McCully v. Stephenville Independent School District et al
Plaintiff: |
Kevin McCully |
Defendant: |
William Joe Carter, Stephenville Independent School District and Rachel Carter |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv00702 |
Filed: |
August 27, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Texas |
Office: |
Fort Worth Office |
County: |
Erath |
Presiding Judge: |
John McBryde |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1343 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 14, 2014 |
Filing
130
Memorandum Opinion and Order...SISD's motion for summary judgment is granted; all claims by plaintiffs against SISD are dismissed. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 8/14/2014) (wrb)
|
January 24, 2014 |
Filing
88
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss filed by Stephenville Independent School District... the corrected motion to dismiss filed by Stephenville ISD be, and is hereby, granted in part, and that all claims asserted by plaintiffs against Stephenville ISD except plaintiffs' equal treatment claim under Title IX of the Education Amendments of 1972 be, and are hereby, dismissed with prejudice. The court further ORDERS that the corrected mot ion to dismiss filed by Stephenville ISD be, and is hereby, denied as to the claim asserted by plaintiffs against Stephenville ISD for equal treatment under Title IX of the Education Amendments of 1972. The court further ORDERS that the motion to dismiss for lack of capacity filed by Stephenville ISD be, and is hereby, denied as moot. See Order for further specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 1/24/2014) (krg)
|
December 23, 2013 |
Filing
85
Memorandum Opinion and Order...TASB have and recover from McCully and Izen jointly and severally, $6,253.00 as attorney's fees incurred by TASB on behalf of the Carters in connection with this action. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 12/23/2013) (wrb)
|
November 13, 2013 |
Filing
46
Memorandum Opinion and Order The Corrected 19 Motion to Dismiss filed by Stephenville Independent School District is granted; 21 Motion to Dismiss filed by Rachel Carter, William Joe Carter is granted...the ruling on the remaining grounds of Stephenville ISD's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is held in abeyance as is the motion filed by Stephenville IDS to dismiss for lack of capacity. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/13/2013) (wrb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?