Manansala v. Postal Inspector of Fort Worth

Plaintiff: Arsenio Manansala
Defendant: Postal Inspector of Fort Worth and Patrick R Donahoe
Case Number: 4:2019cv00061
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Cureton
Referring Judge: Terry R Means
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Federal Employers' Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order issued this same day and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, all claims are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to their refiling upon payment of the required filing and administrative fees. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 2/28/2019) (bdb)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: As of the date of this order, Plaintiff has failed to pay the required fees. As a result, Plaintiff's claims are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to their refiling upon payment of the required fees. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 2/28/2019) (bdb)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ; denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pltf to pay full filing fee and admin fees to clerk no later than Feb 20 2019 or his claims will be dismissed w/o prej to their refiling. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 2/8/2019) (wrb)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Findings and Recommendations on Case re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Arsenio Manansala. Recommended that platiniff's motion to proceed IFP be denied; recommended that the district judge inform Plaintiff that the complaint will be subject to dismissal unless pltf pays the filing fee of $400. Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton no longer assigned to case. Objections to F&R due by 2/5/2019 re: #1 Complaint Footnote: Clerk directed to remove Donahoe as deft on the docket and list the only deft the Postal Inspector of Fort Worth Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 1/22/2019) (wrb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Arsenio Manansala (wrb)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Arsenio Manansala must address the following deficiency: Although Plaintiff has filed a long-form application to proceed in forma pauperis, he has not provided any information regarding whether he has a spouse, and if so, his spouse's income, assets, or employment history.1 Furthermore, he has not provided answers to several other questions. In order for the Court to make the determination regarding Plaintiffs pauper application, Plaintiff must provide complete answers to all of the questions in the Court's long-form in-forma-pauperis application.. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 14 days days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 1/18/2019) (wxc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bdb)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Cureton preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. (bdb)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Arsenio Manansala. (Summons not issued while IFP pending) (bdb)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Arsenio Manansala. (bdb)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Arsenio Manansala. (bdb)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Arsenio Manansala. (bdb)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Postal Inspector of Fort Worth filed by Arsenio Manansala. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manansala v. Postal Inspector of Fort Worth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Postal Inspector of Fort Worth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick R Donahoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arsenio Manansala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?