Texas et al v. United States of America et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs allege that the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (ACA) became unlawful after President Trump signed the Tax Cuts and Jobs Act of 2017, which eliminated the tax penalty of the ACA. Plaintiffs contend that without the tax penalty, the individual mandate becomes unconstitutional. Plaintiffs conclude that since the individual mandate was essential to the ACA, the remainder of the ACA must also fall since the guaranteed issue and community rating requirements would not function without the coverage requirement.

Plaintiff: Texas, Wisconsin, Alabama, Arizona, Florida, Georgia, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Paul LePage, Mississippi, Missouri, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Utah, West Virgina and Arkansas
Defendant: United States of America, Department of Health & Human Services, Alex Azar, United States Interval Revenue Services and David Kautter
Case Number: 4:2018cv00167
Filed: February 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Office: Fort Worth Office
County: Travis
Presiding Judge: Reed C. O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Munera Al-Fuhaid for party(s) Appellee Neill Hurley Appellee John Nantz, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER of USCA No. 19-10011 as to 224 Notice of Appeal, filed by State of Virginia, State of Hawaii, State of Rhode Island, State of Minnesota, State of Kentucky, State of Vermont, State of New Jersey, State of Connecticut, State of Oregon, State of Illinois, District of Columbia, State of North Carolina, State of Delaware, State of Massachusetts, State of California, State of New York, State of Washington, 230 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Kautter, Department of Health & Human Services, United States of America, Alex Azar, United States Interval Revenue Services. The court has granted the motion of Attorney Kimberly A. Cahall towithdraw as counsel. (tle)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER of USCA No. 19-10011 as to 224 Notice of Appeal, filed by State of Virginia, State of Hawaii, State of Rhode Island, State of Minnesota, State of Kentucky, State of Vermont, State of New Jersey, State of Connecticut, State of Oregon, State of Illinois, District of Columbia, State of North Carolina, State of Delaware, State of Massachusetts, State of California, State of New York, State of Washington, 230 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Kautter, Department of Health & Human Services, United States of America, Alex Azar, United States Interval Revenue Services...The court has granted the motion of Attorney Brett A. Shumate to withdraw as counsel. (tle)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER granting 253 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brett A. Shumate is withdrawn as counsel for Defendant the United States of America, and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to update the docket sheet consistent with this Order. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/12/2019) (trt)
April 11, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Matthew S. Hellman for Amicus Curiae Bipartisan Economic Scholars in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted.
April 11, 2019 Filing 253 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brett A. Shumate filed by Alex Azar, Department of Health & Human Services, David Kautter, United States Interval Revenue Services, United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Shumate, Brett)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER of USCA No. 19-10011 as to 224 Notice of Appeal, filed by State of Virginia, State of Hawaii, State of Rhode Island, State of Minnesota, State of Kentucky, State of Vermont, State of New Jersey, State of Connecticut, State of Oregon, State of Illinois, District of Columbia, State of North Carolina, State of Delaware, State of Massachusetts, State of California, State of New York, State of Washington, 230 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Kautter, Department of Health & Human Services, United States of America, Alex Azar, United States Interval Revenue Services...IT IS ORDERED that the appellants' unopposed motion to expedite oral argument is GRANTED. (tle)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER of USCA as to 224 Notice of Appeal, filed by State of Virginia, State of Hawaii, State of Rhode Island, State of Minnesota, State of Kentucky, State of Vermont, State of New Jersey, State of Connecticut, State of Oregon, State of Illinois, District of Columbia, State of North Carolina, State of Delaware, State of Massachusetts, State of California, State of New York, State of Washington, 230 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Kautter, Department of Health & Human Services, United States of America, Alex Azar, United States Interval Revenue Services...Counsel: In light of this court's order, the parties must strictly adhere to the following expedited briefing schedule: The brief of Appellants' USA, et al and Appellees' State of Texas, et al is due for filing on 5/1/19. Any reply brief ofAppellants' State of California, et al is due for filing 21 dayslater, or, by not later than 5/22/19. You will receive information regarding oral argument at a later date. (tle)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER of USCA as to 224 Notice of Appeal, filed by State of Virginia, State of Hawaii, State of Rhode Island, State of Minnesota, State of Kentucky, State of Vermont, State of New Jersey, State of Connecticut, State of Oregon, State of Illinois, District of Columbia, State of North Carolina, State of Delaware, State of Massachusetts, State of California, State of New York, State of Washington, 230 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Kautter, Department of Health & Human Services, United States of America, Alex Azar, United States Interval Revenue Services. IT IS ORDERED that the appellee's motion for partial dismissal as to appellee State of Wisconsin is GRANTED. (tle)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER of USCA No. 19-10011 as to 224 Notice of Appeal, filed by State of Virginia, State of Hawaii, State of Rhode Island, State of Minnesota, State of Kentucky, State of Vermont, State of New Jersey, State of Connecticut, State of Oregon, State of Illinois, District of Columbia, State of North Carolina, State of Delaware, State of Massachusetts, State of California, State of New York, State of Washington, 230 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Kautter, Department of Health & Human Services, United States of America, Alex Azar, United States Interval Revenue Services... IT IS ORDERED that appellees' unopposed motion for an extension of seven days, or, to and including May 1, 2019 to file the brief is GRANTED... On March 25, 2019, the court received a letter from the Department of Justice indicating that it "intends to file a brief on the appellee's schedule." We will construe the letter as a motion for extension of time to file its brief. Without addressing at this time the possible realignment of the United States as an appellee, we FURTHER ORDER that its brief is to be filed by May 1, 2019. (tle)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER of USCA No. 19-10011 as to 224 Notice of Appeal, filed by State of Virginia, State of Hawaii, State of Rhode Island, State of Minnesota, State of Kentucky, State of Vermont, State of New Jersey, State of Connecticut, State of Oregon, State of Illinois, District of Columbia, State of North Carolina, State of Delaware, State of Massachusetts, State of California, State of New York, State of Washington, 230 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Kautter, Department of Health & Human Services, United States of America, Alex Azar, United States Interval Revenue Services...IT IS ORDERED that the brief of Amicus Children's Partnership andFirst Focus is stricken in accordance with FED. R. APP. P. 29(a)(2) and 5TH CIR.R. 29.4. (tle)
April 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Wade Carr for party(s) Amicus Curiae Eleven Other Leading National Disability Rights Organizations Amicus Curiae American Association of People with Disabilities Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union Amicus Curiae Judge David L Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law Amicus Curiae Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae Renal Physicians Association in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae GLMA Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Society for Metabolic and Bariatric Surgery in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Society of Hematology in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Psychiatric Association in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Osteopathic Association in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Medical Women's Association in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Geriatrics Society in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American College of Radiation Oncology in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American College of Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American College of Correctional Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Association of Public Health Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Association of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Academy of Pediatrics in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Academy of Family Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae Asthma and Immunology in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Academy of Allergy in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Medical Association in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae Renal Physicians Association in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae GLMA Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Society for Metabolic and Bariatric Surgery in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Society of Hematology in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Psychiatric Association in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Osteopathic Association in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Medical Women's Association in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Geriatrics Society in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American College of Radiation Oncology in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American College of Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American College of Correctional Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Association of Public Health Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Association of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Academy of Pediatrics in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Academy of Family Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae Asthma and Immunology in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Academy of Allergy in 19-10011, Attorney Jack R. Bierig for Amicus Curiae American Medical Association in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Stuart F. Delery for Amicus Curiae Children's Partnership in 19-10011, Attorney Stuart F. Delery for Amicus Curiae First Focus in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Lorraine Alofa Van Kirk, Attorney Benna Ruth Solomon for Amicus Curiae California State Association of Counties in 19-10011, Attorney Lorraine Alofa Van Kirk for Amicus Curiae 35 Counties, Cities, and Towns in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Peter J. Anthony for Amicus Curiae Eleven Other Leading National Disability Rights Organizations in 19-10011, Attorney Peter J. Anthony for Amicus Curiae Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund in 19-10011, Attorney Peter J. Anthony for Amicus Curiae Judge David L Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law in 19-10011, Attorney Peter J. Anthony for Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union in 19-10011, Attorney Peter J. Anthony for Amicus Curiae American Association of People with Disabilities in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney John T. Kitchens for Amicus Curiae 483 Federally Recognized Tribal Nations in 19-10011.Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Richard Salgado for Amicus Curiae Eleven Other Leading National Disability Rights Organizations in 19-10011, Attorney Richard Salgado for Amicus Curiae Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund in 19-10011, Attorney Richard Salgado for Amicus Curiae Judge David L Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law in 19-10011, Attorney Richard Salgado for Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union in 19-10011, Attorney Richard Salgado for Amicus Curiae American Association of People with Disabilities in 19-10011. Access to the EROA to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae Kennedy Forum in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae National Multiple Sclerosis Society in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae National Hemophilia Foundation in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae National Coalition for Cancer Survivorship in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae National Alliance on Mental Illness in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae March of Dimes in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae Leukemia and Lymphoma Society in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae Hemophilia Federation of America in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae Global Healthy Living Foundation in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae Epilepsy Foundation in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae Cystic Fibrosis Foundation in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae Crohn's and Colitis Foundation in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae American Lung Association in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae American Heart Association in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae American Diabetes Association in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network in 19-10011, Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio for Amicus Curiae American Cancer Society in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Paige Jennings for party(s) Amicus Curiae HCA Healthcare, Incorporated, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney David Meir Zionts for Amicus Curiae HCA Healthcare, Incorporated in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Margaret Dotzel for party(s) Amicus Curiae Center on Budget and Policy Priorities Amicus Curiae Families USA Amicus Curiae National Health Law Program Amicus Curiae SEIU Amicus Curiae Community Catalyst, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Jaime Santos for Amicus Curiae American Medical Women's Association in 19-10011, Attorney Jaime Santos for Amicus Curiae Black Women's Health Imperative in 19-10011, Attorney Jaime Santos for Amicus Curiae National Partnership for Women and Families in 19-10011, Attorney Jaime Santos for Amicus Curiae National Women's Law Center in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Kenneth Lee Blalack II for Amicus Curiae Blue Cross Blue Shield Association in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney William B. Schultz for Amicus Curiae SEIU in 19-10011, Attorney William B. Schultz for Amicus Curiae Center on Budget and Policy Priorities in 19-10011, Attorney William B. Schultz for Amicus Curiae National Health Law Program in 19-10011, Attorney William B. Schultz for Amicus Curiae Community Catalyst in 19-10011, Attorney William B. Schultz for Amicus Curiae Families USA in 19-10011, Attorney William B. Schultz for Amicus Curiae 24 State Hospitals Associations in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Kevin C. Walsh in 19-10011, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Michael W. McConnell in 19-10011, Attorney Raffi Melkonian for Amicus Curiae Samuel L. Bray in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Maame Gyamfi for Amicus Curiae Justice in Aging in 19-10011, Attorney Maame Gyamfi for Amicus Curiae Center for Medicare Advocacy in 19-10011, Attorney Maame Gyamfi for Amicus Curiae AARP Found in 19-10011, Attorney Maame Gyamfi for Amicus Curiae AARP in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Caitlin Joan Halligan for Amicus Curiae Douglas Laycock in 19-10011, Attorney Caitlin Joan Halligan for Amicus Curiae Walter Dellinger in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae Renal Physicians Association in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae GLMA Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Society for Metabolic and Bariatric Surgery in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Society of Hematology in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Psychiatric Association in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Osteopathic Association in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Medical Women's Association in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Geriatrics Society in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American College of Radiation Oncology in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American College of Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American College of Correctional Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Association of Public Health Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Association of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Academy of Pediatrics in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Academy of Family Physicians in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae Asthma and Immunology in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Academy of Allergy in 19-10011, Attorney Catherine M. Masters for Amicus Curiae American Medical Association in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Nicholas M. DiCarlo for party(s) Amicus Curiae 24 State Hospitals Associations, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Sean Michael Marotta for Amicus Curiae Association of American Medical Colleges in 19-10011, Attorney Sean Michael Marotta for Amicus Curiae America's Essential Hospitals in 19-10011, Attorney Sean Michael Marotta for Amicus Curiae Catholic Health Association of the United States in 19-10011, Attorney Sean Michael Marotta for Amicus Curiae Federation of American Hospitals in 19-10011, Attorney Sean Michael Marotta for Amicus Curiae American Hospital Association in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Michael Qian for party(s) Amicus Curiae Nicholas Bagley Amicus Curiae Jonathan H. Adler Amicus Curiae Ilya Somin Amicus Curiae Abbe R. Gluck, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Joseph R. Palmore for Amicus Curiae Ilya Somin in 19-10011, Attorney Joseph R. Palmore for Amicus Curiae Abbe R. Gluck in 19-10011, Attorney Joseph R. Palmore for Amicus Curiae Nicholas Bagley in 19-10011, Attorney Joseph R. Palmore for Amicus Curiae Jonathan H. Adler in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 Filing 247 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Benjamin Michael Flowers for Amicus Curiae State of Ohio in 19-10011, by Attorney(s) Benjamin Michael Flowers for party(s) Amicus Curiae State of Montana, in case 19-10011, Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle) Modified on 4/8/2019 (bcr).
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney A. Xavier Baker for Amicus Curiae Alliance of Community Health Plans in 19-10011, Attorney A. Xavier Baker, Attorney(s) Daniel W. Wolff,Attorney Pratik A. Shah, for Amicus Curiae Association for Community Affiliated Plans in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Jessica Elaine Underwood,Attorney(s) Ryan Wolfe Allison for party(s) Amicus Curiae Walter Dellinger Amicus Curiae Douglas Laycock, in case 19-10011, access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER: Having considered both motions, the Court finds the Unopposed Motion to Dismiss the State of Wisconsin, ECF No. 244 , should be and is hereby GRANTED and the Motion to Dismiss the State of Wisconsin, ECF No. 242 , should be and is hereby DENIED as moot. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/2/2019) (skg)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting 243 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Leslie B Kiernan terminated. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/2/2019) (skg)
April 2, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Hyland Hunt for Amicus Curiae Small Business Majority Foundation in 19-10011 Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
March 28, 2019 Filing 244 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff State of Wisconsin filed by Wisconsin (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Kilpatrick, Steven)
March 27, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Joseph Rubin for party(s) Appellant State of Connecticut, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
March 27, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Jeremy Kreisberg for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
March 27, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Jonathan Meltzer for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
March 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Ginger Anders for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
March 25, 2019 Filing 243 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Leslie B. Kiernan filed by America's Health Insurance Plans (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Meier, Brennan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 242 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff State of Wisconsin filed by Wisconsin (Kilpatrick, Steven)
March 19, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Corey Francis Finkelmeyer for party(s) Appellee State of Wisconsin, substituted in case 19-10011 in place of Attorneys Andrew Bray Davis for Appellee State of Wisconsin in 19-10011, Attorney David J. Hacker for Appellee State of Wisconsin in 19-10011, Attorney Kyle Douglas Hawkins for Appellee State of Wisconsin in 19-10011, Attorney Darren Lee McCarty for Appellee State of Wisconsin in 19-10011, Attorney Eric A. White for Appellee State of Wisconsin no longer participating in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 240 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Steven Kilpatrick. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/18/2019) (chmb)
March 18, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Robert E. Henneke for party(s) Appellee Neill Hurley Appellee John Nantz, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
March 15, 2019 Filing 240 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9850574) filed by Wisconsin Attorney Steven Carl Kilpatrick added to party Wisconsin(pty:pla) (Kilpatrick, Steven)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER of USCA No. 19-10011 as to 224 Notice of Appeal, filed by State of Virginia, State of Hawaii, State of Rhode Island, State of Minnesota, State of Kentucky, State of Vermont, State of New Jersey, State of Connecticut, State of Oregon, State of Illinois, District of Columbia, State of North Carolina, State of Delaware, State of Massachusetts, State of California, State of New York, State of Washington, 230 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Kautter, Department of Health & Human Services, United States of America, Alex Azar, United States Interval Revenue Services. IT IS ORDERED that the appellees unopposed motion for partial dismissal as to appellee Paul LePage is GRANTED. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Cover Letter) (tle)
February 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Kimberly Cahall for party(s) Appellant State of New Jersey, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
February 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Todd Barry Tatelman for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
February 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Nathanael Blake for party(s) Intervenor State of Iowa, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
February 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Maria Rose Lenz for party(s) Appellant State of Rhode Island, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
February 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Scott H. Ikeda for party(s) Appellant State of Minnesota, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
February 20, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Samuel Siegel for party(s) Appellant State of Washington, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
February 20, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Samuel Siegel for party(s) Appellant State of New Jersey Appellant State of Massachusetts Appellant State of New York Appellant State of Connecticut Appellant State of Oregon Appellant State of Rhode Island Appellant District of Columbia Appellant State of North Carolina Appellant State of Minnesota Appellant State of Vermont Appellant State of Virginia Appellant State of Illinois Appellant State of Delaware Appellant State of Hawaii Appellant State of Kentucky, in case 19-10011.Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
February 20, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Fadwa A. Hammoud for party(s) Intervenor State of Michigan, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
February 19, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Matthew Joseph Berns for party(s) Appellant State of New Jersey, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
February 19, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Robert Tadao Nakatsuji for party(s) Appellant State of Hawaii, in case 19-10011.A ccess to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
February 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Elaine Goldenberg,Rachel Miller-Ziegler, Elizabeth Bonnie Wydra, Brianne Gorod, Ashwin Pradyumna Phatak and Brian Rene Frazelle for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
February 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Eric Olson for Intervenor State of Colorado in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
February 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Heidi Parry Stern for party(s) Intervenor State of Nevada, in case 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
February 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Douglas Neal Letter, Kristin Ann Shapiro, Brooks M. Hanner for party(s) Intervenor United States House of Representatives, in case 19-10011.Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
February 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney Donald B. Verrilli Jr. for Intervenor United States House of Representatives in 19-10011. Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle)
February 12, 2019 Record on Appeal for USCA5 19-10011 (related to 224 , 230 appeal): Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified, 1 Volume(s) electronic transcript,. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by contacting the appeals deputy in advance to arrange delivery. (tle)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting 237 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrea Suzuki terminated. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/6/2019) (skg)
February 5, 2019 Filing 237 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel filed by State of Hawaii (Suzuki, Andrea)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 235 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert Nakatsuji. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/5/2019) (chmb)
February 4, 2019 Filing 235 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9755188) filed by State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Order for Pro Hac Vice)Attorney Robert Tadao Nakatsuji added to party State of Hawaii(pty:intvd) (Nakatsuji, Robert)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER of USCA No. 19-10011 as to 224 Notice of Appeal ; 230 Notice of Appeal. IT IS ORDERED that the motion of appellants United States of America, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Alex Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Internal Revenue and Charles P. Rettig to lift the stay of proceedings is GRANTED. (tle)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER of USCA No. 19-10011 as to 224 Notice of Appeal, filed by State of Virginia, State of Hawaii, State of Rhode Island, State of Minnesota, State of Kentucky, State of Vermont, State of New Jersey, State of Connecticut, State of Oregon, State of Illinois, District of Columbia, State of North Carolina, State of Delaware, State of Massachusetts, State of California, State of New York, State of Washington, 230 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Kautter, Department of Health & Human Services, United States of America, Alex Azar, United States Interval Revenue Services. IT IS ORDERED that the opposed motion of appellants United States of America, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Alex Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, United States Department of Internal Revenue and Charles P. Rettig to stay proceedings in this court in light of lapse of appropriations is GRANTED (tle)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER STAYING BRIEFING: Accordingly, the motion to intervene, (ECF No. 226 ), is STAYED and the motion to stay briefing, (ECF No. 231 ), is DENIED as moot. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/8/2019) (skg) Modified text on 1/8/2019 (trt). (Main Document 232 replaced on 1/8/2019) (trt).
January 7, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-10011 in United States Court of Appeals Fifth Circuit for 224 Notice of Appeal, filed by State of Virginia, State of Hawaii, State of Rhode Island, State of Minnesota, State of Kentucky, State of Vermont, State of New Jersey, State of Connecticut, State of Oregon, State of Illinois, District of Columbia, State of North Carolina, State of Delaware, State of Massachusetts, State of California, State of New York, State of Washington, 230 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Kautter, Department of Health & Human Services, United States of America, Alex Azar, United States Interval Revenue Services. (tle)
January 4, 2019 Filing 231 MOTION to Stay re 226 MOTION to Intervene filed by Alex Azar, Department of Health & Human Services, David Kautter, United States Interval Revenue Services, United States of America with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Mauler, Daniel)
January 4, 2019 Filing 230 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 221 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, 211 Order on Motion for Injunction to the Fifth Circuit by Alex Azar, Department of Health & Human Services, David Kautter, United States Interval Revenue Services, United States of America. T.O. form to appellant electronically at Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B) (Mauler, Daniel)
January 4, 2019 Filing 229 Transcript Order Form: re 224 Notice of Appeal, transcript requested by State of California for 9/5/18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts.) Payment method: Other Reminder to appellant: this document must also be filed with the appeals court. (tle)
January 4, 2019 Filing 228 Notice of Filing of Official Electronic Transcript of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Proceedings held on 09/05/2018 before Judge Reed O'Connor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shawn McRoberts, Telephone number (214) 753-2349. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript. A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office. If redaction of personal identifiers under MO 61 is necessary, file a Redaction Request - Transcript within 21 days. If no action is taken, the entire transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed. (137 pages) Redaction Request due 1/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/4/2019. (smm)
January 3, 2019 Filing 227 MOTION Appear Without Local Counsel filed by U.S. House of Representatives (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Verrilli, Donald)
January 3, 2019 Filing 226 MOTION to Intervene filed by U.S. House of Representatives with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Answer, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Verrilli, Donald)
January 3, 2019 Filing 225 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donald Beaton Verrilli, Jr on behalf of U.S. House of Representatives. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Verrilli, Donald)
January 3, 2019 Filing 224 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 221 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, 211 Order on Motion for Injunction to the Fifth Circuit by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0539-9680293. T.O. form to appellant electronically at Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Palma, Neli)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 STAY ORDER AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE. The Court has entered a partial judgment on Count I in this case (ECF No. 221). The Court determines the remainder of this case should be STAYED pending further orders. The Clerk is therefore instructed to submit a JS-6 form to the Administrative Office, removing this case from the statistical records. Nothing in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of the remaining clams. The parties are directed to notify the Court upon the conclusion of the appeal of the partial judgment within 14 days of any decision. Should further proceedings in the meantime become necessary or desirable, any party may initiate it by filing an appropriate pleading. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/31/2018) (trt)
December 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 219 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kevin Michael LeRoy and Misha Tseytlin terminated (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/30/2018) (Judge Reed C. O'Connor)
December 30, 2018 Filing 221 Final Judgment on Count I: The Court issued its order granting partial summary judgment on Count I of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, and has determined that it should be severed from the remaining claims. December 14, 2018 Order, ECF No. 211 . In accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b), the Court therefore DECLARES that 26 U.S.C. § 5000A(a) is UNCONSTITUTIONAL and INSEVERABLE from the remainder of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, Pub. L. 111-148, 124 Stat. 119-1045 (2010). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/30/2018) (Judge Reed C. O'Connor)
December 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER GRANTING STAY AND PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT: On December 17, 2018, the Intervenor Defendants moved the Court to clarify that the December 14, 2018 Order is not binding or to enter a stay if the Order is binding and to enter final judgment or certify the Order for immediate appeal. See ECF No. 213 . The Court finds that the December 14, 2018 Order declaring the Individual Mandate unconstitutional and inseverable should be stayed. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that the December 14, 2018 Order, (ECF No. 211 ), and the Partial Final Judgment severing Count I and finalizing that Order---which will issue by separate order---be stayed during the pendency of the Order's appeal. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/30/2018) (Judge Reed C. O'Connor)
December 28, 2018 Filing 219 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Wisconsin (LeRoy, Kevin)
December 26, 2018 Filing 218 REPLY filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington re: 213 MOTION re 211 Order on Motion for Injunction (Palma, Neli)
December 21, 2018 Filing 217 RESPONSE filed by Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Neill Hurley, Indiana, Kansas, Paul LePage, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, John Nantz, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virgina, Wisconsin re: 213 MOTION re 211 Order on Motion for Injunction (Hacker, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 216 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Alex Azar, Department of Health & Human Services, David Kautter, United States Interval Revenue Services, United States of America re: 213 MOTION re 211 Order on Motion for Injunction (Mauler, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER: The Court ORDERS the Plaintiffs and Federal Defendants to file their responses by Friday, December 21, 2018 and the Intervenor Defendants to reply by Wednesday, December 26, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/18/2018) (chmb)
December 18, 2018 Filing 214 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Jonathan Hacker on behalf of Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Indiana, Kansas, Paul LePage, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virgina, Wisconsin. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hacker, David)
December 17, 2018 Filing 213 MOTION re 211 Order on Motion for Injunction filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Clarify, etc., # 2 Proposed Order) (Palma, Neli)
December 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER: Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer byDecember 21, 2018 and to then jointly submit to the Court by January 4, 2019 a proposed schedule for resolving Plaintiffs remaining claims in the Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/16/2018) (chmb)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 [STAYED per order of Dec 30 2018] ORDER granting Plaintiffs partial summary judgment (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/14/2018) (Judge Reed C. O'Connor) Modified on 12/31/2018 (wrb).
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting 209 Plaintiffs' Counsel Jonathan F. Mitchell's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Jonathan F. Mitchell is withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiffs Neill Hurley and John Nantz, and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to update the docket sheet consistent with this Order. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/11/2018) (skg)
December 8, 2018 Filing 209 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Individual Plaintiffs (Jonathan F. Mitchell) filed by Neill Hurley, John Nantz (Mitchell, Jonathan)
November 16, 2018 Filing 208 Notice Received from State of Maine Office of the Attorney General (wxc)
November 5, 2018 Filing 207 AMICUS BRIEF OF CAREY BRIAN MEADORS. (skg)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting 180 Carey Brian Meadors's Unopposed Motion For Leave to File an Amicus Brief Amicus. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file Mr. Meadors's brief, now attached to his motion at ECF No. 180 -1, as a separate docket entry. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/5/2018) (skg)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting 203 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Heidi Marguerita Rian terminated. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/5/2018) (skg)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 202 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrea A. Suzuki. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/5/2018) (chmb)
October 30, 2018 Filing 203 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and to Substitute Counsel filed by State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Rian, Heidi)
October 30, 2018 Filing 202 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9552111) filed by State of Hawaii (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Andrea Suzuki added to party State of Hawaii(pty:intvd) (Suzuki, Andrea)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting 200 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Austin R. Nimocks is withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiffs and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to update the docket sheet consistent with this Order. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/20/2018) (skg)
September 19, 2018 Filing 200 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff States (Austin R. Nimocks) filed by Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Indiana, Kansas, Paul LePage, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virgina, Wisconsin (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Nimocks, Austin)
September 5, 2018 Filing 199 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Reed C. O'Connor: Oral Agument held on 9/5/2018. Attorneys for Plaintiff's - Darren McCarty, Misha Tseytlin, Robert Henneke, Brett Shumate and, Daniel Mauler.Attorneys Defendant's - Nimrod Elias, Neli Palma, Henry Kantor,Stephen Vogel, and Valerie Nannery. (Court Reporter: Shawn McRoberts) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 3:15. (chmb)
August 31, 2018 Filing 198 Withdrawl of Extraordinary Motion to Intervene as Moot re: 168 MOTION filed by Stephen P. Wallace (bcr)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 196 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Henry Kantor. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/24/2018)(chmb)(alo)
August 23, 2018 Filing 196 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9404825) filed by State of Oregon (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)Attorney Henry Kantor added to party State of Oregon(pty:intvd) (Kantor, Henry)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 194 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jessica Willey. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/23/2018)(chmb)(alo)
August 22, 2018 Filing 194 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9401092) filed by State of Delaware (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))Attorney Jessica Willey added to party State of Delaware(pty:intvd) (Willey, Jessica)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 192 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Misha Tseytlin. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/22/2018)(chmb)(alo)
August 21, 2018 Filing 192 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9398905) filed by Wisconsin (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)Attorney Misha Tseytlin added to party Wisconsin(pty:pla) (Tseytlin, Misha)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 189 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robyn Renee Bender. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/21/2018)(chmb)(alo)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting 187 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jayant Kartik Tatachar is withdrawn as counsel and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to update the docket sheet to reflect AHIP's lead new counsel of record Brennan H. Meier. See ECF No. 186 . (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/20/2018) (skg)
August 20, 2018 Filing 189 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9394234) filed by District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Robyn Renee Bender added to party District of Columbia(pty:intvd) (Bender, Robyn)
August 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 185 Motion to Continue. Motion Hearing reset for 9/5/2018 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/19/2018) (Judge Reed C. O'Connor)
August 17, 2018 Filing 187 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by America's Health Insurance Plans with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Tatachar, Jayant)
August 17, 2018 Filing 186 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brennan Holden Meier on behalf of America's Health Insurance Plans. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Meier, Brennan)
August 16, 2018 Filing 185 MOTION to Continue Hearing filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington (Palma, Neli)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Application for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 39 ), filed April 26, 2018. The Court sets this matter for oral hearing on Monday, September 10, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. in the Second Floor Courtroom of the Eldon B. Mahon United States Courthouse, located at 501 W 10th Street, Fort Worth, Texas. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/14/2018) (skg)
August 3, 2018 Filing 183 REPLY re: 5 MOTION to Intervene filed by Stephen Wallace. (npk)
July 30, 2018 Filing 182 RESPONSE filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington re: 176 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, (Palma, Neli)
July 30, 2018 Filing 181 RESPONSE filed by Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Neill Hurley, Indiana, Kansas, Paul LePage, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, John Nantz, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virgina, Wisconsin re: 176 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, (McCarty, Darren)
July 26, 2018 Filing 180 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief(Unopposed) filed by Carey Brian Meadors with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Amicus Brief of Carey Brian Meadors). Party Meadors, Carey Brian added.Attorney Carey Brian Meadors added to party Carey Brian Meadors(pty:am) (Meadors, Carey)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 178 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin Michael LeRoy. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/26/2018)(chmb)(alo)
July 25, 2018 Filing 178 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9337890) filed by Wisconsin (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Attorney Kevin Michael LeRoy added to party Wisconsin(pty:pla) (LeRoy, Kevin)
July 23, 2018 Filing 177 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Indiana, Kansas, Paul LePage, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virgina, Wisconsin re: 168 MOTION, 5 MOTION to Intervene, 172 MOTION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (McCarty, Darren)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER: The Court ORDERS all parties to file any additional information they wish to present in opposition to considering these issues on summary judgment. Any additional information any party wishes to present should be filed on or before July 30, 2018. See FED. R. CIV. P. 56(f)(3). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/16/2018) (trt)
July 5, 2018 Filing 175 REPLY filed by Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Neill Hurley, Indiana, Kansas, Paul LePage, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, John Nantz, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virgina, Wisconsin re: 39 MOTION for Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Supplemental Appendix in Support of Plaintiffs' Application for Preliminary Injunction) (McCarty, Darren)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 173 Motion. Plaintiffs' reply brief may be up to thirty (30) pages. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/3/2018)(chmb)(alo)
July 3, 2018 Filing 173 MOTION for Extension of Page Limits filed by Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Neill Hurley, Indiana, Kansas, Paul LePage, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, John Nantz, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virgina, Wisconsin (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion for Extension of Page Limits) (McCarty, Darren)
July 2, 2018 Filing 172 Extraordinary Motion filed by Stephen P. Wallace (wxc)
July 2, 2018 Filing 171 Reply to re: 170 Response filed by Stephen P. Wallace (wxc)
June 20, 2018 Filing 170 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Indiana, Kansas, Paul LePage, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virgina, Wisconsin re: 168 MOTION (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (McCarty, Darren)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying 81 Motion to Intervene. See Order for further specifics on Employers' ability to file brief as amici curiae. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/15/2018)(chmb)(alo)
June 15, 2018 Filing 168 Extraordinary Motion filed by Stephen P. Wallace (wxc)
June 15, 2018 Filing 167 BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE AARP AND AARP FOUNDATION IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re: 39 MOTION for Injunction . (skg)
June 15, 2018 Filing 166 BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE OF PUBLIC HEALTH SCHOLARS AND THE AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION. (skg)
June 15, 2018 Filing 165 BRIEF OF FAMILIES USA, COMMUNITY CATALYST, THE NATIONAL HEALTH LAW PROGRAM, CENTER FOR PUBLIC POLICY PRIORITIES, AND CENTER ON BUDGET AND POLICY PRIORITIES, AS AMICI CURIAE, IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT-INTERVENORS. (skg)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting: The Families USA, et al.'s Unopposed Motion For Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae (ECF No. 141 ); Families USA, et al's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel (ECF No. 142 ); Economic Scholars' Unopposed Motion For Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae (ECF No. 149 ); Public Health Scholars, et al.'s Unopposed Motion For Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae (ECF No. 154 ) and; AARP, et al.'s Unopposed Motion For Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae (ECF No. 155 ). See Order for further specifics. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/15/2018) (skg)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 153 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Micah Festa Fergenson. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/15/2018)(chmb)(alo)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 152 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Boris Bershteyn. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/15/2018)(chmb)(alo)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 151 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Maame Gyamfi. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/15/2018)(chmb)(alo)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 147 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gabriel K Gillett. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/15/2018)(chmb)(alo)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 146 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Margaret M. Dotzel. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/15/2018)(chmb)(alo)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 145 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William B. Schultz. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/15/2018)(chmb)(alo)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 144 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew S. Hellman. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/15/2018)(chmb)(alo)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 137 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dila Mignouna. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/15/2018)(chmb)(alo)
June 14, 2018 Filing 155 MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion of AARP and AARP Foundation For Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for Preliminary Injunction filed by AARP, AARP FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Brief of Amici Curiae AARP and AARP Foundation in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for a Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Proposed Order) (Gonzalez, Iris)
June 14, 2018 Filing 154 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae in Opposition to a Preliminary Injunction filed by Public Health Scholars, The American Public Health Association (Attachments: # 1 Brief Amicus Curiae, # 2 Appendix to Brief Amicus Curiae)Attorney Michelle L Davis added to party Public Health Scholars(pty:am), Attorney Michelle L Davis added to party The American Public Health Association(pty:am) (Davis, Michelle)
June 14, 2018 Filing 153 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9254888) filed by Public Health Scholars, The American Public Health Association Attorney Micah Festa Fergenson added to party Public Health Scholars(pty:am), Attorney Micah Festa Fergenson added to party The American Public Health Association(pty:am) (Fergenson, Micah)
June 14, 2018 Filing 152 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9254649) filed by Public Health Scholars, The American Public Health Association. Party Public Health Scholars and The American Public Health Association added.Attorney Boris Bershteyn added to party Public Health Scholars(pty:am), Attorney Boris Bershteyn added to party The American Public Health Association(pty:am) (Bershteyn, Boris)
June 14, 2018 Filing 151 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Maame Gyamfi (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9254474) filed by AARP, AARP FOUNDATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Proposed Order). Party AARP added.Attorney Iris Y Gonzalez added to party AARP(pty:am), Attorney Iris Y Gonzalez added to party AARP FOUNDATION(pty:am) (Gonzalez, Iris)
June 14, 2018 Filing 150 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Economic Scholars re 149 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Amici Curiae in Support of the Intervenor-Defendants / Brief Amici Curiae for Economic Scholars in Support of the Intervenor-Defendants (Hellman, Matthew)
June 14, 2018 Filing 149 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Amici Curiae in Support of the Intervenor-Defendants filed by Economic Scholars (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Hellman, Matthew)
June 14, 2018 Filing 148 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae in Support of Intervenor-Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction filed by Service Employees International Union with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order) (Hutcherson, Kenton)
June 14, 2018 Filing 147 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9254297) filed by Economic Scholars (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)Attorney Gabriel K Gillett added to party Economic Scholars(pty:am) (Gillett, Gabriel)
June 14, 2018 Filing 146 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Margaret M. Dotzel (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9254291) filed by Center for Public Policy Priorities, Center on Budget and Policy Priorities, Community Catalyst, Families USA, National Health Law Program (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Hyman, Leslie)
June 14, 2018 Filing 145 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney William B. Schultz (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9254253) filed by Center for Public Policy Priorities, Center on Budget and Policy Priorities, Community Catalyst, Families USA, National Health Law Program (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order) (Hyman, Leslie)
June 14, 2018 Filing 144 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9254239) filed by Economic Scholars (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order). Party Economic Scholars added.Attorney Matthew S. Hellman added to party Economic Scholars(pty:am) (Hellman, Matthew)
June 14, 2018 Filing 143 BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE OF SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION IN SUPPORT OF INTERVENOR-DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 39 MOTION for Injunction . (skg)
June 14, 2018 Filing 142 MOTION Leave to Proceed Without Resident Local Counsel filed by Center for Public Policy Priorities, Center on Budget and Policy Priorities, Community Catalyst, Families USA, National Health Law Program (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Hyman, Leslie)
June 14, 2018 Filing 141 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Families USA, Community Catalyst, National Health Law Program, Center for Public Policy Priorities, Center on Budget and Policy Priorities (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order). Party Families USA, Community Catalyst, The National Health Law Program, Center for Public Policy Priorities, and Center on Budget and Policy Priorities added.Attorney Leslie Sara Hyman added to party Families USA(pty:am), Attorney Leslie Sara Hyman added to party Community Catalyst(pty:am), Attorney Leslie Sara Hyman added to party National Health Law Program(pty:am), Attorney Leslie Sara Hyman added to party Center for Public Policy Priorities(pty:am), Attorney Leslie Sara Hyman added to party Center on Budget and Policy Priorities(pty:am) (Hyman, Leslie)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting 130 Service Employees International Union's Unopposed Motion For Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2018) (skg)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting 118 American Hospital Association, et al.'s Motion for Leave to Appear Without Local Counsel ; granting 122 American Hospital Association, et al.'s Consent Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae. ***Brief at entry 123 deemed filed on 6/14/2018 per chambers.*** (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2018) (skg)
June 14, 2018 Filing 138 BRIEF OF SMALL BUSINESS MAJORITY FOUNDATION AS AMICUS CURIAE IN OPPOSITION TO A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re: 39 MOTION for Injunction . (skg)
June 14, 2018 Filing 137 MOTION for Admission pro hac vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9252020) filed by American Medical Association (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Mignouna, Dila). Modified event on 6/15/2018 (daa).
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting 125 Small Business Majority Foundation's Unopposed Motion For Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2018) (skg)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 126 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ruthanne M. Deutsch. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2018)(chmb)(alo)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 124 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph R. Palmore. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2018)(chmb)(alo)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 120 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Catherine Stetson. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2018)(chmb)(alo)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 119 Consent Motion of Jonathan H. Adler, et al. For Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae. The Clerk is DIRECTED to deem the proposed brief, now as a proposed docket entry at ECF No. 121 , as docketed on the date it was filed. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2018) (skg)
June 14, 2018 Filing 131 BRIEF OF AMERICA'S HEALTH INSURANCE PLANS AS AMICUS CURIAE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 39 MOTION for Injunction . (skg)
June 14, 2018 Filing 130 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae in Support of Intervenor-Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction filed by Service Employees International Union with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order). Party Service Employees International Union added.Attorney Kenton J Hutcherson added to party Service Employees International Union(pty:am) (Hutcherson, Kenton) Modified on 6/14/2018 (bdb).
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 106 America's Health Insurance Plans' Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2018) (skg)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 111 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Leslie B Kiernan. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2018)(chmb)(alo)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 109 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Pratik A. Shah. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2018)(chmb)(alo)
June 14, 2018 Filing 126 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Ruthanne M. Deutsch (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9253477) filed by Small Business Majority Foundation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Additional Page(s) Addendum, # 3 Proposed Order) (Hunt, Hyland)
June 14, 2018 Filing 125 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Briefin Opposition to a Preliminary Injunction filed by Small Business Majority Foundation with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit(s) Proposed Brief). Party Small Business Majority added.Attorney Hyland Hunt added to party Small Business Majority Foundation(pty:am) (Hunt, Hyland)
June 14, 2018 Filing 124 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Joseph R. Palmore (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9253404) filed by Jonathan H. Adler, Nicholas Bagley, Abbe R. Gluck, Ilya Somin, Kevin C. Walsh (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Application) (Hedrick, Joshua)
June 14, 2018 Filing 123 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States, Federation of American Hospitals re 122 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief (Stetson, Catherine)
June 14, 2018 Filing 122 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States, Federation of American Hospitals (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Stetson, Catherine)
June 14, 2018 Filing 121 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Jonathan H. Adler, Nicholas Bagley, Abbe R. Gluck, Ilya Somin, Kevin C. Walsh re 119 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae In Support of Intervenors-Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for Preliminary Injunction (Hedrick, Joshua) Modified on 6/14/2018 (npk). Modified docket text per Order 132 on 6/14/2018 (skg).
June 14, 2018 Filing 120 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9253394) filed by American Hospital Association, Association of American Medical Colleges, Catholic Health Association of the United States, Federation of American Hospitals with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Stetson, Catherine)
June 14, 2018 Filing 119 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae In Support of Intervenors-Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jonathan H. Adler, Nicholas Bagley, Abbe R. Gluck, Ilya Somin, Kevin C. Walsh with Brief/Memorandum in Support.. Party Jonathan H. Adler added.Attorney Joshua L Hedrick added to party Jonathan H. Adler(pty:am), Attorney Joshua L Hedrick added to party Nicholas Bagley(pty:am), Attorney Joshua L Hedrick added to party Abbe R. Gluck(pty:am), Attorney Joshua L Hedrick added to party Ilya Somin(pty:am), Attorney Joshua L Hedrick added to party Kevin C. Walsh(pty:am) (Hedrick, Joshua)
June 14, 2018 Filing 118 MOTION For Leave To Appear Without Local Counsel filed by American Hospital Association, Federation of American Hospitals, Catholic Health Association of the United States, Association of American Medical Colleges with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Party American Hospital Association, Federation of American Hospitals, Catholic Health Association of the United States, and Association of American Medical Colleges added.Attorney Catherine Emily Stetson added to party American Hospital Association(pty:am), Attorney Catherine Emily Stetson added to party Federation of American Hospitals(pty:am), Attorney Catherine Emily Stetson added to party Catholic Health Association of the United States(pty:am), Attorney Catherine Emily Stetson added to party Association of American Medical Colleges(pty:am) (Stetson, Catherine)
June 14, 2018 Filing 117 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF OF THE AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK, AMERICAN DIABETES ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION, AND NATIONAL MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS SOCIETY SUPPORTING DEFENDANTS. (skg)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 104 American Cancer Society, et al.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2018) (skg)
June 14, 2018 Filing 115 Order Unfiling 103 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing due to the following deficiency: The names on the application (Dahlia Mignouna) and the certificate of good standing (Dila Mignouna) do not match. The Court could not locate an attorney by the name of Dahlia Mignouna licensed in Maryland. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2018) (skg)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 100 American Medical Association, et al.'s Motion to Proceed Without Local Resident Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2018) (skg)
June 14, 2018 Filing 113 BRIEF OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AND THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF CHILD AND ADOLESCENT PSYCHIATRY AS AMICI CURIAE N OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re: 39 MOTION for Injunction . (skg)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 99 American Medical Association, et al.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2018) (skg)
June 14, 2018 Filing 111 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9252820) filed by America's Health Insurance Plans Attorney Leslie B Kiernan added to party America's Health Insurance Plans(pty:am) (Kiernan, Leslie)
June 14, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tiffanie S Clausewitz on behalf of American Academy of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, The American Medical Association. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Clausewitz, Tiffanie)
June 14, 2018 Filing 109 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9252805) filed by America's Health Insurance Plans Attorney Pratik A. Shah added to party America's Health Insurance Plans(pty:am) (Shah, Pratik)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 102 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Teresa A Reed. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2018)(chmb)(alo)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 101 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Chad Golder. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2018)(chmb)(alo)
June 14, 2018 Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief of America's Health Insurance Plans filed by America's Health Insurance Plans (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Proposed Order) (Tatachar, Jayant)
June 14, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jayant Kartik Tatachar on behalf of America's Health Insurance Plans. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.). Party America's Health Insurance Plans added. (Tatachar, Jayant)
June 14, 2018 Filing 104 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF INTERVENOR-DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK, AMERICAN DIABETES ASSOCIATION, MERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS SOCIETY with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Amici Curae, # 2 Proposed Order)Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio added to party AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY(pty:am), Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio added to party AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY CANCER ACTION NETWORK(pty:!!!), Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio added to party AMERICAN DIABETES ASSOCIATION(pty:am), Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio added to party MERICAN HEART ASSOCIATION(pty:am), Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio added to party AMERICAN LUNG ASSOCIATION(pty:am), Attorney Beth Bivans Petronio added to party NATIONAL MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS SOCIETY(pty:am) (Petronio, Beth)
June 14, 2018 Filing 103 ***UNFILED PER ORDER 115 *** Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9252020) filed by American Academy of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, The American Medical Association (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Attorney Dahlia Mignouna added to party American Academy of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry(pty:am), Attorney Dahlia Mignouna added to party American Academy of Family Physicians(pty:am), Attorney Dahlia Mignouna added to party American Academy of Pediatrics(pty:am), Attorney Dahlia Mignouna added to party American College of Physicians(pty:am), Attorney Dahlia Mignouna added to party The American Medical Association (pty:ip) (Mignouna, Dahlia) Modified on 6/14/2018 (skg).
June 14, 2018 Filing 102 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9252019) filed by American Academy of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, The American Medical Association (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Attorney Teresa A Reed added to party American Academy of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry(pty:am), Attorney Teresa A Reed added to party American Academy of Family Physicians(pty:am), Attorney Teresa A Reed added to party American Academy of Pediatrics(pty:am), Attorney Teresa A Reed added to party American College of Physicians(pty:am) (Reed, Teresa)
June 14, 2018 Filing 101 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9252018) filed by American Academy of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, The American Medical Association (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Golder, Chad)
June 14, 2018 Filing 100 MOTION Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Resident Local Counsel filed by American Academy of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, The American Medical Association (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Golder, Chad)
June 13, 2018 Filing 99 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AND THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF CHILD AND ADOLESCENT PSYCHIATRY AS AMICI CURIAE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by The American Medical Association, American College of Physicians, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, AND THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF CHILD AND ADOLESCENT PSYCHIATRY AS AMICI CURIAE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Party American College of Physicians added.Attorney Chad Golder added to party American College of Physicians(pty:am), Attorney Chad Golder added to party American Academy of Family Physicians(pty:am), Attorney Chad Golder added to party American Academy of Pediatrics(pty:am), Attorney Chad Golder added to party American Academy of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry(pty:am) (Golder, Chad)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER denying 96 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice re: Chad Golder ; denying 97 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice re: Teresa A. Reed. Should applicants re-file their applications, they will not be required to pay another application fee. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/12/2018) (skg)
June 11, 2018 Filing 97 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9245631) filed by The American Medical Association (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Attorney Teresa A Reed added to party The American Medical Association (pty:!!!) (Reed, Teresa)
June 11, 2018 Filing 96 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9245508) filed by The American Medical Association (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Attorney Chad Golder added to party The American Medical Association (pty:!!!) (Golder, Chad)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 93 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. It is therefore ORDERED that the Federal Defendant's answer to Plaintiffs' amended complaint is due no later than thirty (30) days after the Court issues an order on Plaintiffs' application for preliminary injunction. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/8/2018) (skg)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 90 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. It is therefore ORDERED that Joel McElvain, Eric Beckenhauer, and Rebecca Kopplin are no longer counsel of record for the Federal Defendants in this case. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/8/2018) (skg)
June 7, 2018 Filing 93 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 27 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Alex Azar, Department of Health & Human Services, David Kautter, United States Interval Revenue Services, United States of America with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Mauler, Daniel)
June 7, 2018 Filing 92 RESPONSE filed by Alex Azar, Department of Health & Human Services, David Kautter, United States Interval Revenue Services, United States of America re: 39 MOTION for Injunction (Mauler, Daniel)
June 7, 2018 Filing 91 RESPONSE filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington re: 39 MOTION for Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Supporting Evidence - Part 1, # 2 Appendix of Supporting Evidence - Part 2, # 3 Proposed Order) (Palma, Neli)
June 7, 2018 Filing 90 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Appearances filed by Alex Azar, Department of Health & Human Services, David Kautter, United States Interval Revenue Services, United States of America (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (McElvain, Joel)
June 7, 2018 Filing 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Duane Mauler on behalf of Alex Azar, Department of Health & Human Services, David Kautter, United States Interval Revenue Services, United States of America. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Mauler, Daniel)
June 5, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Shumate on behalf of Alex Azar, Department of Health & Human Services, David Kautter, United States Interval Revenue Services, United States of America. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Shumate, Brett)
June 4, 2018 Filing 87 REPLY filed by Quickway Distribution Services, Inc., WG Hall, LLC re: 81 MOTION to Intervene (Boucek, Braden)
May 31, 2018 Filing 86 RESPONSE filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington re: 81 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Palma, Neli)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: Before the Court is the Proposed Plaintiff-Intervenors WG Hall, LLC d/b/a Atwork Personnel and Quickway Distribution Services, Inc.'s Motion to Intervene as Plaintiff (ECF No. 81 ). It is ORDERED that any party who wishes to file a brief in support or opposition to the above-referenced motion must do so on or before May 31, 2018. Proposed Plaintiff-Intervenors may reply to any responses filed no later than June 5, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/22/2018) (skg)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 83 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Braden H. Boucek. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/22/2018)(chmb)(alo)
May 21, 2018 Filing 83 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9204609) filed by Quickway Distribution Services, Inc., WG Hall, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice (proposeD))Attorney Braden Heath Boucek added to party Quickway Distribution Services, Inc.(pty:intvp), Attorney Braden Heath Boucek added to party WG Hall, LLC(pty:intvp) (Boucek, Braden)
May 21, 2018 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quickway Distribution Services, Inc., WG Hall, LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Paladian Capital, Inc. for Quickway Distribution Services, Inc.. (Vickers, Philip)
May 21, 2018 Filing 81 MOTION to Intervene filed by WG Hall, LLC, Quickway Distribution Services, Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Complaint in Intervention, # 2 Proposed Order). Party WG Hall, LLC and Quickway Distribution Services Inc. added.Attorney Philip A Vickers added to party WG Hall, LLC(pty:intvp), Attorney Philip A Vickers added to party Quickway Distribution Services, Inc.(pty:intvp) (Vickers, Philip)
May 17, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rebecca Kopplin on behalf of Alex Azar, Department of Health & Human Services, David Kautter, United States Interval Revenue Services, United States of America. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Kopplin, Rebecca)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 76 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey T Sprung. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/17/2018)(chmb)(alo)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 72 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Maria Lenz. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/17/2018)(chmb)(alo)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 71 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeremy Feigenbaum. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/17/2018)(chmb)(alo)
May 16, 2018 Filing 76 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9194886) filed by State of Washington (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))Attorney Jeffrey T Sprung added to party State of Washington(pty:intvd) (Sprung, Jeffrey)
May 16, 2018 Filing 75 Motion for Default Judgment Upon John S. McCain as the Necessary Party to the Case and to Schedule a Prove-up Hearing with Brief in Support filed by Stephen P. Wallace (wxc)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: The Court finds that the Proposed Intervenor States' Motion to Intervene (ECF No. 15 ) should be and is hereby GRANTED. The Court will hold the Proposed Intervenor States to the same briefing schedule as Defendants in this case, as set by the Court's April 24, 2018 Order. See ECF No. 28 . (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/16/2018) (plp) (Main Document 74 replaced on 5/17/2018) (skg).
May 14, 2018 Filing 73 PROPOSED ANSWER IN INTERVENTION to 27 Amended Complaint, filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington (Palma, Neli)
May 14, 2018 Filing 72 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9185988) filed by State of Rhode Island (Attachments: # 1 Cert of Good Standing)Attorney Maria Lenz added to party State of Rhode Island(pty:intvd) (Lenz, Maria)
May 11, 2018 Filing 71 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9183538) filed by State of New Jersey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission PHV)Attorney Jeremy Feigenbaum added to party State of New Jersey(pty:intvd) (Feigenbaum, Jeremy)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 68 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Rubin. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/9/2018)(chmb)(alo)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 64 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth Chesler. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/9/2018)(chmb)(alo)
May 9, 2018 Filing 68 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9177058) filed by State of Connecticut (Rubin, Joseph)
May 4, 2018 Filing 67 REPLY filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington re: 15 MOTION to Intervene (Palma, Neli)
May 4, 2018 Filing 66 BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE filed by Citizens United. (skg)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Leave to File. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file Citizen's United, et al.'s Brief Amicus Curiae, attached as ECF No. 58 -1, as a separate docket entry. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/4/2018) (skg)
May 4, 2018 Filing 64 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Clerk Note: Filing fee $25 paid; Receipt number 0539-9168617.) filed by State of New York (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)Attorney Elizabeth R Chesler added to party State of New York(pty:intvd) (Chesler, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/4/2018 (npk).
May 4, 2018 Filing 63 *** DISREGARD - INCORRECT EVENT USED *** NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Rubin on behalf of State of Connecticut. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Rubin, Joseph) Modified on 5/8/2018 (wxc).
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 57 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott Ikeda. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/4/2018)(chmb)(alo)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 56 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stephen Vogel. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/4/2018)(chmb)(alo)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 54 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David J. Lyons. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/4/2018)(chmb)(alo)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 52 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin Battles. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/4/2018)(chmb)(alo)
May 3, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Citizens United with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Amicus Curiae, # 2 Proposed Order). Party Citizens United added.Attorney John Mark Brewer added to party Citizens United(pty:am) (Brewer, John)
May 3, 2018 Filing 57 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9166677) filed by State of Minnesota (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)Attorney Scott Ikeda added to party State of Minnesota(pty:intvd) (Ikeda, Scott)
May 3, 2018 Filing 56 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9166183) filed by State of Massachusetts (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Party Commonwealth of Massachusetts added. (Vogel, Stephen)
May 2, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel McElvain on behalf of Alex Azar, Department of Health & Human Services, David Kautter, United States Interval Revenue Services, United States of America. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (McElvain, Joel)
May 2, 2018 Filing 54 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9162398) filed by State of Delaware (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Affidavit(s) Affidavit of David L. Lyons, # 3 Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro HaC Vice)Attorney David J Lyons added to party State of Delaware(pty:intvd) (Lyons, David)
May 2, 2018 Filing 53 Plaintiffs Neill Hurley and John Nantz's (the "Individual Plaintiffs") Motion for Leave to Appear Without Local Counsel (ECF No. 51 ) is GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/2/2018) (skg)
May 1, 2018 Filing 52 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9159829) filed by State of Vermont (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Benjamin Battles added to party State of Vermont(pty:intvd) (Battles, Benjamin)
May 1, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION filed by Neill Hurley, John Nantz (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Henneke, Robert)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: It is therefore ORDERED that Proposed-Intervenor Defendants' reply brief on their motion to intervene 42 is due on or before May 7, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/30/2018) (skg)
April 30, 2018 Filing 49 RESPONSE filed by Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Neill Hurley, Indiana, Kansas, Paul LePage, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, John Nantz, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virgina, Wisconsin re: 15 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Putative Intervenor-States' Motion to Intervene) (McCarty, Darren)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Motion to Intervene by California, et al. (ECF No. 43 ) is DENIED as moot. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/30/2018) (skg)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 44 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Robert McGuire. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/30/2018)(chmb)(alo)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 37 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Heidi Marguerita Rian. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/30/2018)(chmb)(alo)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 36 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott Kaplan. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/30/2018)(chmb)(alo)
April 30, 2018 Filing 44 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9155036) filed by State of Virginia (Attachments: # 1 Attachment-Va. Good Standing Certificate)Attorney Matthew Robert McGuire added to party State of Virginia(pty:intvd) (McGuire, Matthew)
April 27, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 15 MOTION to Intervene filed by Alex Azar, Department of Health & Human Services, David Kautter, United States Interval Revenue Services, United States of America with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Beckenhauer, Eric)
April 27, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION to Expedite Ruling on Motion to Intervene filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Palma, Neli)
April 26, 2018 Filing 41 Appendix in Support filed by Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Neill Hurley, Indiana, Kansas, Paul LePage, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, John Nantz, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virgina, Wisconsin re 39 MOTION for Injunction (McCarty, Darren)
April 26, 2018 Filing 40 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Neill Hurley, Indiana, Kansas, Paul LePage, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, John Nantz, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virgina, Wisconsin re 39 MOTION for Injunction (McCarty, Darren)
April 26, 2018 Filing 39 PLAINTIFF-STATES' AND INDIVIDUAL-PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Neill Hurley, Indiana, Kansas, Paul LePage, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, John Nantz, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virgina, Wisconsin (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Application for Preliminary Injunction)Attorney Darren L McCarty added to party Neill Hurley(pty:pla), Attorney Darren L McCarty added to party John Nantz(pty:pla) (McCarty, Darren) Modified title on 4/26/2018 (ctf).
April 26, 2018 Filing 38 Extraordinary Motion for Summary Judgment Against John S. McCain for Additional Plaintiffs' Damages to be Assessed at Prove-Up Hearing, as Original Plaintiffs have Failed to Timely Reply/Rebutt said Necessary Parties Standing, Thus have Waived/Confessed said Judgment, with Alternative Administrative Remedy Proffered for John S. McCain, with Brief in Support. (wxc)
April 26, 2018 Filing 37 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9147676) filed by State of Hawaii Attorney Heidi Marguerita Rian added to party State of Hawaii(pty:intvd) (Rian, Heidi) Modified text to reflect fee paid on 4/25/2018 (daa).
April 25, 2018 Filing 36 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9147929) filed by State of Oregon (Attachments: # 1 Additional Page(s) OR Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)Attorney Scott Kaplan added to party State of Oregon(pty:intvd) (Kaplan, Scott)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 33 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nimrod Pitsker Elias. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/25/2018)(chmb)(alo)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 32 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Valerie M. Nannery. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/25/2018)(chmb)(alo)
April 24, 2018 Filing 33 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9145040) filed by State of California Attorney Nimrod Pitsker Elias added to party State of California(pty:intvd) (Elias, Nimrod)
April 24, 2018 Filing 32 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9144549) filed by District of Columbia (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Valerie M. Nannery added to party District of Columbia(pty:intvd) (Nannery, Valerie)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The Parties' Joint Motion for Entry of Briefing Schedule and to Extend Time and Page Limits (ECF No. 26 )is GRANTED in part. See Order for further specifics. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/24/2018) (skg)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 24 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Taylor Allen Payne. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/24/2018)(chmb)(alo)
April 24, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Earl Henneke on behalf of Neill Hurley, John Nantz. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Henneke, Robert)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 16 Proposed Intervenors-Defendants' Motion for Leave to Appear Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/24/2018) (skg)
April 23, 2018 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants filed by West Virgina, Florida, South Carolina, Texas, South Dakota, North Dakota, Arkansas, Utah, Missouri, Kansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Arizona, Indiana, Paul LePage, Nebraska, Georgia, Wisconsin, Tennessee, Alabama, Neill Hurley, John Nantz. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (McCarty, Darren)
April 23, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION (Joint) for Entry of Briefing Schedule and to Extend Time and Page Limits filed by Alex Azar, Department of Health & Human Services, David Kautter, United States Interval Revenue Services, United States of America with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Beckenhauer, Eric)
April 23, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Beckenhauer on behalf of Alex Azar, Department of Health & Human Services, David Kautter, United States Interval Revenue Services, United States of America. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Beckenhauer, Eric)
April 20, 2018 Filing 24 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9137673) filed by State of Kentucky (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Taylor Allen Payne added to party State of Kentucky(pty:intvd) (Payne, Taylor)
April 18, 2018 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Indiana, Kansas, Paul LePage, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virgina, Wisconsin re: 12 MOTION to Strike (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Emergency Motion to Strike) (McCarty, Darren)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David F Buysse. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/17/2018)(chmb)(alo)
April 16, 2018 Filing 21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9125434) filed by State of Illinois (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois Supreme Court, # 2 Proposed Order)Attorney David F Buysse added to party State of Illinois(pty:intvd) (Buysse, David)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kathleen M. Boergers. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)).(Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/10/2018)(chmb)(alo)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Neli N. Palma. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)).(Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/10/2018)(chmb)(alo)
April 9, 2018 Filing 18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Kathleen Marie Boergers (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9110132) filed by State of California,(Palma, Neli) Modified on 4/10/2018 (wxc).
April 9, 2018 Filing 17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9110118) filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Palma, Neli)
April 9, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Appearance Without Local Counsel filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Palma, Neli)
April 9, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of Minnesota, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit(s) (Part 2), # 3 Proposed Order) (Palma, Neli)
April 9, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, filed by State of California, State of Connecticut, District of Columbia, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Kentucky, State of Massachusetts, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Oregon, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia, State of Washington, State of Minnesota. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Neli Nima Palma added to party State of California(pty:intvd), Attorney Neli Nima Palma added to party State of Connecticut(pty:intvd), Attorney Neli Nima Palma added to party District of Columbia(pty:intvd), Attorney Neli Nima Palma added to party State of Delaware(pty:intvd), Attorney Neli Nima Palma added to party State of Hawaii(pty:intvd), Attorney Neli Nima Palma added to party State of Illinois(pty:intvd), Attorney Neli Nima Palma added to party State of Kentucky(pty:intvd), Attorney Neli Nima Palma added to party State of Massachusetts(pty:intvd), Attorney Neli Nima Palma added to party State of New Jersey(pty:intvd), Attorney Neli Nima Palma added to party State of New York(pty:intvd), Attorney Neli Nima Palma added to party State of North Carolina(pty:intvd), Attorney Neli Nima Palma added to party State of Oregon(pty:intvd), Attorney Neli Nima Palma added to party State of Rhode Island(pty:intvd), Attorney Neli Nima Palma added to party State of Vermont(pty:intvd), Attorney Neli Nima Palma added to party State of Virginia(pty:intvd), Attorney Neli Nima Palma added to party State of Washington(pty:intvd), Attorney Neli Nima Palma added to party State of Minnesota(pty:intvd) (Palma, Neli)
April 5, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service re: 11 Response/Objection filed by Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Indiana, Kansas, Paul LePage, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virgina, Wisconsin (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Certified mail receipt) (McCarty, Darren)
March 28, 2018 Filing 12 Emergency Motion to Strike Texas Special Counsel, AG Darren McCarty's, March 22, 2018, Opposition to Add Additional Plaintiff's Motion to Intervene for "Sham Process of Service", Under Color of Law, and to Grant Additional Plaintiff's Motion to Intervene, as "Civil Rights-Other", with Brief-in-Support (wxc)
March 22, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Texas re: 5 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Intervene) (McCarty, Darren)
March 20, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America ; served on 3/7/2018. (McCarty, Darren)
March 20, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Interval Revenue Services ; served on 3/7/2018. (McCarty, Darren)
March 20, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to David Kautter ; served on 3/7/2018. (McCarty, Darren)
March 20, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Department of Health & Human Services ; served on 3/7/2018. (McCarty, Darren)
March 20, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Alex Azar ; served on 3/7/2018. (McCarty, Darren)
March 1, 2018 Filing 5 Additional Plaintiff's Motion to Intervene as "Necessary Real Parties-in-Interest" for Compensatory Damages Under a Bivens Action. (wxc)
February 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wxc)
February 27, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc)
February 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Austin Nimocks on behalf of Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Phil Bryant, Florida, Georgia, Indiana, Kansas, Paul LePage, Louisiana, Missouri, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, West Virgina, Wisconsin. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Nimocks, Austin)
February 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Louisiana, West Virgina, Florida, South Carolina, Texas, South Dakota, North Dakota, Phil Bryant, Arizona, Arkansas, Indiana, Paul LePage, Utah, Missouri, Nebraska, Georgia, Wisconsin, Kansas, Tennessee, Alabama. (Filer fee Paid - FW0539-9014188) Clerk to issue summonses for federal and non-federal defendants. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) (McCarty, Darren) Modified to edit payment information on 2/27/2018 (wxc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul LePage
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mississippi
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Dakota
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Dakota
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virgina
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas
Represented By: Darren L McCarty
Represented By: Austin Nimocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Interval Revenue Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kautter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?