Perry v. Lowe's Companies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Shirley Perry
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00127
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order) (Brown, Clarkson)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: To expedite resolution of the arbitration issue, Defendant is ORDERED to file its motion to compel on or before April 16, 2019. Plaintiff may respond on or before April 30, 2019, and Defendant may reply on or before May 7, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/2/2019) (skg)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STRIKING AND UNFILING DOCUMENT: #8 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. due to the following deficiency: Judge O'Connor's Specific Requirements (http://www.txnd.uscourts.gov/judge/district-judge-reed- oconnor) state, "All motions require a proposed order that must be emailed to O'Connor_Orders@txnd.uscourts.gov and must be in a WordPerfect or Word format (not PDF)." Please refile the motion and email a WordPerfect or Word version of the proposed protective order to the listed Orders inbox in accordance with the rule. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/2/2019) (skg)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Joint Report Regarding Scheduling Order filed by Shirley Perry (Lee, Joshua)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures filed by Shirley Perry (Lee, Joshua)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Brown, Clarkson)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 ***UNFILED PER #12 ORDER***Agreed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B, #2 Proposed Order) (Brown, Clarkson)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Report due by 3/22/2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/22/2019) (trt)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lowe's Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Lowe's Home Centers, LLC for Lowe's Companies, Inc.. (Brown, Clarkson)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lowe's Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Lowe's Home Centers, LLC for Lowe's Companies, Inc.. (Brown, Clarkson)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Clarkson F. Brown added to party Lowe's Companies, Inc.(pty:dft) (Brown, Clarkson)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lowe's Companies, Inc.. (wxc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Lowe's Companies, Inc. filed by Shirley Perry. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9773208) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Persons) (Lee, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Clarkson F. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Perry
Represented By: Joshua D. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?