Medford et al v. Volkswagen Group of America Inc et al
Plaintiff: David C. Medford and Nancy G. Medford
Defendant: TK Holdings, Inc., Volkswagen Group of America Inc and Takata Protection Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00857
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 1/25/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 1/25/2019. Motions due by 10/28/2019. Deadline for mediation is on or before 8/28/2019. Discovery due by 9/27/2019. Pretrial Order due by 1/30/2020. This case is set for trial on this Courts four-week docket beginning February 24, 2020 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/26/2018) (skg)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by David C. Medford, Nancy G. Medford. (Floyd, James)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCEAND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before November 22, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/25/2018) (skg)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by David C. Medford, Nancy G. Medford. (Floyd, James)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Volkswagen Group of America Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Volkswagen AG for Volkswagen Group of America Inc. (Patterson, Jeff)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 17th Judicial District Court, Tarrant County, case number 017-301960-18 filed by Volkswagen Group of America Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9528669) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit(s) State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Request for Disclosure, #4 Exhibit(s) State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit(s) Citation for Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., #6 Exhibit(s) Citation for Takata Protection Systems, Inc., #7 Exhibit(s) Citation for TK Holdings, Inc., #8 Exhibit(s) Defendant Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.'s Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Request for Disclosure, #9 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Interested Persons - Volkswagen, #10 Exhibit(s) Notice of Process - Volkswagen, #11 Cover Sheet, #12 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Patterson, Jeff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medford et al v. Volkswagen Group of America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TK Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America Inc
Represented By: Jeff S Patterson
Represented By: Clayton J Callen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takata Protection Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Medford
Represented By: James N Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy G. Medford
Represented By: James N Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?