The Dallas/Fort Worth International Airport Board v. Inet Airport Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
The Dallas/Fort Worth International Airport Board |
Defendant: |
Inet Airport Systems, Inc., Michael F. Colaco and Hartford Fire Insurance Company |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv00753 |
Filed: |
September 12, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Texas |
Office: |
Fort Worth Office |
County: |
Tarrant |
Presiding Judge: |
John McBryde |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 21, 2017 |
Filing
286
Memorandum Opinion and Order granting 257 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Inet Airport Systems, LLC., Inet Airport Systems, Inc. The court ORDERS that INET's second motion for attorney's fees be, and is hereby, granted, and t hat INET LLC have and recover from plaintiff its reasonable attorney's fees in the amount of One Million, Five Hundred Ninety Thousand, Eighty-Five and 23/100 Dollars ($1,590,085.23). (see order for further specifics) (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 9/21/2017) (mpw)
|
June 16, 2015 |
Filing
157
Memorandum Opinion and Order: The court ORDERS that INET LLC is the appropriate entity to which plaintiff should pay the $318,189.40 previously determined to be owed and that INET LLC should recover from DFW reasonable and necessary attorney's fees in the amount of $975,539.34, for a total recovery by INET LLC from DFW of $1,293,728.74. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 6/16/2015) (trs)
|
April 27, 2015 |
Filing
103
Memorandum Opinion and Order 87 Motion to Dismiss filed by The Dallas/Fort Worth International Airport Board. The court ORDERS that DFW's motion to dismiss counterclaim be, and is hereby, denied. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 4/27/2015) (ewd)
|
March 30, 2015 |
Filing
85
Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part denying in part 45 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by The Dallas/Fort Worth International Airport Board; granting 55 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michael F. Colaco, Inet Air port Systems, Inc., Hartford Fire Insurance Company: In accordance with the discussion herein, the court ORDERS that: (A) DFW's motion for summary judgment be, and is hereby, granted as to Defendants' requests for relief under theories o f unjust enrichment and money had and received; (B) DFW's motion for summary judgment be, and is hereby, otherwise denied; (C) Defendants' motion for summary judgment be, and is hereby, granted; and, (D) DFW's claims against Hartford be, and are hereby, dismissed with prejudice. The court determines that there is no just reason for delay in, and hereby directs entry of, final judgment as to the dismissal of DFW's claims against Hartford. The court directs the parties to take into account these rulings in preparing their joint pretrial order. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 3/30/2015) (mdf)
|
January 28, 2014 |
Filing
27
Memorandum Opinion and Order denying 18 Motion to Dismiss filed by The Dallas/Fort Worth International Airport Board: After having considered such motion, Inet LLC's response, plaintiff's reply, and legal authorities to which the pa rties have called the court's attention in support of and in opposition to such motion, the court has not been persuaded that such motion should be granted. Therefore, the court is denying such motion on the assumption that the issues presented by the motion will be re-urged in a summary judgment context if plaintiff persists in its belief that the legal theories it presents in its motion are factually and legally based. (See order for specifics.) (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 1/28/2014) (mdf)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?