3001 Decatur Trust et al v. Unknown Creditor

Undetermined: Mark X Mullin and Case Admin Sup
Appellant: 3001 Decatur Trust
Appellee: Unknown Creditor
Case Number: 4:2019cv00108
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7. Tue Feb 26 16:59:35 CST 2019 (crt)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINAL JUDGMENT... In accordance with the order signed this date, The court ORDERS that the appeal in this action brought by 3001 Decatur Trust be, and is hereby, dismissed. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 2/26/2019) (wxc)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER... The court ORDERS that the appeal in this action be, and is hereby, dismissed for failure to comply with the court's February 7, 2019 order. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 2/26/2019) (wxc)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of transmission of bankruptcy record on appeal for #bankruptcy case number 18-44996-mxm11. Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8010, the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the record on appeal to the U.S. District Court. See Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8018 for information on briefing times. (Attachments: #1 Mini Record) (Rueter - BK, Karyn)
February 7, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Thu Feb 7 13:24:46 CST 2019 (crt)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER... The court ORDERS that by February 20, 2019, appellant retain counsel, who shall by that date file an entry of appearance of counsel bearing in mind the requirements of Local Civil Rule LR 83.10. The court cautions that failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of appellant's appeal without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 2/7/2019) (wxc)
February 6, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3. Wed Feb 6 13:57:18 CST 2019 (crt)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 2/6/2019) (wxc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wxc)
February 6, 2019 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to Judge McBryde. (wxc)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in #bankruptcy case number 18-44996-mxm11 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 4:19-cv-108. (The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also #District Court Local Bankruptcy Rule 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Initial Docs) (Rueter - BK, Karyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 3001 Decatur Trust et al v. Unknown Creditor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Mark X Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Case Admin Sup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: 3001 Decatur Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Unknown Creditor
Represented By: James Nathan Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?