October 11, 2018 |
Filing 17
FINAL JUDGMENT: Consistent with the court's memorandum opinion and order signed this date, The court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that the appeal of appellant, Harold Metzler, in this action be, and is hereby, dismissed. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/11/2018) (bdb)
|
October 11, 2018 |
Filing 16
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The court ORDERS that appellant's motion to strike appellee's brief be, and is hereby, denied. The court further ORDERS that appellee's #6 motion to dismiss be, and is hereby, granted, and the appeal in this action be, and is hereby, dismissed as premature. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/11/2018) (bdb)
|
October 10, 2018 |
Filing 15
REPLY filed by Energy & Exploration Partners, Inc. re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal. (tln)
|
October 10, 2018 |
Filing 14
Appendix in Support filed by Harold Metzler re #13 Appellant Brief. (Attachments: #1 pages 51-101, #2 pages 102-152, #3 pages 153-206) (edm)
|
October 10, 2018 |
Filing 13
Appellant Brief by Harold Metzler. (edm)
|
October 9, 2018 |
Filing 12
RESPONSE re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal and Motion to Strike Appellee's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal filed by Harold Metzler. (edm)
|
October 9, 2018 |
Filing 11
ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/9/2018) (edm)
|
October 9, 2018 |
Filing 10
Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Response to the Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Motion to Strike Appellee's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal filed by Harold Metzler. (edm)
|
October 5, 2018 |
Filing 9
Order Unfiling #8 Response filed by Harold Metzler due to the following deficiency: The response is signed by a law firm in violation of the court's standing order and the undersigned's judge-specific requirements. The court ORDERS that the above-referenced document be, and is hereby, unfiled and stricken from the record. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 10/5/2018) (edm)
|
October 4, 2018 |
Filing 8
*** UNFILED PER ORDER #9 *** Appelant's Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Motion to Srike #7 Brief in Support filed by Harold Metzler. (edm) Modified on 10/5/2018 (edm).
|
September 24, 2018 |
Filing 7
Brief in Support filed by Energy & Exploration Partners, Inc. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal. (edm)
|
September 24, 2018 |
Filing 6
MOTION to Dismiss Appeal filed by Energy & Exploration Partners, Inc. (edm)
|
September 10, 2018 |
Filing 5
Notice of transmission of bankruptcy record on appeal for < number 15-44931-rfn-11. Pursuant to < 8010, the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the record on appeal to the U.S. District Court. See Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8018 for information on briefing times. (Attachments: #1 Volume 1, Mini Record, #2 Volume 2, Appellant Record, #3 Volume 3, Appellant Record NON ECF DOCUMENTS Part 1, #4 Volume 3, Appellant Record NON ECF DOCUMENTS Part 2) (Levario - BK, Tandi)
|
August 29, 2018 |
Filing 4
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Energy & Exploration Partners, Inc. (bdb)
|
August 21, 2018 |
Judge McBryde's paper original and copy received of document re #1 Notice Transmitting BK Appeal/ROA or Withdrawal of Reference. Placed in folder on shelf. (edm)
|
August 20, 2018 |
Filing 3
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Harold Metzler re #2 Paper Case Designation Order. (edm)
|
August 15, 2018 |
Filing 2
Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 8/15/2018) (edm)
|
August 15, 2018 |
Filing 1
Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in < number 15-44931-rfn11 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 4:18-cv-675. (The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to < 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also < 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: <. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Initial documents) (Rueter - BK, Karyn)
|
August 15, 2018 |
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. (edm)
|