Walker v. Waller et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Walker
Defendant: Donna Smith, Ms. Marshall and Bernard P Waller
Case Number: 4:2018cv00945
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Fri Dec 7 14:51:42 CST 2018 (crt)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FILING FEE ORDER: Jeffrey Walker, BOP No. 33424-069 shall pay $350.00 in monthly installments as mandated by the PLRA. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/7/2018) (plp)
December 7, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Dec 7 13:40:38 CST 2018 (crt)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILING FEE ORDER: Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Plaintiff will not be assessed an initial partial filing fee because he lacks the requisite funds in his prison account to pay an initial fee; however, plaintiff will be required to pay the full filing fee of $350.00 pursuant to the PLRA. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/7/2018) (skg)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Jeffrey Walker (edm)
November 27, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. , and a Motion to Proceed IFP with Certificate of Trust Account has been mailed to Plaintiff for completition. Tue Nov 27 14:42:39 CST 2018 (crt)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Jeffrey Walker must address the following deficiency: A $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee (total fees of $400.00) were not paid nor has a request to proceed in forma pauperis been submitted. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/27/2018) (skg)
November 26, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3. Mon Nov 26 16:15:22 CST 2018 (crt)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (edm)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Marshall, Donna Smith, Bernard P Waller filed by Jeffrey Walker. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (edm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Waller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard P Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?