Lincoln et al v. City of Colleyville Texas et al
Plaintiff: |
Erin Lincoln and Kathleen Lincoln |
Defendant: |
City of Colleyville Texas, J. Campbell, Brian Goen, Loren Walden, Dustin Black and City of North Richland Hills, TX |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv00819 |
Filed: |
October 29, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Texas |
Office: |
Fort Worth Office |
County: |
Tarrant |
Presiding Judge: |
John McBryde |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 13, 2017 |
Filing
126
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court ORDERS that Barnes's 118 motion for summary judgment be, and is hereby, granted; that Erin's claims against Barnes be, and are hereby, dismissed; and, that Erin take nothing on her claims against Barnes. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 7/13/2017) (bdb)
|
January 17, 2017 |
Filing
108
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER The court ORDERS that the 94 motion for summary judgment of Meeks and Scott be, and is hereby, granted; that Erin take nothing on her claims against Meeks and Scott; and that Erin's claims against Meeks and Scott be, and are hereby, dismissed. The court determines that there is no just reason for delay in, and hereby directs, entry of final judgment as to the dismissal of Erin's claims against Meeks and Scott. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 1/17/2017) (tln)
|
May 23, 2016 |
Filing
80
Memorandum Opinion and Order granting 77 Motion to Dismiss filed by Patrick Turner, Jimmy Rodriguez. The court determines that there is no just reason for delay in, and hereby directs, entry of final judgment as to the dismissal of plaintiffs' claims against defendants Turner and Rodriguez. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 5/23/2016) (tln)
|
April 8, 2016 |
Filing
74
Memorandum Opinion and Order granting 67 MOTION and Brief to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, and in the Alternative, Request for Rule 7(a) Reply to Immune Defense. The court ORDERS that movants' motion to dismiss be, and is her eby, granted, and that plaintiffs' claims against Lewis and Stites be, and are hereby, dismissed. The court determines that there is no just reason for delay in, and hereby directs, entry of final judgment as to the dismissal of plaintiffs' claims against defendants Lewis and Stites. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 4/8/2016) (tln)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?