 2009 Filing 130 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...CORRECTED Junk Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 100 MOTION for Sanctions [USC/not imaged, 2 volumes spiral bound, 150+ pgs.] Per 123 Order dated 10/26/09. (uls) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
September 23, 2009 Filing 129 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...CORRECTED Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 100 MOTION for Sanctions [USC/not imaged, spiral bound, 150+ pgs.] Per 123 Order dated 10/26/09. (uls) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
September 23, 2009 Filing 101 STRICKEN PER ORDER, DOC# 123...Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 100 MOTION for Sanctions (dld)... REDACTED...NOT IMAGED, SPIRAL BOUND Modified on 10/28/2009 (dld).
September 23, 2009 Filing 100 MOTION for Sanctions For Failure to Produce and Preserve Documents filed by American Airlines, Inc. with BRIEF in Support (dld)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER denying as moot 95 Motion to leave to file a first amended answer. Per Federal Rule of Civil Procedure lS(a) (3), defendants have until September 30, 2009, to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 9/16/09) (cxb)
September 15, 2009 Filing 98 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (dld)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 96 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. See order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 9/15/09) (dld)
September 14, 2009 Filing 96 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by American Airlines, Inc. with Brief in Support. (Attachments: # 1 (contd), # 2 (contd)) (cxb)
September 14, 2009 Filing 95 Unopposed MOTION For Leave to File First Amended Answer filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (dld)
September 11, 2009 Filing 94 Sur-reply in Opposition filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 84 MOTION to Compel. (cxb)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER RE DISCOVERY: re 84 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel.... ORDERS that defendants provide to plaintiff by November 12, 2009, all ESI responsive to plaintiff's discovery requests. Defendants' Motion to Compel.... defendants' request for an order directing plaintiff to respond to five interrogatories.....is hereby, denied. ORDERS that the oral deposition of plaintiff be resumed through Curry....at 9:00 a.m. on September 29, 2009. [see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 9/11/09) (cxb)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying 91 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 9/11/09) (cxb)
September 10, 2009 Filing 91 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time deadlines filed by American Airlines, Inc. (cxb)
September 9, 2009 Filing 90 REPLY BRIEF in support re: 84 MOTION to Compel filed by Yahoo! Inc. (cxb)
September 8, 2009 Filing 89 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 88 Response in Opposition. (100+ pgs, spiral bound/USC, not imaged.) (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
September 8, 2009 Filing 88 RESPONSE BRIEF in Opposition filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 84 MOTION to Compel and for Expedited Consideration. (cxb)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER: Setting Deadlines as to 84 Motion to Compel and for Expedited Consideration. (American Airlines Inc response due by 2:00 p.m. on 9/8/2009) (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 9/3/09) (cxb)
September 2, 2009 Filing 86 SUR-REPLY filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. to 83 American Airlines' Reply to Yahoo!'s Further Statement Concerning ESI.(cxb)
September 1, 2009 Filing 85 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 84 MOTION to Compel and for Expedited Consideration. [USC, spiral bound/Not imaged.] (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
September 1, 2009 Filing 84 MOTION to Compel and for Expedited Consideration filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. with Brief in Support. (cxb)
September 1, 2009 Filing 83 REPLY filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 82 RESPONSE to Statement of American Airlines Concerning the Restoration of Electronically Stored Information. (cxb)
August 28, 2009 Filing 82 RESPONSE to Statement of American Airlines Concerning the Restoration of Electronically Stored Information filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
August 28, 2009 Filing 81 NOTICE of Filing Original Declaration re: 80 JOINT REPORT of Meeting Regarding ESI Issues filed by American Airlines, Inc. (cxb)
August 27, 2009 Filing 80 JOINT REPORT of Meeting Regarding ESI Issues filed by American Airlines, Inc., Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
August 21, 2009 Filing 79 DECLARATION of Jyothi Sunnadkal Pursuant to 71 Order Regarding Yahoo's Electronically Stored Information filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (dld)
August 21, 2009 Filing 78 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on August 11, 2009, before Judge McBryde. Court Reporter/Transcriber Eileen Brewer, Telephone number 817-850-6661. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Redaction Request - Transcript must be filed within 21 days. If no such Request is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. If redaction request filed, this transcript will not be accessible via PACER; see redacted transcript. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. Redaction Request due 9/11/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2009. (emb)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 74 Motion to Extend Deadline to Comply with the Court's August 4, 2009 Corrected Order. Defendants shall have until 5:00 p.m. Pacific DaylightTime on August 28, 2009 to conduct (i) searches for responsive information...... [see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 8/17/09) (cxb)
August 17, 2009 Filing 76 Expert Designation by American Airlines, Inc. (cxb)
August 17, 2009 Filing 75 Designation of Experts by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
August 14, 2009 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline to Comply with the Courts August 4, 2009 Corrected Order filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (krg)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 72 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Brooks M. Beard on behalf of defendants (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 8/14/2009) (krg)
August 13, 2009 Filing 72 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Brooks M. Beard on behalf of Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (krg)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: granting 64 Overture Services, Inc., Yahoo! Inc's MOTION for Reconsideration of 60 Order, insofar as the portion of the court's August 4 order directing defendants to produce electronically stored information by August 10, 2009, is hereby set aside. Defendants have until 3:00 p.m. on August 21, 2009, to file with the court serve on opposing counsel a new declaration as discussed in the August 11, 2009 telephone conference. By August 25, 2009, technological experts for both parties meet in Fort Worth, Texas, or some other place upon which the parties mutually agree and discuss the production of defendants' electronically stored information. By 3:00 p.m. on August 27, 2009, both parties file a report of the meeting. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 8/11/09) (dld)
August 11, 2009 Filing 70 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John McBryde: Telephone Conference regarding defendants motion to reconsider, order to follow. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Fred Brown and Lars Berg; Defense - David Chappell, Scott Frdericks, Michael Jacobs, Tony rodriguez and Dan Muino. (Court Reporter Eileen Brewer.) Time in Court: 15 minutes. (dld)
August 11, 2009 Filing 69 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 68 Reply in Support (krg) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
August 11, 2009 Filing 68 Reply in Support of 64 MOTION to Reconsider Portion of August 4, 2009 Corrected Order on Motion to Compel re 60 Order filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (krg)
August 10, 2009 Filing 67 RESPONSE filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 64 MOTION to Reconsider Portion of August 4, 2009 Corrected Order on Motion to Compel re 60 Order (krg)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re 64 Motions to Reconsider Portion of August 4, 2009 Corrected Order on Motion to Compel... that by 3:00 p.m. on August 10, 2009, plaintiff, American Airlines, Inc., file a response to such motion. See Order for further specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 8/10/2009) (krg)
August 7, 2009 Filing 65 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 64 MOTION to Reconsider Portion of August 4, 2009 Corrected Order on Motion to Compel re 60 Order (krg) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
August 7, 2009 Filing 64 MOTION to Reconsider Portion of August 4, 2009 Corrected Order on Motion to Compel re 60 Order filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (krg)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re 57 OPPOSED MOTION to Extend deadline to designate experts & set rebuttal expert deadline. The court has concluded that there should be an extension of time to 10:00 a.m. on August 17, 2009, for compliance with the requirements of paragraph 15, on page 6, of the March 13, 2009, Order Setting Schedule and Providing Special Pretrial Instructions, and that all other relief sought by such motion should be denied. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 8/6/09) (cxb)
August 6, 2009 Filing 62 REPLY in Support re: 57 MOTION to Extend deadline to designate experts & set rebuttal expert deadline MOTION to Expedite filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
August 6, 2009 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 57 MOTION to Extend deadline to designate experts & set rebuttal expert deadline. (cxb)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CORRECTED ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL (This corrected order corrects, and replaces in its entirety, the Order on Motion to Compel the court signed in the above-captioned case on August 3, 2009.) that: (1) defendants, Yahoo! Inc. and Overture Services, Inc., produce by August 10, 2009, all ESI responsive to American's discovery requests; (2) Yahoo's relevancy and burden objections are overruled and Yahoo produce by August 17, 2009, any material withheld based on these overruled objections........[see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 8/4/09) (cxb)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Compel. Ordered that (1) defendants Yahoo! Inc. and Overture Services, Inc. shall produce by July 24, 2009 all ESI responsive to American's discovery requests; (2) Yahoo's relevancy and burden objections are overruled and Yahoo is required to produce by July 31, 2009 any material withheld based on these overruled objections..... [see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 8/3/09) (cxb)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: Setting Deadlines as to 57 Motion to Extend deadline to designate experts & set rebuttal expert deadline. (Plaintiff's Response due by 12:00 p.m. on 8/6/2009) (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 8/3/09) (cxb)
August 3, 2009 Filing 57 OPPOSED MOTION & BRIEF to Extend deadline to designate experts & set rebuttal expert deadline AND REQUEST for Expedited Consideration filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 55 Motion to Extend due date for defendants to supplement their document production and interrogatory responses. The Court orders that the defendants shall supplement their document production, admissions responses, and interrogatory responses in response to Plaintiff's discovery requests by delivering same to Plaintiff, through its attorney, by the end of the day on Friday, 7/31/09. Thereafter, Plaintiff may reurge its motion to compel, in whole or in part, by delivering notice to Defendants and the Court nlt 4:00 p.m. on 8/13/09. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 7/24/09) (cxb) Modified on 7/27/2009 (cxb).
July 24, 2009 Filing 55 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend due date for defendants to supplement their document production and interrogatory responses filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
July 23, 2009 Filing 54 REPLY BRIEF re: 43 MOTION to Compel filed by American Airlines, Inc. (dld)
July 22, 2009 Filing 53 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Corrected Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 48 Response in Opposition (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment) (krg) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Leave to File... that the Clerk of Court shall file Defendants' Corrected Appendix in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff American Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery and Brief in Support among the papers of this case. See Order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 7/21/2009) (krg)
July 21, 2009 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to file corrected appendix filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
July 20, 2009 Filing 50 Order Unfiling 49 Appendix in Support filed by Overture Services, Inc., Yahoo! Inc due to the following deficiency: Appendix is not spiral bound with pertinent portions highlighted. [see order for specifics]. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 7/20/09) (cxb)
July 17, 2009 Filing 49 *** UNFILED per 50 order. *** Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 48 Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment) (krg) Modified on 7/20/2009 (cxb).
July 17, 2009 Filing 48 Opposition filed by Yahoo! Inc, Overture Services, Inc. re 43 MOTION to Compel Discovery (krg)
July 17, 2009 Filing 47 Report in Response to the Court's July 14, 2009 Order filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 46 Order (krg)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Setting Deadlines as to 43 Motion to Compel. (Expedited Response due by 4:00 p.m. on 7/17/2009.) The court will hold the motion in abeyance to allow the parties one final opportunity to settle their discovery disputes. [see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 7/14/09) (cxb)
July 13, 2009 Filing 45 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support (Volume 2) filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 43 MOTION to Compel and REQUEST for Expedited Consideration. (Spiral bound, not imaged/USC.) (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
July 13, 2009 Filing 44 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support (Volume 1) filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 43 MOTION to Compel and REQUEST for Expedited Consideration. (Spiral bound, not imaged/USC.) (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
July 13, 2009 Filing 43 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by American Airlines, Inc. with Brief in Support AND REQUEST for Expedited Consideration. (cxb)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 41 Motion for admission pro hac vice by D Anthony Rodriguez on behalf of defendants, Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. The court directs the clerk of the court to deposit the application fee into the account of the Non-Appropriated Fund of this court. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 5/11/09) (cxb) Modified on 5/12/2009/Dist 5/12, copy mailed to attorney Rodriguez; notice turned off, has no email address Modified on 7/14/2009/Notice turned on (cxb).
May 11, 2009 Filing 41 APPLICATION/MOTION for admission pro hac vice by D Anthony Rodriguez filed by Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Motion for admission pro hac vice by Daniel P Muino on behalf of defendants, Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. The court directs the clerk of the court to deposit the application fee into the account of the Non-Appropriated Fund of this court. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 4/22/09) (cxb) Modified on 4/22/2009/Dist 4/22, copy mailed to attorney Muino; notice turned off, has no email address (cxb).
April 21, 2009 Filing 39 APPLICATION/MOTION for admission pro hac vice by Daniel P Muino filed by Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE AND PROVIDING SPECIAL PRETRIAL INSTRUCTIONS: Amended Pleadings due by 9/14/2009. Discovery due by 11/16/2009. Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2009 09:30 AM before Judge John McBryde. Joinder of Parties due by 7/6/2009. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2010 09:00 AM before Judge John McBryde. See order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 3/13/09) (dld)
March 12, 2009 Filing 37 JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by American Airlines, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc.. (dld)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 4:00 p.m. on 3/12/2009, and shall address in separate paragraphs each of the following matters. [see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 2/10/09) (cxb)
February 9, 2009 Filing 35 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Yahoo! Inc., and Overture Services, Inc.; Answer due 2/9/2009. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 1/30/09) (dld)
January 30, 2009 Filing 33 UNOPPOSED Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 16 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Case out of District/Division. [see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 1/16/09) (cxb)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 Application for admission pro hac vice by David E Melaugh on behalf of defendants. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 1/15/09) [Mailed copy to attorney, notice turned off, no email address.] (cxb).
January 14, 2009 Filing 30 APPLICATION/MOTION for admission pro hac vice by David E Melaugh filed by Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
January 9, 2009 Filing 29 UNFILED PER ORDER (DOC# 236)...Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. re 28 Reply to Response to Motion. (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
January 9, 2009 Filing 28 REPLY re: 16 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
January 9, 2009 Filing 27 UNFILED PER ORDER, DOC# 236...SUPPLEMENTAL Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 26 Response in Opposition. (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
January 9, 2009 Filing 26 NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL EVIDENCE in Opposition filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 16 MOTION to Transfer. (cxb)
December 23, 2008 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dee J Kelly, Jr, Dee J Kelly, Sr, counsel for American Airlines, Inc. New address is: 555 Mission Street, Suite 3000, San Francisco, CA 94105-2933. (cxb)
December 22, 2008 Filing 24 UNFILED PER ORDER, DOC# 236...Appendix in Support filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 23 Response in Opposition. (Attachments: # 1 (cont'd)) (cxb) Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
December 22, 2008 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by American Airlines, Inc. re 16 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division. (cxb)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 12/11/08) (dld)
December 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Agreed Joint Motion to Extend Time. Response due by 12/22/2008. Reply due by 1/9/2009. [see order for specifics] (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 12/11/08) (cxb)
December 10, 2008 Filing 20 AGREED JOINT MOTION to Extend deadlines filed by American Airlines, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
December 1, 2008 Filing 19 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
November 24, 2008 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
November 24, 2008 Filing 17 UNFILED PER ORDER, DOC# 236...Appendix in Support filed by Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. re 16 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division. (cxb) (uls). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2008: # 1 Exhibit A through D, # 2 Exhibit E) (uls). Modified on 12/9/2009 (dld).
November 24, 2008 Filing 16 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. with Brief in Support. (cxb)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 9 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Howard S Hogan. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/21/08) (cxb)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 10 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Jason Stavers. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/21/08) (cxb) Modified on 11/24/2008/Corrected linkage (cxb).
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 8 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Frederick Brown. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/21/08) (cxb)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 7 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Lynn M Humphreys. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/21/08) (cxb)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 6 Motion for admission pro hac vice of Michael A Jacobs. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/21/08) (cxb)
November 21, 2008 Filing 10 MOTION for admission pro hac vice by Jason Stavers filed for American Airlines, Inc. (cxb)
November 21, 2008 Filing 9 MOTION for admission pro hac vice by Howard Hogan filed for American Airlines, Inc. (cxb)
November 21, 2008 Filing 8 MOTION for admission pro hac vice by Frederick Brown filed for American Airlines, Inc. (cxb)
November 20, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION for admission pro hac vice filed by Lynn M Humphreys for Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
November 20, 2008 Filing 6 APPLICATION for admission pro hac vice filed by Michael A Jacobs for Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. (cxb)
October 31, 2008 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Overture Services, Inc.; served on 10/24/2008 via CMRRR. (Original green card attached.) (Attachments: # 1 Return Receipt) (cxb)
October 23, 2008 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Yahoo! Inc. ; served on 10/20/2008. (krg)
October 17, 2008 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc.. (krg)
October 17, 2008 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by American Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate AMR Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate American Eagle, Inc. for American Airlines, Inc.. (krg)
October 17, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Yahoo! Inc., Overture Services, Inc. filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (Filing fee $350; Receipt number FW007135) (krg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Airlines, Inc. v. Yahoo! Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Lars L Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overture Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?