Roor International BV et al v. King Tobacco Inc et al

Plaintiff: Sream Inc and Roor International BV
Defendant: Amirali Panjwani and King Tobacco Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00020
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The court notes that Andrew Jacoby, counsel for plaintiffs, Roor International BV and Sream, Inc., does not appear to reside or have his principal office in this district or within fifty miles of the courthouse in the Fort Worth Division of this district. Local Civil Rule LR 83.lO(a). This is not the type of action in which an exception to the requirement of local counsel would be made. Local Civil Rule LR 83.11. Therefore, the court ORDERS that by 4:00 p.m. on March 14, 2019, plaintiffs file an appropriate written designation of local counsel. Failure to comply with this order may result in the striking of plaintiffs' complaint without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 3/4/2019) (tln)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roor International BV, Sream Inc. (tln)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 Judge McBryde's paper original and copy of #1 Complaint, filed by Roor International BV, Sream Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (tln)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Unfiling #7 Judge McBryde's paper original and copy of #1 Complaint filed by Sream Inc, Roor International BV due to the following deficiency: Such document does not contain the filing party's original signature, and the handwritten mark found on the document is not a signature. The collection of exhibits is located in the same volume as the complaint, does not bear consecutive page numbers, and is not accompanied by a table of contents. (see order for specifics) (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 1/14/2019) (tln)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 ***UNFILED PER #8 ORDER***Judge McBryde's paper original and copy of #1 Complaint filed by Roor International BV, Sream Inc. (tln) Modified text on 1/14/2019 (tln).
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roor International BV, Sream Inc. (Jacoby, Andrew)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to King Tobacco Inc, Amirali Panjwani. (bdb)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 Report to Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (bdb)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 1/9/2019) (bdb)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against King Tobacco Inc, Amirali Panjwani filed by Roor International BV, Sream Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9695706) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E) (Jacoby, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. King Tobacco Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amirali Panjwani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Tobacco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream Inc
Represented By: Andrew Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Andrew Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?