Agnew v. United States Marshall Service et al

Plaintiff: Norman L Agnew
Defendant: United States Marshall Service et al
Case Number: 4:2019cv00055
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11,12. Thu Jan 31 11:16:44 CST 2019 (crt)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order issued this same day, The court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that all claims asserted by Plaintiff in this action be, and are hereby, DISMISSED. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 1/31/2019) (edm)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The court ORDERS that Plaintiff's claims be, and are hereby, DISMISSED. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 1/31/2019) (edm)
January 18, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Fri Jan 18 10:01:32 CST 2019 (crt)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING BAR TO FILING IN FORMA PAUPERIS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915 (g): The court ORDERS that the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (doc. #2 ) is DENIED as Plaintiff is barred from proceeding IFP under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The court further ORDERS that in order to proceed with this action, Norman L. Agnew must pay to the Clerk of Court the full filing and administrative fees of $400.00 within seven (7) days of the date of this order. Failure to timely pay the full filing and administrative fees to the Clerk of Court may result in the dismissal of this action without further notice pursuant to Fed. R. Ci v. P. 41 (b). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 1/18/2019) (edm)
January 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7,8,9. Thu Jan 17 16:42:40 CST 2019 (crt)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 1/17/2019) (edm)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (edm)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge John McBryde for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Terry R Means no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 1/17/2019) (edm)
January 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4,5. Thu Jan 17 13:14:57 CST 2019 (crt)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (edm)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Norman L Agnew. (edm)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Norman L Agnew (edm)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against United States Marshall Service et al filed by Norman L Agnew. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (edm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agnew v. United States Marshall Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman L Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marshall Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?