Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Rosario Limon Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. and Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Rosario Limon Enterprises, Inc. and Rosario Limon
Case Number: 4:2018cv00861
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service/ SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rosario Limon ; served on 11/7/2018. (wrb)
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 Affdavit of Service/ SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rosario Limon Enterprises, Inc. ; served on 11/7/2018. (wrb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (wrb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 Received Orig/Copy of Case Initiating Doc pursuant to Standing order re: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (wrb)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 Designation of Local Counsel by David M Walsh, IV on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (wrb)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED Certificate of Interested Persons by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Amendment to #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement.. (wrb)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions Inc re #4 Paper Case Designation Order (wrb)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Rosario Limon, Rosario Limon Enterprises, Inc.. (wrb)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/22/2018) (wrb)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9529993) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Rosario Limon Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosario Limon Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosario Limon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Represented By: David M Walsh, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?