Wolfe v. American Airlines Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kathy Ida Wolfe
Defendant: American Airlines Group, Inc. and Laura Powers
Case Number: 4:2018cv00914
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/19/2018) (skg)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by American Airlines Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order) (Cawyer, Russell)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 2/11/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 2/11/2019. Motions due by 8/9/2019. Deadline for mediation is on or before 6/12/2019. Discovery due by 7/12/2019. Pretrial Order due by 11/14/2019. This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning December 9, 2019 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/12/2018) (skg)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Kathy Ida Wolfe. (Lowe, Justin)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Lowe on behalf of Kathy Ida Wolfe. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lowe, Justin)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Justin Lowe. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/27/2018) (chmb)(lem)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-9605399) filed by Kathy Ida Wolfe (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Lowe, Justin)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before December 11, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/13/2018) (skg)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm)
November 9, 2018 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by American Airlines Group, Inc., Laura Powers identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate American Airlines Group, Inc. for American Airlines, Inc. (see doc #1 ) (edm)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 141st District Court, Tarrant County, case number 141-300349-18 filed by Laura Powers. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9575166) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s)) (Harrison, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfe v. American Airlines Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Group, Inc.
Represented By: Russell D Cawyer
Represented By: Paige Pritchard Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Powers
Represented By: Jonathan Whittington Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Ida Wolfe
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Starnes
Represented By: Justin Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?